Lord v. Secretary, Department of Corrections et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jose E Martinez |
Referred: | Patrick A White |
Case #: | 4:16-cv-10079 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Sep 29, 2016 |
Terminated: | Aug 07, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 08, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order Withdrawing Reference/Case No Longer Referred
Wed 08/08 10:20 AM
PAPERLESS Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White/Case Closed by the District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 8/8/2018. (br) |
|
Tuesday, August 07, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
order
Judgment
Tue 08/07 2:14 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Attorney General of the State of Florida, Secretary, Department of Corrections, State of Florida against Leroy Lord, Jr. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 8/7/2018. See attached document for full details. (lbc) |
|
27 | 27
1
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Tue 08/07 2:12 PM
ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Adopting25 Report and Recommendations. Certificate of Appealability: DENIED. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 8/7/2018. See attached document for full details. (lbc) |
|
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
order
- Order (- NEW - PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Mon 07/16 3:44 PM
ORDER OF DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 7/16/2018. See attached document for full details. (fbn) |
|
Att: 1 Appellate Docket Case No. 3D10-2632 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Report and Recommendations
Mon 07/16 1:18 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 28 USC 2254 case re1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Leroy Lord, Jr.; Recommending that: (1) this petition for writ of habeas corpus be DISMISSED as time-barred; (2) a final judgment be entered; (3) a certificate of appealability be DENIED; and, (4) the case be CLOSED. Objections to R&R due by 7/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 7/16/2018. See attached document for full details. (fbn) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Response/Reply (Other)
Fri 07/21 12:55 PM
First RESPONSE to 23 Endorsed Order,,,, by Secretary, Department of Corrections.(Mervine, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix Index, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix II-KK | ||
Sunday, July 16, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
- Endorsed Order no pdf attached
Sun 07/16 10:09 AM
*Endorsed Order-Contrary to this court's show cause order, the respondent HAS NOT addressed the claims raised herein on the merits. In the future the respondent is reminded that it is required to ensure that its response complies with the court's order regarding the form and substance of its response. Such disregard in the future of this court's explicit instructions will no longer be tolerated and may be subject to a show cause hearing and possibly contempt proceedings. The respondent is this directed to file a supplemental operative response addressing the merits herein on or before 7/21/17 and is cautioned NOT to incorporate its prior response but is to file a complete new response as the court WILL NOT review the respondent's prior filings. The respondent shall also file a supporting appendix and shall ensure that accurate record references are contained within its response. Finally, the respondent may raise any procedural bars and defenses but SHALL address the merits of the claims in the alternative! Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 7/17/2017. (nn) |
|
Friday, March 03, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Response/Reply (Other)
Fri 03/03 9:46 AM
AMENDED REPLY to14 Response to Order to Show Cause, by Leroy Lord, Jr. (lan) |
|
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Wed 02/08 11:27 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting Petitioner's Motion Requesting Leave to File an Amended Reply20 to the Respondent's response. Petitioner's supplemental reply is due on or before March 10, 2017. The Petitioner is instructed that he is to ensure he hands his reply to prison authorities for mailing with sufficient time in advance so that it reaches this court by March 10, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 2/8/2017. (mca) |
|
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Amend/Correct
Mon 01/30 11:13 AM
MOTION to Amend/Correct by Leroy Lord, Jr. Responses due by 2/13/2017 (lan) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause
Thu 01/12 12:24 PM
REPLY to14 Response to Order to Show Cause, by Leroy Lord, Jr. (ail) |
|
Wednesday, December 07, 2016 | ||
utility
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 12/07 1:23 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as per DE 18 : Replies due by 1/6/2017. (lk) |
||
Tuesday, December 06, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Tue 12/06 3:37 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time17 to file a reply to the Respondent's response to petition for writ of habeas corpus. Petitioner's Reply is due on or before January 6, 2017. The Petitioner is instructed that he is to ensure he hands his reply to prison authorities for mailing with sufficient time in advance so that it reaches this court by January 6, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 12/6/2016. (mca) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Tue 12/06 3:18 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Leroy Lord, Jr. (lk) |
|
Thursday, November 17, 2016 | ||
utility
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 11/17 11:08 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as per DE16 : Filing Fee due by 12/16/2016. (lk) |
||
Wednesday, November 16, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 11/16 3:14 PM
ORDER denying11 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. On or before December 16, 2016, the petitioner shall pay the Clerks filing fee of $5.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 11/16/2016. (tw) |
|
Thursday, October 27, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Thu 10/27 9:28 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Attorney General of the State of Florida.(Mervine, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix Appendix Index, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix A-U, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix V-HH, | ||
Att: 4 Transcripts Notice of Filing Trial Transcript, | ||
Att: 5 Transcripts 1-222, | ||
Att: 6 Transcripts 223-535, | ||
Att: 7 Transcripts 536-776, | ||
Att: 8 Transcripts 777-1099, | ||
Att: 9 Transcripts 1100-1343 | ||
Tuesday, October 25, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Compliance
Wed 10/26 9:20 AM
NOTICE of Compliance by Leroy Lord, Jr re9 Order, (lan) |
|
Tuesday, October 18, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 10/18 4:01 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael W. Mervine on behalf of Attorney General of the State of Florida. Attorney Michael W. Mervine added to party Attorney General of the State of Florida(pty:dft). (Mervine, Michael) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 10/18 2:01 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Leroy Lord, Jr. (lan) |
|
Tuesday, October 11, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 10/11 10:21 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that within forty-five days from the date of this order the Respondent shall file a memorandum of fact and law to show cause why this petition should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 10/11/2016. (br) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order
Tue 10/11 10:19 AM
ORDER re3 Memorandum filed by Leroy Lord, Jr.; that on or before November 10, 2016, the Petitioner shall verify the memorandum of law using the form supplied with this order. The Petitioner is cautioned that failure to file the required verification may result in dismissal of the petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 10/11/2016. (br) |
|
Att: 1 Verification Form | ||
8 | 8
order
Order of Instructions to Pro Se Litigant
Tue 10/11 10:15 AM
INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 10/11/2016. (br) |
|
Tuesday, October 04, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order Requiring Payment of Filing Fee or Filing IFP Motion
Tue 10/04 3:16 PM
ORDER REQUIRING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE OR FILING OF MOTION TO PROCEED IFP WITH DETAILED AFFIDAVIT. Filing Fee due by 11/3/2016. Motions due by 11/3/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 10/4/2016. (tw) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit IFP | ||
5 | 5
notice
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction - Chambers and Clerks
Tue 10/04 3:03 PM
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 4 Clerk's Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White. Document Filed in Wrong Case ; Document restricted and docket text modified. (lrz1) |
|
Thursday, September 29, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
order
Clerks Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment
Tue 10/04 3:16 PM
Clerks Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment to Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2003-19 for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (lrz1) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Clerk's Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge - FORM
Tue 10/04 2:28 PM
Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (lrz1) |
|
3 | 3
29
pgs
misc
Memorandum
Thu 09/29 9:34 AM
MEMORANDUM of Law in Support re1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Leroy Lord, Jr. (lrz1) |
|
2 | 2
order
Judge Assignment
Thu 09/29 9:33 AM
Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez and Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White (lrz1) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Thu 09/29 9:32 AM
APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Filing fee $ 5.00 (Not Paid/No IFP), filed by Leroy Lord, Jr.(lrz1) |