MINELAB ELECRONICS PTY LTD v. XP METAL DETECTORS et al
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Mark R Hornak |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-01594 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 28:1338 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Oct 19, 2016 |
Terminated: | Oct 20, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 17, 2017 4:35 AM EDT |
Defendant
DETECTOR ELECTRONICS CORP.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
XP METAL DETECTORS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MINELAB ELECRONICS PTY LTD
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
misc
Patent/Trademark Documents - Judgment
Tue 12/12 8:21 AM
NOTIFICATION of Decision sent to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks re39 Order APPROVING38 Stipulation of Dismissal. This action is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (jv) |
|
Att: 1 3 pgs Order closing case | ||
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
3
pgs
order
Order
Mon 12/11 3:34 PM
ORDER APPROVING38 Stipulation of Dismissal. This action is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 12/11/17. (bdb) |
|
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 12/08 3:18 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by MINELAB ELECRONICS PTY LTD. (Baldauf, Kent) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Fri 10/20 8:06 AM
ORDER OF COURT. This action has been resolved and the only matter remaining to be completed is the submission of a stipulation for dismissal. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk mark the above-captioned action CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court expressly retains jurisdiction of this matter to consider any issue arising during the period when such stipulation is being finalized, including but not limited to enforcing any settlement. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 10/20/17. Modified on 10/20/17 to add document to entry. (bdb) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
3
pgs
notice
Notice of Settlement
Thu 10/19 2:30 PM
NOTICE of Settlement Agreement in Principle (Joint Notice) by DETECTOR ELECTRONICS CORP., XP METAL DETECTORS (Verdini, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 09/19 3:53 PM
ORDER GRANTING34 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendants to answer is hereby EXTENDED to 10/23/17. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 9/19/17. (bdb) |
|
34 | 34
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 09/19 11:47 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re18 Amended Complaint, filed by MINELAB ELECRONICS PTY LTD by DETECTOR ELECTRONICS CORP., XP METAL DETECTORS. (Verdini, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 08/22 8:27 AM
ORDER GRANTING32 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that said Motion is GRANTED, and the deadline for Defendants to file their Answer is EXTENDED until September 22, 2017. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 8/22/17. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 08/21 12:22 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re18 Amended Complaint, filed by MINELAB ELECRONICS PTY LTD by DETECTOR ELECTRONICS CORP., XP METAL DETECTORS. (Verdini, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
misc
QC - Document incorrectly linked
Tue 07/25 8:50 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. ERROR: Document incorrectly linked. CORRECTION: Linked to appropriate document. This message is for informational purposes only. (ksa) |
||
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 07/24 1:13 PM
ORDER GRANTING30 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File an Answer to First Amended Complaint. The Answer is due on or before 8/23/17. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 7/24/17. (jad) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 07/21 12:48 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Update Answer Deadline, by DETECTOR ELECTRONICS CORP., XP METAL DETECTORS. (Verdini, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Wed 06/28 2:15 PM
ORDER DENYING22 Motion to Dismiss. It is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is DENIED for the reasons as stated in28 Opinion of this date. Defendants shall Answer on or before 7/24/17. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 6/28/17. (bdb) |
|
28 | 28
13
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion & Order
Wed 06/28 2:13 PM
OPINION. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 6/28/17. (bdb) |
|
utility
Update Answer Deadline
Wed 06/28 2:16 PM
Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from DETECTOR ELECTRONICS CORP. on 7/24/2017; XP METAL DETECTORS on 7/24/2017. Text-only entry; No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb) |
||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
respoth
Reply (do not select for a Response to Motion)
Mon 03/27 3:39 PM
REPLY In Support Of to22 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by DETECTOR ELECTRONICS CORP., XP METAL DETECTORS. (Verdini, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 03/16 12:06 PM
ORDER GRANTING25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The deadline for Defendants to file their Reply in Support of their Motion to Dismiss is EXTENDED to 3/27/17. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 3/16/17. (bdb) |
|
25 | 25
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 03/16 9:22 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by DETECTOR ELECTRONICS CORP., XP METAL DETECTORS. (Verdini, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
respoth
Response in Opposition
Tue 03/14 3:54 PM
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to22 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by MINELAB ELECRONICS PTY LTD. (Baldauf, Kent) |
|
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Tue 02/28 10:46 AM
BRIEF in Support re22 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by DETECTOR ELECTRONICS CORP., XP METAL DETECTORS. (Verdini, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit U.S. Patent No. 4,868,910, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit U.S. Patent No. 5,138,262, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit U.S. Patent No. 5,148,151, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit U.S. Patent No.5,721,489, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Spectrum XLT Engineering Report, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit U.S. Patent No. 6,911,823 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Tue 02/28 10:41 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by DETECTOR ELECTRONICS CORP., XP METAL DETECTORS. (Verdini, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/21 1:50 PM
ORDER GRANTING20 Motion for Joseph Sofer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 2/21/17. (jad) |
|
misc
QC - Proposed Order part of main document
Tue 02/21 10:50 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Proposed Order was made part of main document. CORRECTION: Attorney advised that in the future, proposed orders are to be made attachments to the main document. This message is for informational purposes only. (jv) |
||
Monday, February 20, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
Mon 02/20 12:39 PM
MOTION for attorney Joseph Sofer to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $40, Receipt # 0315-4245166) by DETECTOR ELECTRONICS CORP., XP METAL DETECTORS. (Sofer, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Wed 02/15 4:30 PM
ORDER DISMISSING13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Motion is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 2/15/17. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 02/14 10:36 AM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against DETECTOR ELECTRONICS CORP., XP METAL DETECTORS DETECTOR ELECTRONICS CORP. answer due 2/28/2017; XP METAL DETECTORS answer due 2/28/2017, filed by MINELAB ELECRONICS PTY LTD. (Baldauf, Kent) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 01/30 4:23 PM
ORDER GRANTING16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The deadline for Plaintiff to respond to the Motion to Dismiss is hereby EXTENDED to 2/14/17. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 1/30/17. (bdb) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 01/30 12:55 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by MINELAB ELECRONICS PTY LTD. (Baldauf, Kent) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1)
Tue 01/17 5:50 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by DETECTOR ELECTRONICS CORP., XP METAL DETECTORS. (Verdini, Christopher) |
|
14 | 14
respm
Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Tue 01/17 5:33 PM
BRIEF in Support re13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by DETECTOR ELECTRONICS CORP., XP METAL DETECTORS. (Verdini, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit U.S. Patent No. 7,310,586, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit U.S. Patent No. 4,868,910, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit U.S. Patent No. 5,138,262, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit U.S. Patent No. 5,148,151, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit U.S. Patent No. 5,721,489, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Spectrum XLT Engineering Report, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit U.S. Patent No. 6,911,823 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Tue 01/17 5:28 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by DETECTOR ELECTRONICS CORP., XP METAL DETECTORS. (Verdini, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, November 17, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 11/17 11:18 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MINELAB ELECRONICS PTY LTD. XP METAL DETECTORS waiver sent on 11/8/2016, answer due 1/17/2017. (Baldauf, Kent) |
|
Thursday, November 10, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 11/10 1:31 PM
ORDER GRANTING10 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants' response is due on or before 1/17/17. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 11/10/16. (jad) |
|
Wednesday, November 09, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 11/09 4:44 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, filed by MINELAB ELECRONICS PTY LTD by MINELAB ELECRONICS PTY LTD. (Baldauf, Kent) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, October 27, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
service
Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed
Thu 10/27 12:31 PM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by MINELAB ELECRONICS PTY LTD. DETECTOR ELECTRONICS CORP. served on 10/21/2016, answer due 11/14/2016. (Baldauf, Kent) |
|
8 | 8
1
pgs
misc
Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1)
Thu 10/27 11:22 AM
Disclosure Statement identifying Codan Limited as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MINELAB ELECRONICS PTY LTD. (Baldauf, Kent) |
|
Friday, October 21, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 10/21 1:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christian D. Ehret on behalf of MINELAB ELECRONICS PTY LTD. (Ehret, Christian) |
|
6 | 6
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 10/21 1:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan P. Clark on behalf of MINELAB ELECRONICS PTY LTD. (Clark, Bryan) |
|
5 | 5
7
pgs
order
Order
Fri 10/21 12:22 PM
STANDING ORDER CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 10/21/16. (bdb) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
adr
Notice of ADR Designation
Fri 10/21 12:21 PM
NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (bdb) |
|
Thursday, October 20, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order Declining Assignment of Patent Case
Thu 10/20 9:26 AM
ORDER Declining Assignment of Patent Case, in accordance with Section 1(a)(1)(C) of Public Law 111-349, Pilot Program in Certain District Courts. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 10/20/16. (njt) |
|
2 | 2
1
pgs
misc
Patent/Trademark Documents - Complaint
Thu 10/20 7:27 AM
PATENT/TRADEMARK DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (jv) |
|
Att: 1 5 pgs Complaint with Jury Demand, | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 11 pgs Exhibit A | ||
misc
QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement
Thu 10/20 7:27 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 Complaint,. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 10/27/2016. (jv) |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 10/20 10:50 AM
Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. (mao) |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 10/20 10:52 AM
Judge Mark R. Hornak is presiding. (mao) |
||
Wednesday, October 19, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
5
pgs
cmp
Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only)
Thu 10/20 7:22 AM
COMPLAINT against DETECTOR ELECTRONICS CORP., XP METAL DETECTORS (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4125595), filed by MINELAB ELECRONICS PTY LTD. (jv) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 11 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 2 pgs Summons as to Detector Electronics, Corp., | ||
Att: 4 2 pgs Summons as to XP Metal Detectors | ||
service
Summons Issued
Thu 10/20 7:25 AM
Summons Issued as to *DETECTOR ELECTRONICS CORP., XP METAL DETECTORS* (jv) |