Knighton v. Cedarville Rancheria of Northern Paiute Indians et al
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | William H Orrick, III |
Referred: | Craig M Kellison |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-02438 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Oct 12, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 15, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 10, 2017 1:22 AM PDT |
Defendant
Cedarville Rancheria Tribal Court
|
|
Defendant
Cedarville Rancheria of Northern Paiute Indians
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Patricia R. Lenzi
|
|
Plaintiff
Duanna Knighton
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
appeal
USCA Order
Wed 04/24 3:43 PM
ORDER and OPINION of USCA as to19 Notice of Appeal filed by Duanna Knighton. (Zignago, K.) |
|
Wednesday, March 13, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
appeal
USCA Order
Thu 03/14 5:31 PM
OPINION of USCA 17-15515 the decision of the district court is AFFIRMED. re19 Notice of Appeal filed by Duanna Knighton |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
appeal
USCA Case Number
Thu 05/18 3:19 PM
USCA CASE NUMBER 17-15515 for19 Notice of Appeal filed by Duanna Knighton. (Zignago, K.) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
appeal
Appeal Processed to USCA
Tue 03/21 3:51 PM
APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re19 Notice of Appeal filed by Duanna Knighton. Notice of Appeal filed *3/17/2017*, Complaint filed *10/12/2016* and Appealed Order / Judgment filed *2/15/2017*. ** *Fee Status: Paid on 3/17/2017 in the amount of $505.00* (Zignago, K.) |
|
Att: 1 Appeal Information | ||
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Fri 03/17 9:06 AM
NOTICE of APPEAL by Duanna Knighton. (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0972-6967419)(Deedon, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Statement Plaintiff's Representation Statement | ||
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Judgment
Wed 02/15 2:24 PM
JUDGMENT dated *2/15/2017* pursuant to order signed by William H Orrick, III on 2/15/2017. (Zignago, K.) |
|
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Wed 02/15 2:24 PM
ORDER signed by William H Orrick, III on 2/15/2017 GRANTING, with prejudice, defendants'10 Motion to Dismiss. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.) |
|
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
minutes
Motion Hearing
Thu 02/09 1:42 PM
CIVIL MINUTES for proceedings before William H Orrick, III: MOTION HEARING held on 2/8/2017 re10 Motion to Dismiss. The Court expresses the tentative opinion that the Motion to Dismiss should be granted as the tribal court has jurisdiction over this matter. Argument of counsel heard. Motion taken under submission; a written order will follow. Given the tentative opinion of the Court, the case management conference is vacated. Plaintiffs Counsel Patrick Deedon (appearing telephonically) present. Defendants Counsel Jack Duran (appearing telephonically) present. Court Reporter/CD Number: FTR Recording. (Washington, S) |
|
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Reply
Wed 01/25 11:32 AM
REPLY by Cedarville Rancheria of Northern Paiute Indians re10 MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of JURISDICTION & Failure to State a Claim by Cedarville Tribal Court, Tribal Court Judge Patricia Lenzi and . (Duran, Jack) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Opposition to Motion
Wed 01/18 5:29 PM
OPPOSITION by Duanna Knighton to10 MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of JURISDICTION & Failure to State a Claim by Cedarville Tribal Court, Tribal Court Judge Patricia Lenzi and . (Deedon, Patrick) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 01/18 1:51 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE - PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that the Case Management Conference will be held at the same time as the motion hearing. The Case Management Conference previously set for 2/7/2017 at 3:00 p.m. is CONTINUED to 2/8/2017 at 01:30 PM before William H Orrick III. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Donati, J) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Statement
Tue 01/17 4:23 PM
STATEMENT of JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT by Plaintiff Duanna Knighton. (Deedon, Patrick) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Fri 01/13 9:55 AM
ORDER signed by William H Orrick, III on 1/12/2017 ORDERING Plaintiff to file any response re10 Motion to Dismiss by 1/18/2017. The defendants' shall file their reply by 1/25/2017. The hearing will remain, as scheduled, on 2/8/2017 at 1:30 p.m. All briefing on future motions shall comply with the Reassignment Order. (Washington, S) |
|
Friday, December 16, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Fri 12/16 8:06 AM
MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of JURISDICTION & Failure to State a Claim by Cedarville Tribal Court, Tribal Court Judge Patricia Lenzi and by Cedarville Rancheria of Northern Paiute Indians. Attorney Duran, Jack added. Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2016 at 01:30 PM in Visiting Judge (TBD) before William H Orrick III.(Duran, Jack) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration M. Davis, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration J. Duran, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, November 07, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 11/07 10:56 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Patricia R. Lenzi served on 10/28/2016, answer due 11/18/2016. (Deedon, Patrick) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 11/07 10:55 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Cedarville Rancheria Tribal Court served on 10/28/2016, answer due 11/18/2016. (Deedon, Patrick) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 11/07 10:54 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Cedarville Rancheria of Northern Paiute Indians served on 10/28/2016, answer due 11/18/2016. (Deedon, Patrick) |
|
Thursday, November 03, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Hearing
Mon 11/07 9:46 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE - PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that the telephonic Case Management Conference set for January 31, 2017 has been continued to February 7, 2017 at 3:00 p.m. Counsel should contact the Courtroom Deputy to arrange their appearance.(Becknal, R) |
|
Tuesday, October 25, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 10/25 12:42 PM
ORDER FOR CASE REASSIGNMENT signed by William H Orrick, III on 10/25/2016 ORDERING Law and Motion hearings will generally be held for the Eastern District cases on Wednesdays at 1:30 PM; to reserve a hearing date, contact Judge Orrick's Courtroom Deputy Jean Davis; Parties will be expected to appear telephonically for any hearing, unless both sides agree to appear in person in San Francisco and inform Courtroom Deputy Jean Davis of their intent to appear; Motions shall be noticed for hearing at least 35 days before the proposed hearing date; Motions shall be noticed for hearing at least 35 days before the proposed hearing date; Initial Case Management Conference will be held in this case on 1/31/2017 at 3:00 PM; parties will be expected to appear telephonically, unless both sides agree to appear in person in Judge Orrick's courtroom in San Francisco. |
|
4 | 4
misc
Order Reassigning Visiting Judge
Tue 10/25 7:45 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE TO VISITING JUDGE signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Case reassigned to William H Orrick, III for all further proceedings. District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr and Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison are no longer assigned to case. (Donati, J) |
|
Thursday, October 13, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Civil New Case Documents for MCE
Thu 10/13 8:22 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Washington, S) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 2 VDRP | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons
Thu 10/13 8:21 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Cedarville Rancheria Tribal Court, Cedarville Rancheria of Northern Paiute Indians, Patricia R. Lenzi* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Patrick L. Deedon/Maire & Deedon* *P.O. Drawer 994607* *2851 Park Marina Drive Suite 300* *Redding, CA 96099-4607*. (Washington, S) |
|
Wednesday, October 12, 2016 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants by Duanna Knighton. Attorney Deedon, Patrick L. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-6719300)(Deedon, Patrick) Modified on 10/13/2016 . | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to 3, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 4-13 |