United Poultry Concerns v. Chabad of Irvine et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Gail J Standish |
Case #: | 8:16-cv-01810 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s) |
Case Filed: | Sep 29, 2016 |
Terminated: | May 12, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 28, 2017 1:56 AM PDT |
Defendant
Chabad of Irvine
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alter Tenenbaum
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Ely Tenenbaum
|
|
Plaintiff
United Poultry Concerns
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Amicus
Professor Joshua Blackman
Terminated: 01/06/2017
Houston College of Law 1303 San Jacinto Street
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Amicus
Mark Goldfeder
Terminated: 01/20/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, January 17, 2019 | ||
121 | 121
![]() MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Dismissing Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Lack of Jurisdiction by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. : Plaintiff's Complaint has failed to establish injury sufficient to establish Article III standing. The Court therefore dismisses Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint85 for lack of jurisdiction. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk) |