Finney v. Farber et al
Connecticut District Court | |
Judge: | Victor A Bolden |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-01677 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 06, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 04, 2017 5:02 AM EDT |
Defendant
James Farber
|
|
Defendant
Michael Wright
|
|
Plaintiff
John K Finney
22 Grove Street Apt. A306
Windsor Locks, CT 06096 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 10/23 9:47 AM
MANDATE of USCA dated 10/19/2017 Dismissing15 Notice of Appeal filed by John K Finney (Payton, R.) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Fri 09/15 3:50 PM
ORDER denying20 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/15/2017. (Giammatteo, J.) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Docket Annotation
Tue 08/22 3:35 PM
Docket Entry Correction re20 MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint. Attachment as main document due to missing pages with original. (Hernandez, T.) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Amend/Correct
Thu 08/17 2:45 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint by John K Finney.Responses due by 9/6/2017 (Hernandez, T.) |
|
19 | 19
appeal
USCA Appeal Fees
Wed 08/16 9:38 AM
USCA Appeal Fees received from John Finney: $ 505.00 receipt number CTXH00012940 re15 Notice of Appeal filed by John K Finney,17 Clerk's Certificate re: Notice of Appeal, (Hernandez, T.) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 08/07 3:32 PM
ORDER denying16 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. For the reasons stated in the Recommended Ruling and Order Adopting Recommended Ruling, the Court finds that this appeal would be taken without merit. Accordingly, this motion is denied. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/7/2017.(Ghosh, S.) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
appeal
Clerk's Certificate re: Notice of Appeal
Mon 03/20 2:23 PM
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE RE: INDEX AND RECORD ON APPEAL re:15 Notice of Appeal. The attached docket sheet is hereby certified as the entire Index/Record on Appeal in this matter and electronically sent to the Court of Appeals, with the exception of any manually filed documents as noted below. Robin D. Tabora, Clerk. Documents manually filed not included in this transmission: none (Enderlin, M.) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/20 2:18 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John K Finney.(Enderlin, M.) |
|
Att: 1 Financial Affidavit | ||
15 | 15
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Mon 03/20 2:16 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by John K Finney. (Enderlin, M.) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Judgment
Tue 03/14 10:00 AM
JUDGMENT entered in favor of James Farber, Michael Wright against John K Finney. For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms Signed by Clerk on 3/14/2017.(Perez, J.) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Order
Thu 03/09 3:52 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Order. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/9/2017. (Ghosh, S.) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order
Thu 03/09 11:47 AM
ORDER adopting10 RECOMMENDED RULING. The Clerk is directed to close this file. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/9/2017. (Ghosh, S.) |
|
order
Order on Recommended Ruling
Thu 03/09 3:36 PM
ORDER adopting10 Recommended Ruling. See ECF No.12 . Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/9/2017. (Ghosh, S.) |
||
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
trial
Exhibit
Fri 02/24 1:22 PM
EXHIBIT A by John K Finney. (Shafer, J.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit H | ||
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Recommended Ruling
Thu 02/02 11:02 AM
RECOMMENDED RULING : For the reasons set forth in the attached Recommended Ruling, the Undersigned recommends that Plaintiff's complaint be dismissed under 28 U.S.C. sec. 1915(e)(2)(B). This is a Recommended Ruling. Any objection must be filed within 14 days after service. Objections due by 2/16/2017. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 2/2/17.(Cates, S) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 02/02 11:01 AM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis based upon the financial affidavit provided, but for the reasons set forth in the Recommended Ruling filed herewith, the Undersigned recommends that this action be dismissed under 28 U.S.C. sec. 1915(e)(2)(b). Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 2/2/17. (Cates, S) |
|
Wednesday, November 16, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
trial
Exhibit
Wed 11/16 3:31 PM
Addendum by John K Finney re1 Complaint. (Sundie, T) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Thursday, October 06, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
order
Protective Order
Fri 10/07 10:49 AM
STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/6/16. (Sundie, T) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order on Pretrial Deadlines
Fri 10/07 10:47 AM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 1/6/17. Amended Pleadings due by 12/5/2016. Discovery due by 4/7/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 5/7/2017. Signed by Clerk on 10/6/16. (Sundie, T) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Order
Fri 10/07 10:44 AM
MOTION to Participate in Electronic Filing by John K Finney. (Sundie, T) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Consent to Electronic Notice
Fri 10/07 10:40 AM
Consent to Electronic Notice by John K Finney. (Sundie, T) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 10/07 10:38 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John K Finney. (Sundie, T) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 10/07 10:31 AM
COMPLAINT against James Farber, Michael Wright, filed by John K Finney. (Sundie, T) |