Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:James R Sacca
Case #: 1:16-bk-68583
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2016
Terminated:Oct 03, 2019
Plan Confirmed:May 24, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Bavaria Yachts USA, LLLP
1545 Peachtree St NE Ste 110
Atlanta, GA 30309-2417
Represented By
Louis G. McBryan
Mcbryan, LLC
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 12 minutes ago
Friday, November 15, 2019
431 431 misc Operating Report Fri 11/15 2:32 PM
Quarterly Operating Report for: the Post-Confirmation period from 07/01/2019 through 09/30/2019 filed by Louis G. McBryan on behalf of Bavaria Yachts USA, LLLP. (McBryan, Louis)
Related: [-]