Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:William C O'Kelley
Referred: J Clay Fuller
Case #: 2:16-cv-00236
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Oct 03, 2016
Terminated:Dec 22, 2016

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, December 22, 2016
8 8 misc Judgment - Clerk Thu 12/22 3:00 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing the action. (sk)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Order on Final Report and Recommendation Thu 12/22 2:56 PM
ORDER: The court has reviewed the5 report and recommendation and finds it to be correct both in fact and law. It is therefore approved and made the order of the court. The court DISMISSES this matter in its entirety for failure to state a plausible claim for relief. See 28 U.S.C. 1915 A. Signed by Judge William C. O'Kelley on 12/22/16. (sk)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 12/22 2:57 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (sk)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 12/22 3:01 PM
Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Joseph Hooper re7 Order on Final Report and Recommendation,8 Clerk's Judgment. (sk)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2016
utility Submission to District Judge Mon 12/19 8:52 AM
Submission of5 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re4 Amended Complaint filed by Joseph Hooper, submitted to District Judge William C. O'Kelley. (sk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2016
6 6 order Order for Service of Report and Recommendation Wed 11/30 4:14 PM
ORDER for Service of5 Final Report and Recommendation,, by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 11/30/2016. (rsg)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Report and Recommendation - Final Wed 11/30 4:12 PM
FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Plaintiffs4 allegations against Nurse Shook, the sole named Defendant, be DISMISSED for failure to state a plausible claim for relief. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915A. Although Plaintiff was given the opportunity to do so, he has named no other Defendant. Therefore, IT IS ALSO RECOMMENDED that this matter be DISMISSED in its entirety. The Clerk is DIRECTED to withdraw the reference to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 11/30/2016. (rsg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 02, 2016
utility Submission for Frivolity to MJ Wed 11/02 3:19 PM
Submission for Frivolity re:4 Amended Complaint submitted to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (sk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 26, 2016
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Wed 10/26 1:36 PM
Submission of3 Order for amended complaint, to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (rsg)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2016
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 10/26 1:20 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Tony Shook, filed by Joseph Hooper.(rsg)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 07, 2016
3 3 order Order ruling on IFP ~Util - Directing Warden to Collect Monthly Payments from Inmate ~Util - Set Submission Deadline ~Util - Forms Sent Fri 10/07 4:24 PM
ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff is allowed to proceed IFP, however, Plaintiff is obligated to pay $350.00 as funds are deposited into Inmate account. The Warden or the designee shall collect the monthly payments and remit to the Clerk until $350.00 is paid in full. The Clerk SHALL TRANSMIT acopy of this Order to the Warden. Plaintiff has not named an individual Defendant, and he may not sue the Rabun County Detention Center itself. Plaintiff is therefore ORDERED to sign and submit an amended complaint within 28 days. Plaintiff is ADVISED that his amended complaint WILL REPLACE hisoriginal complaint in its entirety. The Clerk is DIRECTED to forward to Plaintiff a 42 U.S.C. § 1983 civil complaint form, together with a copy of this Order. The Clerk is further DIRECTED to RESUBMIT this action to the Magistrate Judge upon receipt of the amended complaint or at the expiration of the 28-day period. Service of process shall not issue until consideration ofPlaintiff's amended complaint for frivolity. Forms sent to party: 42:1983 Forms. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 10/07/16. (sk)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 10/07 4:25 PM
Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Joseph Hooper re3 Order and form as directed. (sk)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 10/07 4:26 PM
Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to WARDEN of Rabun County Detention Center re3 Order Directing Warden to Collect Monthly Payments from Inmate Account. (sk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2016
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Tue 10/04 4:26 PM
Submission of1 Complaint,2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis for ifp and frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (rsg)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2016
2 2 motion Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 10/04 4:24 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joseph Hooper. (rsg)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/04 4:24 PM
COMPLAINT, filed by Joseph Hooper.(rsg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet