Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Michael L Brown
Case #: 1:16-cv-03690
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2016
Terminated:Feb 10, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 29, 2017 5:58 AM EDT
Defendant
F. Raymond Bean
Represented By
Janna Satz Nugent
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Defendant
GRP Franklin, LLC
Represented By
Janna Satz Nugent
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Defendant
GRP Madison, LLC
Represented By
Janna Satz Nugent
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Defendant
GRP North Carolina, LLC
Represented By
Janna Satz Nugent
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Georgia Renewable Power, LLC
Represented By
Janna Satz Nugent
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Defendant
GreenFuels Energy, LLC
Represented By
Janna Satz Nugent
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jeffrey Kuehr
Represented By
Janna Satz Nugent
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Defendant
North Carolina Renewable Power-Elizabethtown, LLC
Represented By
Janna Satz Nugent
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Defendant
North Carolina Renewable Power-Lumberton, LLC
Represented By
Janna Satz Nugent
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Defendant
David Shaffer
Represented By
Janna Satz Nugent
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Five on Fifty, LLC
Represented By
Thomas Christopher Grant
Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, Llp-Ga
contact info
Plaintiff
Gate Industries, LLC
Represented By
Thomas Christopher Grant
Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, Llp-Ga
contact info
Plaintiff
Southern Film Regional Center-Atlanta, LLC
Represented By
Thomas Christopher Grant
Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, Llp-Ga
contact info

GPO Feb 10 2020
by Judge Michael L. Brown on 2/10/20. (bjh)ORDER Granting Defendants' 36 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Dismisses this matter with Prejudice. Denying Defendants' request for attorneys' fees and Denies as Moot 46 Motion for Status Conference. Signed

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, October 06, 2020
55 55 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Tue 10/06 7:58 AM
ORDER denying Plaintiffs'51 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 10/6/20. (bjh)
Related: [-]