ECOSOLARGY, INC. v. CODE GREEN SOLAR LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph H Rodriguez |
Referred: | Karen M Williams |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-06018 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1330 Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Sep 28, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 07, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 27, 2017 5:33 AM EDT |
Counter Claimant
CODE GREEN SOLAR LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
CODE GREEN SOLAR PUERTO RICO LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
ECOSOLARGY, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CODE GREEN SOLAR LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CODE GREEN SOLAR PUERTO RICO LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DOES 1-10
|
|
Plaintiff
ECOSOLARGY, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Thursday, March 07, 2019 | ||
49 | 49
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Thu 03/07 2:14 PM
ORDER Granting Plaintiff's47 Motion for Summary Judgment. ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 3/7/2019. (dmr) |
|
Thursday, December 06, 2018 | ||
48 | 48
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 12/06 3:07 PM
RESPONSE to Motion filed by CODE GREEN SOLAR LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, CODE GREEN SOLAR PUERTO RICO LLC re47 MOTION for Summary Judgment (WHITE, JUSTIN) |
|
Monday, October 15, 2018 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 10/15 8:21 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to47 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion set for 11/5/2018 before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr) |
||
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
47 | 47
motion
Summary Judgment
Fri 10/12 10:36 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by ECOSOLARGY, INC.. Responses due by 10/22/2018(CHEWNING, KERRI) |
|
Att: 1 Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Jeffery Robinson with Exhibits, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Paul Bakhoum with Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 5 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, September 07, 2018 | ||
46 | 46
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 09/07 10:21 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff's Dispositive Motion due by 10/12/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 9/6/2018. (rss, ) |
|
Thursday, September 06, 2018 | ||
minutes
Status Conference
Thu 09/06 4:45 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: Telephone Status Conference held on 9/6/2018. (nar) |
||
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
45 | 45
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 07/19 10:09 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 9/6/2018 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 7/18/2018. (rss, ) |
|
Wednesday, July 18, 2018 | ||
minutes
Status Conference
Thu 07/19 9:18 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: Telephone Status Conference held on 7/18/2018. (nar) |
||
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
44 | 44
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 07/16 1:55 PM
TEXT ORDER The Court has scheduled a telephone status conference for July 18, 2018 at 3:00 p.m. to address the letter dated July 12, 2018 from Kerri E. Chewning, Esquire, counsel for plaintiff. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 7/18/18. (nar) |
|
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
43 | 43
misc
Letter
Thu 07/12 6:21 PM
Letter from all parties re: scheudling of depositions and mediation. (CHEWNING, KERRI) |
|
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 06/18 10:52 AM
TEXT ORDER The Court has scheduled a telephone status conference for July 23, 2018 at 3:00 p.m. Any and all remaining deadlines shall be determined during the July 23, 2018 telephone status conference. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 6/18/18. (nar) |
|
minutes
Status Conference
Tue 06/19 8:39 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: Telephone Status Conference held on 6/18/2018. (nar) |
||
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
order
Order
Thu 06/14 11:51 AM
TEXT ORDER: At the request of counsel, the time of the June 18, 2018 telephone conference is changed from 2:00 p.m. to 10:00 a.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 06/14/2018. (Bullock, T) |
|
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 04/27 11:10 AM
TEXT ORDER The Court has scheduled a telephone status conference for June 18, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. Any and all remaining deadlines shall be determined during the June 18, 2018 telephone status conference. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 4/27/18. (nar) |
|
minutes
Status Conference
Mon 04/30 9:06 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: Telephone Status Conference held on 4/27/2018. (nar) |
||
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Letter
Fri 04/06 3:41 PM
Letter from Plaintiff EcoSolargy re: deposition and mediation dates re38 Letter. (CHEWNING, KERRI) |
|
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Letter
Wed 04/04 5:31 PM
Letter from Justin R. White, Esq.. (WHITE, JUSTIN) |
|
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 01/25 12:50 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 4/27/2018 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 1/25/2018. (dmr) |
|
minutes
Discovery Hearing
Fri 01/26 3:06 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: Telephone Discovery Conference held on 1/25/2018. (nz) |
||
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 01/23 12:17 PM
TEXT ORDER Upon letter application dated January 23, 2018 from Kerri I. Chewning, Esquire, counsel for plaintiff, the Court hereby GRANTS the request to reschedule the telephone status conference previously set for January 17, 2018 to address the letters dated January 5, 2018 and January 9, 2018 from Kerri Chewning, Esquire, counsel for plaintiff, and the letter dated January 8, 2018 from Justin R. White, Esquire, counsel for defendants. The new date and time of the telephone status conference is January 25, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 1/23/18. (Ramos, Nicole) |
|
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 01/12 10:14 AM
TEXT ORDER The Court hereby reschedules the telephone status conference previously set for January 19, 2018. The new date and time of the telephone status conference is January 17, 2018 at 11:30 a.m., at which time the Court will address the letters dated January 5, 2018 and January 9, 2018 from Kerri Chewning, Esquire, counsel for plaintiff, and the letter dated January 8, 2018 from Justin R. White, Esquire, counsel for defendants. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 1/12/18. (Ramos, Nicole) |
|
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Letter
Tue 01/09 1:26 PM
Letter from Kerri Chewning, Reply in Support of Discovery Dispute. (CHEWNING, KERRI) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Letter
Mon 01/08 6:50 PM
Letter from Justin R. White, Esq. re32 Letter.(WHITE, JUSTIN) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Document demand and response, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Interrogatories and response, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - excerpt 1 from plaintiff's document production, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - excerpt 2 from plaintiff's document production | ||
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Letter
Fri 01/05 9:56 PM
Letter from Plaintiff EcoSolargy re: Discovery Dispute. (CHEWNING, KERRI) |
|
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 10/16 11:57 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 1/19/2018 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Discovery is STAYED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 10/16/2017. (tf, ) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Letter
Tue 10/10 12:41 PM
Letter from all parties re: mediation date. (CHEWNING, KERRI) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Letter
Mon 09/18 5:02 PM
Letter from Joint Letter re: mediation scheduling status. (CHEWNING, KERRI) |
|
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 09/13 9:54 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: Telephone Status Conference held on 9/12/2017. (nz) |
||
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 08/17 10:42 AM
TEXT ORDER Upon letter application dated August 16, 2017 from Justin R. White, Esquire, counsel for defendants, the Court hereby GRANTS the request to reschedule the telephone status conference previously set for August 18, 2017. The new date and time of the telephone status conference is September 12, 2017 at 3:00 p.m. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 8/17/17. (Ramos, Nicole) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Letter
Wed 08/16 1:06 PM
Letter from Justin R. White. (WHITE, JUSTIN) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Mon 05/22 5:55 PM
ANSWER to Counterclaim (Amended Counterclaim) with Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by ECOSOLARGY, INC..(CHEWNING, KERRI) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 05/19 2:05 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 8/18/2017 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 9/18/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 1/26/2018, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 5/19/2017. (dmr) |
|
minutes
Status Conference
Fri 05/26 2:16 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: Telephone Status Conference held on 5/19/2017. (nz) |
||
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
utility
Update Answer Due Deadline
Mon 05/08 8:28 AM
Clerk's Text Order - The document24 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ECOSOLARGY, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/22/2017. (dmr) |
||
Saturday, May 06, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
Sat 05/06 1:31 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant, Counterclaim Plaintiff's Amended Counterclaim.. (CHEWNING, KERRI) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
cmp
Counterclaim
Mon 04/24 7:11 PM
Amended COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs, filed by CODE GREEN SOLAR PUERTO RICO LLC, CODE GREEN SOLAR LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY.(WHITE, JUSTIN) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 04/05 3:48 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant Ecosolargy Inc.'s15 Motion for a a more definitive statement. Defendants are granted leave to amend the Counterclaim within 20 days. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 4/5/2017. (dmr) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Letter
Fri 02/17 6:02 PM
Letter from All Parties re: ESI re 20 Order,. (CHEWNING, KERRI) |
|
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order
Wed 02/08 12:02 PM
TEXT ORDER Within ten (10) days of the date of this Text Order, Plaintiffs counsel shall file a letter with the Court, as set forth in the December 20, 2017 Scheduling Order, stating that the parties have conferred pursuant to L. CIV. R. 26.1(b)(2) and 26.1(d) concerning discovery of digital information and advise whether the parties have agreed on computer-based and other digital discovery matters. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 2/8/17. (Ramos, Nicole) |
|
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion
Tue 01/10 10:37 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ECOSOLARGY, INC. re15 MOTION to Dismiss (CHEWNING, KERRI) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, January 02, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Brief in Opposition to Motion
Mon 01/02 12:37 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by CODE GREEN SOLAR LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, CODE GREEN SOLAR PUERTO RICO LLC re15 MOTION to Dismiss (WHITE, JUSTIN) |
|
Wednesday, December 21, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 12/21 3:18 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 5/19/2017 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Amended Pleadings due by 5/5/2017. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 7/17/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 11/22/2017, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 12/20/2016. (dmr) |
|
Tuesday, December 20, 2016 | ||
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Wed 12/28 12:26 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: In-Person Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/20/2016. (nz) |
||
Monday, December 19, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Letter Rule 7.1
Mon 12/19 10:51 AM
Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by CODE GREEN SOLAR LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, CODE GREEN SOLAR PUERTO RICO LLC re15 MOTION to Dismiss (WHITE, JUSTIN) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 12/19 11:25 AM
Amended Set/Reset Deadlines as to15 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 1/17/2017 before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr) |
||
Tuesday, December 06, 2016 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 12/06 9:33 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to15 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 1/3/2017 before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr) |
||
Monday, December 05, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Dismiss
Mon 12/05 11:26 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by ECOSOLARGY, INC.. Responses due by 12/20/2016(CHEWNING, KERRI) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, November 30, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 11/30 9:48 AM
TEXT ORDER Upon letter application dated November 22, 2016 from Kerri E. Chewning, Esquire, counsel for plaintiff, and it appearing that all counsel consent to the request to reschedule the in-person Initial Conference previously set for December 8, 2016, the Court hereby GRANTS the request. The new date and time of the in-person Initial Conference is December 20, 2016 at 10:30 a.m. in Room 2040 - Camden. (Ramos, Nicole) |
|
Wednesday, November 23, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 11/23 1:10 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jeffrey A. Robinson Esquire; shall make a payment of $150.00 payable to the Clerk, United States District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 11/23/2016. (tf, ) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 11/23 9:59 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (with consent) . Motion set for 12/19/2016 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, ) |
||
Tuesday, November 22, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Letter
Tue 11/22 11:08 PM
Letter from Counsel for Plaintiff re: Initial Conference. (CHEWNING, KERRI) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 11/22 10:38 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (with consent) by ECOSOLARGY, INC..(CHEWNING, KERRI) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of Kerri E. Chewning, | ||
Att: 2 Certification of Jeffrey A. Robinson, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, November 17, 2016 | ||
utility
Update Answer Due Deadline
Thu 11/17 9:25 AM
Clerk's Text Order - The document10 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ECOSOLARGY, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/5/2016. (dmr) |
||
Wednesday, November 16, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
Wed 11/16 11:23 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant's Counterclaim.. (CHEWNING, KERRI) |
|
Monday, October 31, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden)
Mon 10/31 10:30 AM
Order Initial Conference set for 12/8/2016 at 11:30 AM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 10/31/2016. (dmr) |
|
Friday, October 28, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 10/28 1:09 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CODE GREEN SOLAR LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, CODE GREEN SOLAR PUERTO RICO LLC. (WHITE, JUSTIN) |
|
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Fri 10/28 1:07 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by EcoSolargy , COUNTERCLAIM against ECOSOLARGY, INC. by CODE GREEN SOLAR PUERTO RICO LLC, CODE GREEN SOLAR LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY.(WHITE, JUSTIN) |
|
Monday, October 17, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
Mon 10/17 2:57 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Code Green Solar & Code Green Solar Puerto Rico.. (WHITE, JUSTIN) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Letter
Mon 10/17 2:16 PM
Letter from Justin R. White. (WHITE, JUSTIN) |
|
qc
QC - Incorrect Event Selected
Mon 10/17 2:47 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Letter request for a Rule 6.1 extension5 filed by Defendants on 10/17/2016 was submitted incorrectly as a Letter. PLEASE RESUBMIT an Application and Proposed Order using the event "Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order" found under Other Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dmr) |
||
utility
Update Answer Due Deadline
Mon 10/17 3:58 PM
Clerk's Text Order - The document6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by CODE GREEN SOLAR PUERTO RICO LLC, CODE GREEN SOLAR LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/3/2016. (dmr) |
||
Friday, October 07, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Substitution of Attorney
Fri 10/07 8:15 PM
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney SCOTT I. UNGER terminated. Attorney KERRI E. CHEWNING for ECOSOLARGY, INC. added.. (CHEWNING, KERRI) |
|
Thursday, September 29, 2016 | ||
qc
QC - Attorney Case Opening
Thu 09/29 11:08 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (rtm, ) |
||
Wednesday, September 28, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 09/29 11:07 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to CODE GREEN SOLAR LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, CODE GREEN SOLAR PUERTO RICO LLC Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Ryan Merrigan* (rtm, ) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 09/28 11:13 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ecosolargy, Inc.. (UNGER, SCOTT) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 09/28 11:11 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7376167) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Ecosolargy, Inc..(UNGER, SCOTT) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A", | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit "B" | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 09/28 11:42 AM
Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, ) |