New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Lashann Dearcy Hall
Referred: Peggy Kuo
Case #: 1:13-cv-06085
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Nov 01, 2013
Last checked: Wednesday May 16, 2018 3:07 PM EDT
Defendant
Moshe Azoulay
Chabad of Bushwick 1087 Flushing Ave. #104
Brooklyn, NY 11237
Represented By
Sima Asad Ali
Ali Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
George Auto Spa, Corp.
Represented By
Sima Asad Ali
Ali Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
142 Knickerbocker Enterprise, Corp.
Represented By
Sima Asad Ali
Ali Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Mocha Management, LLC
Plaintiff
Salvador Santiago Bacilio
Represented By
Alice Fae Davis
Catholic Migration Services
contact info
Stephen James Loffredo
Main Street Legal Services
contact info
William Samuel Massey
Main Street Legal Services, Inc.
contact info
Robert McCreanor
Catholic Migration Office
contact info
Hollis Virginia Pfitsch
Main Street Legal Services, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jose Gonzalez
address redacted
Represented By
Alice Fae Davis
Catholic Migration Services
contact info
Stephen James Loffredo
Main Street Legal Services
contact info
William Samuel Massey
Main Street Legal Services, Inc.
contact info
Robert McCreanor
Catholic Migration Office
contact info
Hollis Virginia Pfitsch
Main Street Legal Services, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Telesforo Torres
Represented By
Alice Fae Davis
Catholic Migration Services
contact info
Stephen James Loffredo
Main Street Legal Services
contact info
William Samuel Massey
Main Street Legal Services, Inc.
contact info
Robert McCreanor
Catholic Migration Office
contact info
Hollis Virginia Pfitsch
Main Street Legal Services, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Santiago Alonso Vazquez
Represented By
Alice Fae Davis
Catholic Migration Services
contact info
Stephen James Loffredo
Main Street Legal Services
contact info
William Samuel Massey
Main Street Legal Services, Inc.
contact info
Robert McCreanor
Catholic Migration Office
contact info
Hollis Virginia Pfitsch
Main Street Legal Services, Inc.
contact info

GPO Mar 20 2018
ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record and as set forth in the attached Order, Plaintiffs' motion 98 for partial summary judgment is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part. Plaintiffs' motion is granted as to their claims for Defendant Azoulay's failure to pay spread of hours and abide by the notice and record-keeping requirements under the New York State Labor Law ("NYLL"). The Court reserves decision on damages. Plaintiffs' motion is denied as to their retaliation claims under both the NYLL and Fair Labor Standards Act. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 3/20/2018. (Garrett, Ruby)
GPO Oct 27 2022
ngs identified. ORDER ATTACHED. Ordered by Judge Eric R. Komitee on 10/27/2022. (AH)MEMORANDUM & ORDER: For these reasons, the Court grants the motion 176 in part, as set forth above. The Court denies the remainder of the motion without prejudice to renewal after trial should Plaintiffs continue to seek to rely on the findi
GPO Mar 20 2024
FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW: The plaintiffs are entitled to damages as specified in the attached order. In addition, the plaintiffs may move for an award of attorney's fees and costs under 29 U.S.C. § 216(b) and NYLL § 663(1) within 21 days of this order. ORDER ATTACHED. Ordered by Judge Eric R. Komitee on 3/20/2024. (CAM)
GPO Oct 07 2024
Amended Memorandum & Order: In response to plaintiffs' Mot. to Amend, ECF No. 221, this order was amended on September 30, 2024 to calculate the applicable minimum wage. The amended order substitutes N.Y. Comp. Codes R. & Regs. tit. 12, § 142 (2013), which sets wage standards in "miscellaneous industries and occupations," for N.Y. Comp. Codes R. & Regs. tit. 12, § 146 (2011), which governs the hospitality industry. The Court has recalculated the damages for each plaintiff and revised Section II(B)(1) to comport with the miscellaneous regulation, alongside minor additional conforming changes. These amendments slightly reduce the damages awarded to plaintiffs by between $6,046.67 and $984.63 per plaintiff. The plaintiffs are entitled to judgment on claims as set forth in the attached order. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to close the case. Ordered by Judge Eric R. Komitee on 10/7/2024. (APJ)
GPO Oct 07 2024
Memorandum & Order: For the reasons set forth above and in Kuo's R&R, the R&R is adopted in its entirety. Reconsideration of the Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law is also denied. The plaintiffs' motion for fees and costs is granted, and defendant is ordered to pay $61,109.03 in attorneys' fees and costs to plaintiffs. ORDER ATTACHED. Ordered by Judge Eric R. Komitee on 10/7/2024. (APJ)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.