Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:14-bk-11916

New Hampshire Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher J Panos
Case #: 1:16-ap-01220
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Sep 29, 2016
Terminated:Dec 12, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Steel-Craft Corp. of Hartford
105 Steel Craft Dr.
Hartford, WI 53027
Represented By
Steel-Craft Corp. of Hartford
contact info
Plaintiff
GTAT Corporation
243 Daniel Webster Highway
Merrimack, NH 03054
Represented By
Matthew E. Lane
Sullivan & Worcester LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee
1000 Elm Street Suite 605
Manchester, NH 03101


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Monday, December 12, 2016
court|utility Close Adversary Case|Disposition of Adversary Mon 12/12 11:51 AM
Adversary Case Closed 16-1220 CJP, Disposition of Adversary Judgment For both parties per Notice of Dismissal. (jtp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2016
4 4 notice Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (Rule 7041) Wed 11/23 12:21 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff GTAT Corporation (Lane, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2016
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Notice (BK) Sat 11/05 12:53 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/04/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Wednesday, November 02, 2016
2 2 court Summons Issued - GTAT Avoidance Complaints ONLY Wed 11/02 2:17 PM
Summons Issued on Attorney Matthew E. Lane, Esq. to be served on Steel-Craft Corp. of Hartford Date Issued 11/2/2016 Related [+]. (jtp)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff GTAT Corporation
Thursday, October 13, 2016
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Thu 10/13 9:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by JP. Receipt Number 107697. (admin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/29 2:20 PM
Adversary case 16-01220 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Avoidable Transfers by GTAT Corporation against Steel-Craft Corp. of Hartford. Receipt Number CHECK, Fee Amount $ 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Lane, Matthew)
Related: [-]