Kabba v. Williams et al
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Jeffery S Frensley |
Referred: | Jeffery S Frensley |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-02718 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Oct 13, 2016 |
Terminated: | Dec 19, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 11, 2017 4:32 AM CDT |
Defendant
Raymond Williams, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fanta Kabba
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Swift Transportation Services, LLC
Terminated: 01/12/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TRUSTGARD INSURANCE COMPANY
Terminated: 12/12/2016
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Nov 15 2017
MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 11/15/2017. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) |
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
49 | 49
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 12/19 5:43 PM
JUDGMENT: This action having come before the Court on the parties Joint Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice, filed on December 7, 2017 (Docket No.48 ); IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that, in accordance with the Order of Dismissal With Prejudice, all claims by Plaintiff against Defendant are hereby Dismissed With Prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 12/19/2017. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (mg) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
48 | 48
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 12/07 3:19 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC, Raymond Williams, Jr. (Gomez, Erin) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
47 | 47
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 11/27 4:30 PM
ORDER: On November 21, 2017, the parties filed a Notice of Settlement. Docket No.46 . The Pretrial Conference scheduled for December 11, 2017, and the Jury Trial set for December 19, 2017, are CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 11/27/2017. (mg) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
46 | 46
notice
Notice of Settlement
Tue 11/21 9:17 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC, Raymond Williams, Jr (Gomez, Erin) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
45 | 45
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Wed 11/15 9:58 AM
ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the accompanying memorandum opinion44 the Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket No.30 ) is hereby DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 11/15/2017. (mg) |
|
44 | 44
5
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion of the Court
Wed 11/15 9:12 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 11/15/2017. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (mg) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
43 | 43
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 06/29 1:24 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re30 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC, Raymond Williams, Jr. (Gomez, Erin) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
42 | 42
order
Order on Motion for Leave
Tue 06/27 8:25 AM
ORDER: Motion41 GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 6/26/2017. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (mg) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
motion
Leave
Tue 06/13 2:24 PM
First MOTION for Leave to re30 First MOTION for Summary Judgment to file a Reply in Support by Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC, Raymond Williams, Jr. (Gomez, Erin) |
|
40 | 40
notice
Notice of Filing
Tue 06/13 2:19 PM
NOTICE of Filing by Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC, Raymond Williams, Jr re30 First MOTION for Summary Judgment of Additional Supporting Exhibit(Gomez, Erin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Additional Excerpt from Plaintiff's Deposition Testimony | ||
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Certificate
Thu 06/08 11:50 AM
CERTIFICATE Certificate of Service filed by Fanta Kabba re35 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Fanta Kabba. (Cartee, Eric) |
|
38 | 38
motion
Amend/Correct
Thu 06/08 11:43 AM
MOTION to Amend/Correct34 Response in Opposition to Motion Certificate of Service by Fanta Kabba. (Cartee, Eric) |
|
37 | 37
motion
Amend/Correct
Thu 06/08 11:39 AM
MOTION to Amend/Correct36 Response in Opposition to Motion Certificate of Service by Fanta Kabba. (Cartee, Eric) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
misc
Annotation - Docket
Wed 06/07 2:55 PM
Note to Filer re DE#s34 ,35 , and36 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for these documents. (mg) |
||
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 06/06 3:33 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re30 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fanta Kabba. (Cartee, Eric) |
|
35 | 35
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 06/06 3:30 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re30 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fanta Kabba.(Cartee, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 | ||
34 | 34
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 06/06 3:24 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re30 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fanta Kabba. (Cartee, Eric) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Status Report
Tue 05/30 1:06 PM
STATUS REPORT of Parties' Alternative Dispute Resolution Attempts by Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC, Raymond Williams, Jr. (Gomez, Erin) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Statement of facts
Tue 05/16 2:56 PM
STATEMENT of facts filed by Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC, Raymond Williams, Jr in support of30 Motion for Summary Judgment,. (Gomez, Erin) |
|
31 | 31
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Tue 05/16 2:55 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of30 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC, Raymond Williams, Jr . (Gomez, Erin) |
|
30 | 30
motion
Summary Judgment
Tue 05/16 2:53 PM
First MOTION for Summary Judgment by Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC, Raymond Williams, Jr.(Gomez, Erin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Raymond Williams, Jr., | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Affidavit of Tennessee State Trooper Alexander Campbell with Attachment, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Relevant Excerpts of Fanta Kabba's Deposition Testimony, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Map of Accident Location, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Relevant Excerpts from Fanta Kabba's Medical Records | ||
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order
Thu 05/04 8:38 AM
ORDER: The jury trial remains scheduled for December 19, 2017, at 9:00 a.m. The courtroom shall be announced at the pretrial conference. The pretrial conference remains set on December 11, 2017, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 661, United States Courthouse, 801 Broadway, Nashville, TN. All lawyers who will participate in the trial must attend the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 5/3/2017. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (mg) |
|
minutes
Telephone Conference
Wed 05/03 3:26 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley: Telephone Conference held on 5/3/2017; trial remains scheduled for Dec. 19, 2017. (Not Recorded.) (hv) |
||
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 04/26 8:38 AM
NOTICE by Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC, Raymond Williams, Jr re23 First MOTION to Compel Responses to Requests for Production to Strike (Gomez, Erin) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Thu 04/13 3:53 PM
ORDER granting26 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 4/13/2017. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (hb) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Wed 04/12 1:40 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Fanta Kabba. (Cartee, Eric) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Filing
Wed 04/05 3:36 PM
NOTICE of Filing by Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC re23 First MOTION to Compel Responses to Requests for Production (Gomez, Erin) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Attachment A-Letter to Plaintiff's Counsel dated 3/20/17 | ||
misc
Annotation - Docket
Wed 04/05 12:06 PM
Docket Annotation: At DE23 , counsel failed to include the mandatory description of the attached exhibits. The exhibits shall be RESUBMITTED by filing a Notice of Filing and attaching the exhibits with the mandatory brief description. (EXAMPLE: Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Police Report dated 1/1/06, # 2 Exhibit 2 Unreported Case Smith v. Jones).(mg) |
||
misc
Annotation - Docket
Wed 04/05 12:07 PM
Note to Filer, (Erin Gomez), re DE# 24 : Pursuant to the LR 5.02, discovery material is not filed unless by order of the Court. (mg) |
||
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
discov
Request for Production of Documents
Mon 04/03 3:05 PM
REQUEST for Production of Documents by Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC.(Gomez, Erin) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Compel
Mon 04/03 3:02 PM
First MOTION to Compel Responses to Requests for Production by Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC.(Gomez, Erin) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment A | ||
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 03/30 11:29 AM
ORDER FOR RELEASE AND PRODUCTION OF PROTECTED HEALTH INFORMATION AND MEDICAL RECORDS IN ACCORDANCE WITH HIPAA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 3/30/2017. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (hb) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge
Thu 03/23 4:44 PM
ORDER on Consent of the Parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 3/23/17. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (dt) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Consent of the Parties
Wed 03/22 8:51 AM
NOTICE of Consent of the Parties to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. (Gomez, Erin) |
|
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Thu 02/09 10:58 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Erin Elisabeth Gomez. (dt) |
||
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 02/08 7:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sean W. Martin on behalf of Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC, Raymond Williams, Jr (Martin, Sean) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 02/03 9:40 AM
MOTION Release and Production of Protected Health Information and Medical Records in Accordance with HIPAA by Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC.(Martin, Sean) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
misc
Annotation - Docket
Wed 01/25 11:40 AM
Docket entry no. 17 was filed in error; the court does not accept discovery documents for filing; see Local Rule 5.02. (dt) |
||
Tuesday, January 24, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Filing
Tue 01/24 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Filing by Fanta Kabba Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Cartee, Eric) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
discov
Notice to Take Deposition
Tue 01/17 7:48 AM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Fanta Kabba by Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC.(Martin, Sean) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Party
Thu 01/12 4:13 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion to Substitute Party. Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC added. Swift Transportation Services, LLC terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 1/12/17. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (dt) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Substitute Party
Wed 01/11 12:54 PM
MOTION to Substitute Party by Swift Transportation Services, LLC. (Martin, Sean) |
|
Thursday, December 29, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 12/29 10:30 AM
ORDER: Jury Trial set for 12/19/2017 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 12/11/2017 at 3:30 PM before District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw Jr. Exhibit List and Witness List due by 12/4/2017. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/4/2017. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 12/29/16. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (dt) |
|
Friday, December 16, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 12/16 4:39 PM
INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: A status conference will be held by telephone on May 2, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call then contact the Court at 615-736-7344. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 12/16/16. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (af) |
|
Thursday, December 15, 2016 | ||
minutes
Case Management Conference
Thu 12/15 10:12 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley: Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/15/2016. Order to enter. (hv) |
||
Monday, December 12, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Proposed Case Management Order
Mon 12/12 4:59 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Swift Transportation Services, LLC. (Martin, Sean) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Mon 12/12 12:18 PM
ORDER: Uninsured Motorist Carrier Trustguard Insurance Company is hereby dismissed from this lawsuit without prejudice and that Plaintiff shall retain the right to re-file, without time limitation, her claim against Trustguard Insurance Company. It is further ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that if Plaintiff refiles her claim against Trustguard Insurance Company, Trustguard Insurance Company shall not rely upon the statute of limitations as a defense to the claim. TRUSTGARD INSURANCE COMPANY terminated. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 12/12/16. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (dt) |
|
Thursday, December 08, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss
Thu 12/08 7:49 AM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss Uninsured Motorist Carrier by Swift Transportation Services, LLC.(Martin, Sean) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 29, 2016 | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Tue 11/29 12:34 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for C. Benton Patton. (dt) |
||
Monday, November 28, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 11/28 4:24 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by TRUSTGARD INSURANCE COMPANY.(Patton, Claude) |
|
Thursday, October 20, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 10/20 3:14 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Raymond Williams, Jr.(Martin, Sean) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 10/20 3:13 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Swift Transportation Services, LLC.(Martin, Sean) |
|
Tuesday, October 18, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order
Tue 10/18 3:14 PM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Judge in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(d)(5). Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/18/16. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (dt) |
|
Friday, October 14, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Case Management Conference
Fri 10/14 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2016 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (dt) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ
Fri 10/14 3:56 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation
Fri 10/14 3:55 PM
Bar status for attorneys Sean Martin and Eric Cartee of TN verified as active this date. (dt) |
||
Thursday, October 13, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 10/13 3:52 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Swift Transportation Services, LLC. (dt) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 10/13 3:51 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Raymond Williams, Jr from Circuit Court for Rutherford County, Tennessee, case number 70995. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-2302884)(dt) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Circuit Court Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Police Report, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet |