Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:14-bk-11916

New Hampshire Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher J Panos
Case #: 1:16-ap-01308
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Oct 03, 2016
Terminated:Mar 19, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Oerlikon Leybold Vacuum GMBH
Represented By
Oerlikon Leybold Vacuum GMBH
contact info
Plaintiff
GT Advanced Technologies Limited
243 Daniel Webster Highway
Merrimack, NH 03054
Represented By
Matthew E. Lane
Sullivan & Worcester LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee
1000 Elm Street Suite 605
Manchester, NH 03101


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Monday, March 19, 2018
court|utility Close Adversary Case|Disposition of Adversary Mon 03/19 9:03 AM
Adversary Case Closed 16-1308 CJP, Disposition of Adversary per notice of stipulated dismissal. (jtp)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 02, 2018
17 17 notice Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (Rule 7041) Fri 03/02 2:45 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice Filed by Plaintiff GT Advanced Technologies Limited (Koslof, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 14, 2017
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Mon 05/15 12:45 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/14/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Friday, May 12, 2017
15 15 order Extend Time Fri 05/12 8:15 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Answer to Complaint to 6/9/17 Related [+] Signed on 5/12/2017. (jtp)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Extend Time filed by Plaintiff GT Advanced Technologies Limited
Thursday, May 11, 2017
14 14 motion Extend Time Thu 05/11 4:01 PM
Assented Motion to Extend Time to File Answer to Complaint to June 9, 2017 (Fourth). Filed by Plaintiff GT Advanced Technologies Limited (Koslof, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 06, 2017
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 04/07 12:50 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/06/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Tuesday, April 04, 2017
12 12 order Extend Time Tue 04/04 8:20 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Answer to Complaint to 5/10/17 Related [+] Signed on 4/4/2017. (jtp)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to Extend Time filed by Plaintiff GT Advanced Technologies Limited
Monday, April 03, 2017
11 11 motion Extend Time Mon 04/03 3:40 PM
Assented Motion to Extend Time to File Answer to Complaint to May 10, 2017 (Third). Filed by Plaintiff GT Advanced Technologies Limited (Koslof, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Saturday, March 11, 2017
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 03/12 12:48 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/11/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Thursday, March 09, 2017
9 9 order Extend Time Thu 03/09 9:30 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Answer to Complaint to 4/10/17 Related [+] Signed on 3/9/2017. (jtp)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Extend Time filed by Plaintiff GT Advanced Technologies Limited
Wednesday, March 08, 2017
8 8 motion Extend Time Wed 03/08 4:41 PM
Assented Motion to Extend Time to File Answer to Complaint to April 10, 2017 (Second) Filed by Plaintiff GT Advanced Technologies Limited (Koslof, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 08, 2017
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 02/09 12:49 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/08/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Friday, February 03, 2017
6 6 order Extend Time Mon 02/06 11:41 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Answer to Complaint to 3/10/17 Related [+] Signed on 2/3/2017. (jtp)
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Extend Time filed by Plaintiff GT Advanced Technologies Limited
5 5 motion Extend Time Fri 02/03 1:46 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Answer to Complaint to March 10, 2017 Filed by Plaintiff GT Advanced Technologies Limited (Koslof, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, December 12, 2016
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed - GTAT Avoidance Complaints ONLY Mon 12/12 4:00 PM
Summons Service Executed on Oerlikon Leybold Vacuum GMBH Date Served 12/12/2016, Answer Due 1/11/2017 . Related [+] (Koslof, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff GT Advanced Technologies Limited
Saturday, November 05, 2016
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Notice (BK) Sun 11/06 12:50 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/05/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, November 03, 2016
2 2 court Summons Issued - GTAT Avoidance Complaints ONLY Thu 11/03 10:19 AM
Summons Issued on Attorney Matthew E. Lane, Esq. to be served on Oerlikon Leybold Vacuum GMBH Date Issued 11/3/2016 Related [+]. (jtp)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff GT Advanced Technologies Limited
Thursday, October 13, 2016
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Thu 10/13 9:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by JP. Receipt Number 107701. (admin)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10/03 12:02 PM
Adversary case 16-01308 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Avoidable Transfers by GT Advanced Technologies Limited against Oerlikon Leybold Vacuum GMBH. Receipt Number CHECK, Fee Amount $ 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Lane, Matthew)
Related: [-]