Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:16-bk-12396

Pennsylvania Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jean K Fitzsimon
Case #: 2:16-ap-00338
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 03, 2016
Terminated:Feb 02, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Bluegrace Logistics
Dept. 108 P.O. Box 4964
Houston, TX 77210
Plaintiff
William G. Schwab, as Chapter 11 Trustee
Kurtzman | Steady, LLC 401 S. 2nd Street, Suite 200
Philadelphia, PA 19147
Represented By
JEFFREY KURTZMAN
Kurtzman Steady LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 1:10 PM EDT
Thursday, February 02, 2017
utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 02/02 1:59 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:16-ap-338 SETTLED. (S., Antoinette)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 02/02 1:59 PM
Adversary Case 2:16-ap-338 Terminated for Statistical Purposes. (S., Antoinette)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 09, 2016
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 12/10 1:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 12/09/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #7 )
Wednesday, December 07, 2016
7 7 order Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 Wed 12/07 3:17 PM
Order entered Granting Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 against Blue-Grace Logistics, LLC. Related [+] (S., Antoinette)
Related: [-] 4
6 6 court Hearing Held Wed 12/07 12:28 PM
Hearing Held on4 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 Against Blue-Grace Logistics, LLC Filed by William G. Schwab Represented by JEFFREY KURTZMAN (Counsel). Related [+]. E-order entered. (S., Antoinette)
Related: [-] ,4
Wednesday, November 02, 2016
5 5 notice Notice of Motion Wed 11/02 2:03 PM
Notice of Related [+] Filed by William G. Schwab. Hearing scheduled 12/7/2016 at 09:30 AM at nix3 - Courtroom #3. (KURTZMAN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-] 4 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 Against Blue-Grace Logistics, LLC
4 4 motion Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 Wed 11/02 2:02 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 Against Blue-Grace Logistics, LLC Filed by William G. Schwab Represented by JEFFREY KURTZMAN (Counsel). (KURTZMAN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Service List
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 05, 2016
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Wed 10/05 12:22 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Filed by JEFFREY KURTZMAN on behalf of William G. Schwab Related [+]. (KURTZMAN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-] 1 ,2
Tuesday, October 04, 2016
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 10/04 3:52 PM
1 Summons Issued to Plaintiff(s) to be served upon Defendant(s) Bluegrace Logistics Date Issued 10/4/2016, Answer Due 11/3/2016. (G., Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10/03 2:59 PM
Adversary case 16-00338 Complaint by JEFFREY KURTZMAN on behalf of William G. Schwab against Bluegrace Logistics. Fee Amount $350 . (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (KURTZMAN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Mon 10/03 3:01 PM
Receipt of Complaint 16-00338 jkf) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 17913544. Fee Amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1