Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-16885

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurel M Isicoff
Case #: 1:16-ap-01543
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 04, 2016
Terminated:Feb 17, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
KC Exclusive, Inc. dba Zenana
Represented By
KC Exclusive, Inc. dba Zenana
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles M. Berk
GrayRobinson, P.A. c/o Steven J. Solomon, Esq. 333 SE 2nd Avenue, Suite 3200
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Steven J. Solomon, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Thursday, September 24, 2020
21 21 misc Satisfaction of Judgment Thu 09/24 2:39 PM
Satisfaction of Judgment Filed by Interested Party G.R Isidro . (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2017
20 20 court Close Adversary Case Fri 02/17 10:21 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-1543 Closed. Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 28, 2017
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 01/29 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/28/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Notice of Entry (Re:15 Default Final Judgment)
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 01/29 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/28/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Notice of Entry (Re:15 Default Final Judgment)
Thursday, January 26, 2017
17 17 misc Certificate of Service Thu 01/26 1:55 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-] 15 Default Judgment,16 Notice of Entry of Judgment
16 16 court Notice of Entry of Judgment Thu 01/26 9:51 AM
Notice of Entry Related [+] (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] 15 Default Final Judgment
15 15 order Default Judgment [Order] Thu 01/26 9:50 AM
Default Final Judgment Against Defendant KC Exclusive, Inc. d/b/a Zenana . (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2017
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 01/14 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 01/13/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order Granting Motion for Default Final Judgment Against Defendant Re:11
Wednesday, January 11, 2017
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Wed 01/11 2:50 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Order Granting Motion for Default Final Judgment Against Defendant, Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-] 12 Order on Miscellaneous Motion
12 12 order Miscellaneous Motion Order Wed 01/11 11:35 AM
Order Granting Motion for Default Final Judgment Against Defendant Re: #11 (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2016
11 11 motion Miscellaneous Motion Tue 12/20 3:00 PM
Motion For Default Final Judgment Against Defendant Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 17, 2016
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 12/18 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 12/17/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant KC EXCLUSIVE, INC. d/b/a ZENANA (Re:1 Adversary case 16-01543 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against KC Exclusive, Inc. dba Zenana. to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A))
Thursday, December 15, 2016
9 9 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 12/15 11:32 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant KC EXCLUSIVE, INC. d/b/a ZENANA Related [+] (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 16-01543 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against KC Exclusive, Inc. dba Zenana. to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)
Wednesday, December 14, 2016
8 8 motion Miscellaneous Motion Wed 12/14 11:09 AM
Verified Motion Entry of Clerk's Default Against Defendant Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2016
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Mon 12/12 2:30 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-] 5 Notice of Hearing Amended/Renoticed/Continued
Friday, December 09, 2016
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing-Hearing BK Sat 12/10 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Related [+] Notice Date 12/09/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Re- Notice of Pretrial Conference scheduled for 01/11/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128.
Wednesday, December 07, 2016
5 5 court Notice of Hearing [Amd/Rntc/Cntd] (AP) Wed 12/07 2:09 PM
Re- Notice of Pretrial Conference scheduled for 01/11/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2016
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Wed 10/19 11:51 AM
Certificate of Service regarding the (i) Complaint, (ii) Summons, (iii) Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial, and (iv) Order Granting and Modifying Liquidating Trustee's Motion for Order Establishing Uniform Procedures for Preference Adversary Proceedings [D.E. #1104, Main Case] Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk,2 Summons Issued,3 Order Setting Requirements
Wednesday, October 05, 2016
3 3 order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Wed 10/05 2:08 PM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 30 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 10/05 2:06 PM
Summons Issued on KC Exclusive, Inc. dba Zenana Answer Due 11/4/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/04/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk
Tuesday, October 04, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/04 4:34 PM
Adversary case 16-01543 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against KC Exclusive, Inc. dba Zenana. to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 10/04 4:36 PM
Receipt of Complaint 16-01543 LMI) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 28409395. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]