Advocates for Individuals with Disabilities Foundation Incorporated v. University McClintock Partners LLC
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Steven P Logan |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-03323 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 29, 2016 |
Terminated: | Oct 11, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 28, 2017 2:25 AM MST |
Defendant
University McClintock Partners LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Advocates for Individuals with Disabilities Foundation Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Tuesday, October 11, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case
Tue 10/11 2:26 PM
ORDER granting14 Stipulation of Dismissal. This action is dismissed with prejudice in its entirety. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. The Clerk of Court shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 10/11/16. (EJA) |
|
Thursday, October 06, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 10/06 4:36 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Advocates for Individuals with Disabilities Foundation Incorporated.(Zazueta, Fabian) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
13 | 13
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 10/06 4:15 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Advocates for Individuals with Disabilities Foundation Incorporated.(Zazueta, Fabian) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 10/06 4:13 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Advocates for Individuals with Disabilities Foundation Incorporated.(Zazueta, Fabian) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, October 04, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order re Rule 12(b) Motions
Tue 10/04 4:00 PM
PRELIMINARY ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 10/4/16. (CLB) |
|
10 | 10
minute_ord
Minute Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 10/04 2:06 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Steven P, Logan. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV 16-3323 PHX-SPL. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Tue 10/04 11:29 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Advocates for Individuals with Disabilities Foundation Incorporated. (Zazueta, Fabian) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
Tue 10/04 11:28 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Fabian Zazueta on behalf of Advocates for Individuals with Disabilities Foundation Incorporated. (Zazueta, Fabian) |
|
Monday, October 03, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order re Rule 12(b) Motions
Mon 10/03 4:46 PM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 10/3/16. (KGM) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 10/03 1:37 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Advocates for Individuals with Disabilities Foundation Incorporated. (Strojnik, Peter) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
misc
25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge
Tue 10/04 2:05 PM
Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 09/30 1:25 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by University McClintock Partners LLC. (Claus, Scot) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Deficiency re Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 09/30 9:20 AM
NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Advocates for Individuals with Disabilities Foundation Incorporated, University McClintock Partners LLC. (KGM) |
|
Thursday, September 29, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
misc
New Case Opened
Fri 09/30 9:16 AM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-13450752. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 16-03323 PHX-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to return the attached Magistrate Election form, in paper, within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions.(KGM) |
|
Att: 1 MAG 25 Instructions | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 09/30 9:10 AM
*NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2016-011327. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13450752 filed by University McClintock Partners LLC (submitted by Scot Claus).(KGM) (KGM). *Modified to correct filing date on 9/30/2016 (KGM) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Att: 4 (9/30/2016) Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet |