In re Foreign Exchange Benchmark Rates Antitrust Litigation
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Lorna G Schofield |
Case #: | 1:13-cv-07789 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 15:1 Antitrust Litigation (Monopolizing Trade) |
Case Filed: | Nov 01, 2013 |
Re-opened: | Mar 13, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 28, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday Jan 23, 2015 6:31 AM EST |
ADR Provider
HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
ADR Provider
HSBC Bank plc
|
Represented By
|
ADR Provider
HSBC Holdings plc
|
Represented By
|
ADR Provider
HSBC North America Holdings, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Defendant
BNP Paribas Group
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Defendant
BNP Paribas North America
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Plaintiff
City of Providence, Rhode Island
|
|
Consolidated Plaintiff
United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-state Pension Fund
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Morgan Stanley
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
RBS Securities, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Goldman, Sachs & Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Barclays Capital Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Bank of America, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bank Of America Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Barclays Bank PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
National Association
|
|
Defendant
Citigroup, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Citigroup, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Credit Suisse Group AG
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Deutsche Bank AG
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JPMorgan Chase & Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank
|
|
Defendant
Royal Bank of Scotland Group, PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UBS AG
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UBS Securities LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System
|
Represented By
|
Miscellaneous
U.S. Department of Justice
|
|
Movant
Fresno County Employees Retirement Association
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The City of Philadelphia, Board of Pensions and Retirement
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Value Recovery Fund LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tiberius OC Fund, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aureus Currency Fund, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Syena Global Emerging Markets Fund, LP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State-Boston Retirement System
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Newport News Employees' Retirement Fund
|
|
Plaintiff
Haverhill Retirement System
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Employees' Retirement System of Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Augustus International Master Fund, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
1. | Another Forex Milestone as BofA Settles Class Action (litigationdaily.com) |
Submitted Fri 04/17/2015 | |
2. | Citi, Barclays close to settling forex lawsuit for $800 million: WSJ (reuters.com) |
Submitted Wed 03/18/2015 | |
3. | Investors to pause forex litigation amid U.S. government probe (reuters.com) |
Submitted Wed 03/11/2015 | |
4. | Big banks fail to dismiss U.S. currency rigging lawsuit (reuters.com) |
Submitted Thu 01/29/2015 | |
5. | JPMorgan settles currency price rigging lawsuit in U.S. (reuters.com) |
Submitted Mon 01/05/2015 | |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
2090 | 2090
6
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/05 6:22 PM
ORDER APPROVING THE CLAIMS ADMINISTRATOR'S DETERMINATIONS REGARDING UNAUTHORIZED CLAIMS AND DISPUTED CLAIMS: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: This Order incorporates by reference the definitions in the Stipulations andAgreements of Settlement filed in this Action (ECF No. 481, Exs. 1-9; ECF No. 822, Exs. 1-5; ECF No. 877, Ex. 1) (the "Settlements"), as well as the filings in opposition by disputed claimants Waraich and McIntosh, and all capitalized terms, unless otherwise defined herein, shall have the same meanings as set forth in the Settlements or the Kovach Declaration. Plaintiffs' plan for the Claims Administrator's determinations regarding Unauthorized Claims and Disputed Claims is APPROVED. Epiq shall distribute payments to the Authorized Claimant in the form of check or wire. If the Authorized Claimant has elected to have its payment sent via wire transfer and subsequently the wire is rejected or returned, the payment will be reissued in the form of a check. In order to encourage the Authorized Claimant to promptly deposit its distribution check, and to avoid or reduce future expenses relating to unpaid distribution checks, all distribution checks will bear a notation "CASH PROMPTLY; VOID AND SUBJECT TO RE-DISTRIBUTION IF NOT NEGOTIATED BY [DATE 90 DAYS AFTER ISSUE DATE]." The administrative determinations of the Claims Administrator to reject in full Disputed Claim Nos. 10005620, 10013815, 2075513, and 10000935 are adopted and said claims are hereby rejected. The administrative determination of the Claims Administrator to reject in part Disputed Claim No. 10013447 is adopted, and the arguments made by said claim are hereby rejected. Disputed Claim No. 10013447 shall be paid its respective pro rata share, subject to a 40% holdback, which will be held in the Reserve until the participation rate by volume and amount of the Net Settlement Fund are determined. The Reserve may also be used to address any contingencies that may arise after the distribution with respect to claims (including any appeals) and/or to pay for any Court-authorized future fees or expenses incurred in connection with administering the Settlements. To the extent the Reserve is not depleted, the remainder will be distributed in a subsequent distribution(s) to Authorized Claimants receiving pro rata payments. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/5/2024) (ate) Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers) |
|
2089 | 2089
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Approve
Fri 04/05 5:08 PM
ORDER granting2075 Motion to Approve Claims Administrator's Determinations Regarding Unauthorized Claims and Disputed Claims. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion that the Court reject the Disputed Claims is GRANTED. An Order approving the Claims Administrator's determinations regarding unauthorized and disputed Claims will issue separately. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at Dkt. 2075. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/5/2024) (vfr) |