Fairview Investment Fund II, LP et al v. The Washington-McLaughlin Christian School, Inc. et al
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Roger W Titus |
Case #: | 8:16-cv-03495 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Oct 20, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 26, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 18, 2017 4:55 AM EDT |
Defendant
City of Takoma Park, Maryland
Kate Stewart, Mayor City of Takoma Park, Maryland Administration Building 7500 Maple Avenue
Takoma Park, MD 20912 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Washington-McLaughlin Apartments for Senior Citizens, Inc.
6501 Poplar Avenue
Takoma Park, MD 20912 |
|
Defendant
The Washington-McLaughlin Christian School, Inc.
6501 Poplar Ave
Takoma Park, MD 20912 |
|
Defendant
All Unknown Parties Claiming Interests By, Through, Under Or Against A Named Defendant In This Action, Or Having Or Claiming To Have Any Right, Title Or Interest In The Property Herein Described
|
|
Defendant
Julian Castro
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Peter Franchot
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fairview Investment Fund II, LP
520 Pike Street Suite 10004
Seattle, WA 98101 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Syed Mohsin Reza
Substitute Trustee c/o Troutman Sanders LLP 1850 Towers Crescent Plaza Suite 500
Tysons Corner, VA 22182 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
65 | 65
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 02/27 12:44 PM
ORDER granting62 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 2/27/2018. (kns, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
64 | 64
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 02/26 4:42 PM
ORDER APPROVING59 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 2/26/2018. (kns, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
63 | 63
9
pgs
respm
Memorandum
Fri 02/23 10:02 AM
Memorandum re62 MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice and Memorandum in Support filed by Fairview Investment Fund II, LP, Syed Mohsin Reza.(Hagerty, Richard) |
|
62 | 62
motion
Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 02/23 9:59 AM
MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice and Memorandum in Support by Fairview Investment Fund II, LP, Syed Mohsin Reza(Hagerty, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Wed 02/21 2:45 PM
Telephone Conference held on 2/21/2018 before Judge Roger W. Titus. (cmcs, Chambers) |