Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:16-ap-03287
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2016
Terminated:Apr 04, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Attronica Computers, Inc
Represented By
Attronica Computers, Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Cullen Drescher Speckhart
Wolcott Rivers Gates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 04, 2017
10 10 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Tue 04/04 10:48 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2017
9 9 misc Stipulation Mon 04/03 3:06 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee and Between Attronica Computers, Inc. filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2017
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/13 4:51 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by William A. Burnett of Williams Mullen on behalf of Attronica Computers, Inc. (Burnett, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2016
7 7 misc Withdrawal Tue 11/22 2:38 PM
Withdrawal of Motion to Strike Pleading Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)6 Motion to Strike filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Wednesday, November 09, 2016
6 6 motion Strike Wed 11/09 12:21 PM
Motion to Strike Pleading Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)5 Answer to Complaint filed by Attronica Computers, Inc
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, November 07, 2016
5 5 answer None Tue 11/08 2:31 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Helen E. Marmoll of Little Haven Farm on behalf of Attronica Computers, Inc. (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, October 04, 2016
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Tue 10/04 2:36 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Att: 1 Order
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Tue 10/04 1:18 PM
Summons and notice issued to Attronica Computers, Inc Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Friday, September 30, 2016
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 09/30 2:51 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 16-03287 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 24863304, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Fri 09/30 2:34 PM
Adversary case 16-03287 Complaint against Attronica Computers, Inc filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1