Greer et al v. Herbert et al
Utah District Court | |
Judge: | Dustin B Pead |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-01067 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s) |
Case Filed: | Oct 18, 2016 |
Terminated: | May 08, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 16, 2017 2:42 AM MDT |
Defendant
James Allred
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kathy Berg
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jackie Biskupski
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sim S. Gill
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gary R. Herbert
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ben McAdams
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sean D. Reyes
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rolen Yoshinaga
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Russell G. Greer
1450 S WEST TEMPLE APT D206
SALT LAKE CITY, UT 84115 |
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Thursday, May 02, 2019 | ||
80 | 80
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 05/02 11:26 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to 75 Notice of Appeal filed by Russell G. Greer. According to the USCA the Mandate of the USDC for the Dist of UT is Affirmed.(las) |
|
Att: 1 Mandate Cover Letter |