California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:16-mc-01137
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2016
Last checked: Sunday Dec 11, 2016 2:41 PM PST
Interested Party
Thomas Michael Abbott
300 South Grand Avenue 14th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071
Interested Party
Paul Francis Adams
Interested Party
James Francis Ahern
CA Department of Transportation 100 South Main Suite 1300
Los Angeles, CA 90012
Interested Party
David Todd Alexander
Interested Party
Terry Lloyd Allen
13751 Brenan Way
Santa Ana, CA 92705
Interested Party
James Rudolph Andrews
Interested Party
Lauren M. Arens
2358 Unversity Ave #685
San Diego, CA 92104
Interested Party
J. Clark Aristei
Interested Party
Douglas Alan Bader
Interested Party
Susan Marie Bales
Interested Party
Aslan Bananzadeh
Interested Party
Joel Richard Bander
3400 S. Barrington Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90066
Interested Party
Elizabeth Ann Barker
Interested Party
Hitesh Surendra Barot
13390 Fairfield Lane Apt. 143J
Seal beach, CA 90740
Interested Party
Thomas Victor Barrington
1726 Wensley Avenue
El Centro, CA 92243
Interested Party
Steven Joseph Barth
4480 Hacienda Drive, C-261
Pleasanton, CA 94588
Interested Party
Marisa M Bavand
300 E. Pine Street
Seattle, WA 98122
Interested Party
Judith Lillian Bayard
4053 8th Avenue Apt. 10
San Diego, CA 92103
Interested Party
Thomas James Bayard
20651 Golden Springs Drive, #240
Diamond Bar, CA 91789
Interested Party
Ronald Bret Beattie
Interested Party
Glenn Frank Beckett
Interested Party
Stephen Howard Beecher
P.O. Box 57077
Sherman Oaks, CA 91413
Interested Party
Lynn Larson Bell
5795 Waverly
La Jolla, CA 92037
Interested Party
R. G. Bellows
Interested Party
Donna Sternicki Beltran
200 E. Long Lake Road
Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304
Interested Party
Douglas William Benson
Interested Party
Joseph Malte Bickley
Interested Party
Lynne Patrice Bigley
1865 Plumas Street
Reno, NV 89509
Interested Party
Dougals James Billings
Interested Party
Elizabeth Kassay Bohannon
888 Brannan Street 3rd Floor
San Francisco, CA 94103
Interested Party
Stephen Kent Bollinger
261 Beacon Highland Road E
Stevenson, WA 98648
Interested Party
Samantha C Booth
Interested Party
Samantha C. Booth
Interested Party
David Jay Brezner
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP 1 Market Street, Spear Tower
San Francisco, CA 94105
Interested Party
Robert Hafen Briggs
Interested Party
Templeton Briggs, Jr.
Interested Party
Richard Charles Brizendine
59 64th Place
Long Beach, CA 90803
Interested Party
David Julian Brown
1135 Ulloa Street
San Francisco, CA 94127
Interested Party
Floyd Ray Brown
2794 Gateway Road
Carlsbad, CA 92009
Interested Party
Brendt Curtis Butler
Interested Party
Ann Aekyung Byun
Interested Party
Scott Michael Cantor
410 S. Rampart Blvd Suite 390
Las Veags, NV 89145
Interested Party
Stephen Eugene Carr
Interested Party
Meridith Lynn Casat
Interested Party
Betty Jane Champlin
Interested Party
Sandra Muller Chazen
Interested Party
Michael R Chiapetta
8 Springwood Avenue
Ardsley, NY 10502
Interested Party
Stephen Kenneth Chrysler
Interested Party
Rick Clabby
Interested Party
Linda Hope Clarke
2342 Shattuck Avenue, #187
Berkeley, CA 94704
Interested Party
James Bryon Cohoon
Interested Party
Roland Lee Coleman, Jr
Interested Party
Christin Holly Crawford
8601 Anderson Mill Road Unit 1221
Austin, TX 78729
Interested Party
Michael Howard Crosby
Interested Party
Andrew Abram Cross
Interested Party
Daniel William Crotta
Interested Party
Jayne Frances Cucchiara
4330 30th Street, Unit 226
San Diego, CA 92104
Interested Party
Anthony Angelo DeCorso
Interested Party
Bernard Richard Deetman
Interested Party
Anthony Ross Delling
Interested Party
Michael Howard Diamond
Interested Party
Robert Doug Donesky
10083 Birchville Road
Nevada City, CA 95959
Interested Party
Helen Lalich Duncan
Interested Party
B. Kwaku Duren
420 N. Poinsetta Avenue
Compton, CA 90221
Interested Party
Kent Wycliffe Easter
Interested Party
Stacy Lea Edwards
144 E. Washington Avenue
Escondido, CA 92025
Interested Party
Woodrow Douglas English , III
674 County Square Drive Suite 101
Ventura, CA 93003
Interested Party
Kristin Lynn Epperson
Interested Party
David John Estes
Interested Party
Catherine Anne Evans
Interested Party
Joanne Elaine Evoy
Ofc District Attorney P.O. Box 121001
San Diego, CA 92112
Interested Party
Arthur Evry
Interested Party
Michael J Farrell
Interested Party
Linda Beth Fenton
Interested Party
Glenn Michael Finch
2801 Camino del Rio South Suite 305
San Diego, CA 92108
Interested Party
Enzo Finelli
62 Broad Meadow Road
Needham, MA 02492
Interested Party
Alice L Fontier
Interested Party
James Harry Fosbinder
Interested Party
George Douglas Fout
Interested Party
Ernest Richard Fraley
Interested Party
Lee Howard Freedman
Interested Party
Paul Leo Freese, Jr
Interested Party
Alastair James Gamble
2425 E. Camelback Road Suite 900
Phoenix, AZ 85016
Interested Party
Joseph E Gerbac
Interested Party
Stefan Ghaemi
Law Offices of David J. Semaan 671 S. Mollison Avenue Suite G
El Cajon, CA 92020
Interested Party
Ann Marie Ghazarians
Interested Party
David Erwin Gilbert
Interested Party
Ronnie Richard Gipson, Jr
201 Mission Street Suite 1200
San Francisco, CA 94105
Interested Party
Mark Andrew Golovach
Interested Party
Michael Alan Grant
Interested Party
Michael Joseph Gray
Interested Party
Andrea Jacqueline Green
Interested Party
Linda Kay Grimes
Interested Party
James Edward Griswold
100 Oceangate 12th Floor, Suite 432
Long Beach, CA 90802
Interested Party
David Scott Grove
2800 Donald Douglas Loop N
Santa Monica, CA 90405
Interested Party
Orrin Leigh Grover, III
Interested Party
Jerry Gruenbaum
Interested Party
Eric Guerrero
Interested Party
Larry Gene Gutteridge
Interested Party
Rodger B Haglund , II
Interested Party
Jeb Bradley Hall
Interested Party
Amanda Gerke Halter
Interested Party
Gregory Lee Handevidt
12 Civic Center Plz, # 2070 P.O. Box 1059
Mankato, MN 56002
Interested Party
Krishna Gene Haney
Interested Party
Belinda Marie Hein
5554 Trinity Way
San Diego, CA 92120
Interested Party
Thomas Mortimer Herlihy
Interested Party
Ryan Coby Hess
Interested Party
Daniel Eugene Hibbard
Benthale, McKibbin & McKnight 1450 Iowa Avenue Suite 210
Riverside, CA 92507
Interested Party
David Allen Hiersekorn
170 E. Yorba Linda Blvd., #435
Placentia, CA 92870
Interested Party
Ronald Gene Holbert
Interested Party
Art Hoomiratana
Interested Party
Gordon Keith Hubel
Interested Party
William Joseph Hudak
5450 Collier Ave.
San Diego, CA 92115
Interested Party
Byung-Kyun Robert Hyun
Interested Party
Laura Elizabeth Innes
Interested Party
R. Timothy Ireland
31878 Del Obispo St. Ste. 118-500
San Juan Capistrano, CA 92675
Interested Party
Kelly Scott Johnson
Interested Party
Kenneth Gerald Jones
169 Firestone Drive
Walnut Creek, CA 94598
Interested Party
Richard Allen Jones
Interested Party
Eskinder Kebret
103 Portola Place
San Pablo, CA 94806
Interested Party
Maxwell P. Keith
Interested Party
David Bruce Koch
14655 Preston Road Suite 600
Dallas, TX 75254
Interested Party
Richard Michael Koep
2655 1st Street Suite 250
Simi Valley, CA 93065
Interested Party
Paul Martin Krekorian
Los Angeles City Hall 200 N. Spring Street Suite
Los Angeles, CA 90012
Interested Party
Deepa Krishnan
Interested Party
Ann Elizabeth LaVoy
Interested Party
Daniel Bernard Lantry
Interested Party
Derek Leon Ledda
Interested Party
Rosanna Garza Lipscomb
Interested Party
Charles Conrad LoBello
7255 Sunset Road, # 2124
Las Vegas, NV 89113
Interested Party
Brooke Anne Loesby
Interested Party
Richard Lee Lugge
Interested Party
Marcus Aaron Luna
Interested Party
Chalotte Ninomiya Makoff
818 Van Ness Avenue Apt. 307
San Francisco, CA 94109
Interested Party
James Nasos Mancuso
Interested Party
Matthew Glenn Markham
1437 39th Street, SE
Puyallup, WA 98372
Interested Party
John Edwin Masek
Interested Party
Patricia Ann Meyer
1286 University Avenue Suite 529
San Diego, CA 92103
Interested Party
Cynthia Ann Mobley
2000 Stock Creek Road
Knoxville, TN 37920
Interested Party
David Scott Mohney
33736 Frazier Road
Auberry, CA 93602
Interested Party
Ronny Mor
Interested Party
Stephen Thomas Mugglebee
Interested Party
Russell Bret Murphy
24909 SE 41st Drive
Issaquah, WA 98029
Interested Party
Saira Karim Najam
Interested Party
Carlos Francisco Negrete
P.O. Box 60015
North Charleston, SC 29419
Interested Party
Alan Douglas Negron
Interested Party
Caroline B Nelson
Interested Party
Erik Aloisy Nowacki
Interested Party
David Peter O'Brien
Interested Party
Amy Elaine Owens
Interested Party
Paula Jo Page
35 Crest Road
Lafayette, CA 94549
Interested Party
Joseph Darrell Palmer
Interested Party
Gary Wanki Park
Interested Party
Deborah E Parker
Interested Party
John Cardinal Parks
Interested Party
James Mazi Parsa
P.O. Box 147
Tustin, CA 92781
Interested Party
Mary Lynne Perry
Interested Party
Huggy Lamar Price
Interested Party
Michael Alan Qualls
Interested Party
Paula Quintiliani
Interested Party
Manuel Luis Ramirez
Interested Party
Cory Michael Ravid
Interested Party
Ronald Leland-Walter Reich
272 Carnegie Avenue Apt. 148
Claremont, CA 91711
Interested Party
Douglas Jay Renert
Interested Party
Stephanie Rae Renner
Interested Party
Jon N Robbins
Interested Party
Clifford Wiley Roberts
Interested Party
Mark Duncan Rochelle
Interested Party
Lynne Margery Romano
530 S.Lake Avenue #533
Pasadena, CA 91101
Interested Party
Jessica Wendy Rossman
Interested Party
Charles Philip Rullman
Interested Party
Gregory Victor Ruzicka
Interested Party
Ruben Daniel Sanchez
Law Offices of Ruben D Sanchez 45902 Oasis Street Suite C
Indio, CA 92201
Interested Party
Lisa Marie Schull
Interested Party
Kim Dennise Scovis
1534 N. Moorpark Road, #342
Thousand Oaks, CA 91360
Interested Party
Dardashti Shahram
10018 Santa Fe Springs Road
Santa Fe Springs, CA 90670
Interested Party
Peter Shenas
Interested Party
Rae Diane Shirer
3857 Birch Street, #113
Newport Beach, VA 92660
Interested Party
David Roger Sholis
Interested Party
Herchel McCoy Sims
7668 El Camino Real Suite 438
La Costa, CA 92009
Interested Party
Rodney Scott Sims
P.O. Box 1629
Fulton, TX 78358
Interested Party
Jerri Lynn Solomon
Interested Party
Matthew Lee Spiegel
3525 Del Mar Heights Road Box 935
San Diego, CA 92130
Interested Party
Kathy Wagner Stein
5050 E. Garford Street, #173
Long Beach, CA 90815
Interested Party
Gerald Howard Sternberg
Interested Party
Thomas Nelson Stewart, III
Interested Party
Robert L Stolebarger
Holme Roberts and Owen 560 Mission Street, Floor 25
San Francisco, CA 94105
Interested Party
Michael B. Stone
848 N. Rainbow Blvd., #1799 Suite 200
Las Vegas, NV 89107
Interested Party
Gregory James Stuman
1107 2nd Street PMB 521
Encinitas, CA 92024
Interested Party
Kay L Sunday
Interested Party
Robert Elliott Suttle
Interested Party
Susan Ann Swingle
1343 Masselin Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90019
Interested Party
Jennifer Lane Taylor
401 N. Buffalo Drive Suite 202
Las Vegas, NV 89145
Interested Party
Natalie Elaine Taylor
Interested Party
Kimberly Perry Teal
Interested Party
John Christen Torjesen
907 Westwood Blvd., # 390
Los Angeles, CA 90024
Interested Party
Vi Katerina Tran
Interested Party
Geraldine Anthea Valdez
Interested Party
Jacqueline Iola Valenzuela
Interested Party
Max Benjamin Valerio
9863 S 2240 E
Sandy, UT 84092
Interested Party
Paul Ernest Vallone
Hinshaw and Culbertson One California St 18th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111
Interested Party
Michelle Jodi Wachs
Interested Party
Robert Lee Waldman
Interested Party
Matthew McDonnell Walsh
Interested Party
Robert James Waters
Interested Party
Joel Mark Weinstein
Interested Party
Stuart Weinstein
29 Pisano Street
Ladera Ranch, CA 92694
Interested Party
Dennis Joseph Whelan
Interested Party
Anthony Wayne White
Wells Fargo 600 California Street
San Francisco, CA 94108
Interested Party
Lonnie Michael Wilson
701 Palomar Airport Road Suite 202
Carlsbad, CA 92011
Interested Party
Debra Ann Winiarski
Interested Party
Jack Marvin Winick
Interested Party
David Wyser
14210 E Windriver Lane
Reno, NV 89511
Interested Party
Jessica Lynne Yared


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 29, 2020
29 29 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Wed 04/29 2:29 PM
Order Reinstating Samantha C. Booth. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 4/29/2020. (rmc)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Reconsideration Wed 04/29 11:03 AM
Application for Reinstatement re17 Order of Suspension, by Samantha C. Booth. (rmc)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2018
25 25 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Mon 01/22 12:17 PM
ORDER Granting24 Motion for Modification of Order of Reinstatement of Pro Hac Vice Admission. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 1/22/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mxn)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2017
24 24 2 pgs motion Order Fri 12/29 1:15 PM
MOTION for Modification of Order of Reinstatement of Pro Hac Vice Admission by John Cardinal Parks. (jrm)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2017
23 23 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Tue 12/12 8:24 AM
ORDER of Reinstatement of Pro Hac Vice Admission (ECF No.22 ). Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 12/11/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mxn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2017
22 22 motion Reconsideration Thu 11/02 1:00 PM
MOTION for Reinstatement of Pro Hac Vice Status re17 Order of Suspension, by John Cardinal Parks. (jrm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2017
21 21 misc Mail Returned Tue 07/18 5:50 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred. Mail sent to Lauren M. Arens. (mpl)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2017
20 20 misc Mail Returned Tue 04/18 3:23 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred,. Mail sent to Kim D. Scovis. (mxn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2017
19 19 misc Mail Returned Fri 04/07 9:11 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred. Mail sent to Matthew Spiegel. No Forwarding Address. (dsn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2016
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Wed 12/14 9:36 AM
NOTICE of mailing re17 Order of Disbarment/Suspension. Copies mailed to attorney addresses listed in California State Bar Records. (jpp)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Order of Suspension Wed 12/14 9:34 AM
ORDER of Disbarment/Suspension. The Court Orders that the attorneys listed within as being disbarred by the State Bar of California are disbarred from membership in the bar of this court. The Court also orders that the attorneys listed within as being suspended or placed on the inactive list by the State Bar of California are suspended from membership in the bar of this court. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 12/08/2016.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 01, 2016
16 16 order Order Thu 12/01 4:24 PM
ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause as to J. Clark Aristei. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 11/30/2016.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order Thu 12/01 4:21 PM
ORDER of Suspension of Belinda Marie Hein. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 11/30/2016.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2016
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 11/18 3:30 PM
ANSWER to Complaint Declaration of Belinda Hein re OSC by Belinda Marie Hein.(Shippee, Joanna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit CA State Bar letter
Thursday, November 10, 2016
13 13 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Thu 11/10 10:41 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by J. Clark Aristei.(Aristei, J)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit (1) Letter re: Reinstatement to Active in Good Standing Status by California State Bar
Thursday, November 03, 2016
12 12 misc Mail Returned Thu 11/03 2:06 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred. Mail sent to Natalie Elaine Taylor. No forwarding address. (jah)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Mail Returned Thu 11/03 1:41 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred. Mail sent to Woodrow D. English, III. No forwarding address. (jah)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Mail Returned Thu 11/03 1:40 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred. Mail sent to Lonnie Michael Wilson. No forwarding address. (jah)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Mail Returned Thu 11/03 1:14 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred. Mail sent to James Edward Griswold. No forwarding address. (jah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 01, 2016
8 8 misc Mail Returned Tue 11/01 11:46 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred. Mail sent to Mark A. Golovach. No forwarding address. (jah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 27, 2016
7 7 misc Mail Returned Thu 10/27 2:25 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred. Mail sent to Matthew M. Walsh. No forwarding address. (jah)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Mail Returned Thu 10/27 12:33 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred,. Mail sent to Huggy L. Price. No forwarding address. (jah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2016
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Fri 10/21 2:25 PM
NOTICE of Mailing re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred. Related [+] (jah)
Related: [-] c'd in Docketing on 10/20/2016
4 4 misc Mail Returned Thu 10/20 10:27 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred. Mail sent to Michael Qualls. Returned as not at address. No forwarding address. (jah)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs misc Mail Returned Thu 10/20 9:57 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred. Mail sent to James N. Mancuso. No forwarding address. (jah)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Mail Returned Thu 10/20 9:56 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred. Mail sent to Andrea J. Green. Returned as vacant. No forwarding address. (jah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2016
1 1 7 pgs order Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred Tue 10/11 3:48 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, In the Matter of Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred by the State of California. Court orders the listed attorneys to show cause, in writing within thirty (30) days of the service of this Order, why they should not be suspended or disbarred from practicing in this Court. Clerk directed to serve a copy of this Order upon each of the listed attorneys. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 10/5/2016. (All Listed Attorneys served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
Related: [-]