Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Thomas N Oneill, Jr
Case #: 2:16-cv-05236
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2016
Terminated:Apr 25, 2017
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 29, 2017 5:58 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
MENTAL HEALTH ASSOCIATION OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By
GUY VILIM
Vilim & Maddox LLC
contact info
NOREEN AMIR
Law Office Guy Vilim LLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
MALIKA BARBER
Represented By
MU'MIN F. ISLAM
Mfi Law Group PLLC
contact info
Defendant
MENTAL HEALTH ASSOCIATION OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By
GUY VILIM
Vilim & Maddox LLC
contact info
NOREEN AMIR
Law Office Guy Vilim LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
MALIKA BARBER
Represented By
MU'MIN F. ISLAM
Mfi Law Group PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 25, 2017
17 17 order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Tue 04/25 3:59 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 04-25-17. 04-25-17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED.(do, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 13, 2017
16 16 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 04/13 4:40 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by MENTAL HEALTH ASSOCIATION OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA. (AMIR, NOREEN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2017
15 15 answer Answer to Counterclaim Thu 03/09 3:36 PM
PLAINTIFFS AMENDED ANSWER to10 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim PLAINTIFF'S ANSWER TO DEFENDANTS COUNTERCLAIM AND NEW MATTER by MALIKA BARBER.(ISLAM, MU'MIN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2017
14 14 answer Answer to Counterclaim Tue 03/07 12:14 PM
PLAINTIFFS ANSWER to10 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim ANSWER TO DEFENDANTS COUNTERCLAIM by MALIKA BARBER.(ISLAM, MU'MIN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 14, 2017
13 13 order Scheduling Order Wed 02/15 9:37 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 5/2/17. ANY DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS AND/OR DAUBERT MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 7/3/17. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 2/14/17. 2/15/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2017
12 12 minutes In Chambers Conference Fri 02/03 1:39 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR In Chambers Conference held on 2/3/2017. (do, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 01, 2017
11 11 order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 02/01 3:53 PM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND PLAINTIFF'S SUBSEQUENT FILIN OF AN AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 2/1/17.2/1/17 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Counterclaim Wed 02/01 1:59 PM
ANSWER to6 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against MALIKA BARBER by MENTAL HEALTH ASSOCIATION OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA.(AMIR, NOREEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, January 05, 2017
9 9 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 01/05 4:47 PM
ORDER THAT A RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED TO 2/2/17 AT 10:00 AM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 1/5/17. 1/5/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
Related: [-]
8 8 order Order Setting Answer Deadline Thu 01/05 4:41 PM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT MUST SERVE THEIR ANSWER OR OTHER RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT BY 2/1/17. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 1/5/17. 1/5/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 01/05 11:33 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by MENTAL HEALTH ASSOCIATION OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA.certificate of service.(AMIR, NOREEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 28, 2016
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 12/28 4:33 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against MENTAL HEALTH ASSOCIATION OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE AND VERIFICATION filed by MALIKA BARBER.(jaa, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2016
5 5 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 12/14 11:59 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by MENTAL HEALTH ASSOCIATION OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service.(AMIR, NOREEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, December 12, 2016
4 4 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 12/13 10:45 AM
ORDER THAT A RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 1/23/17 AT 10:30 AM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 12/12/16. 12/13/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 06, 2016
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/06 1:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by GUY VILIM on behalf of MENTAL HEALTH ASSOCIATION OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA with Certificate of Service(VILIM, GUY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/06 1:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by NOREEN AMIR on behalf of MENTAL HEALTH ASSOCIATION OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA with Certificate of Service(AMIR, NOREEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, September 30, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/04 11:42 AM
COMPLAINT against MENTAL HEALTH ASSOCIATION OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 147950.), filed by MALIKA BARBER.(jwl, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
service Summons Issued Tue 10/04 11:42 AM
Summons Issued as to MENTAL HEALTH ASSOCIATION OF SOUTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA. One Forwarded To: Counsel on 10/4/16 (jwl, )
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Tue 10/04 11:43 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MALIKA BARBER. (jwl, )
Related: [-]