Edward Coleman v. United States of America
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Terry J Hatter, Jr |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-07830 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence |
Case Filed: | Oct 20, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jul 31, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, October 01, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
appeal
USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order
Fri 10/02 1:12 PM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals27 filed by Edward Coleman. CCA # 17-56131 The stay entered on January 19, 2018 (Docket Entry No. 5), is lifted. The request for a certificate of appealability (Docket Entry No. 4) is denied because appellant has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right. Any pending motions are denied as moot. DENIED. (shb) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
appeal
USCA Notification of Case Number
Thu 08/03 4:02 PM
NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 17-56131 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals27 as to Petitioner Edward Coleman. (shb) |
|
27 | 27
appeal
Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals
Thu 08/03 1:13 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Petitioner Edward Coleman. Appeal of Order,, Terminated Case,26 . (Appeal Fee - Fee exempt pursuant to statute). (Mircheff, Brianna) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Mon 07/31 5:51 PM
ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr, re Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence (28:2255),2 . It is Ordered that the motion to vacate Petitioners sentence under 18 U.S.C.Section 924(c) and § 4B1.2(a)(2) be, and hereby is, Denied.It is Further Ordered that Petitioners request for a certificate of appealabilitypursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2253(c)(2) be, and hereby is, Denied., (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (shb) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Reply
Fri 05/12 5:07 PM
REPLY filed by Petitioner Edward Coleman to Miscellaneous Document23 PETITIONERS REPLY TO THE GOVERNMENTS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON BECKLES V. UNITED STATES, 137 S. Ct. 886 (2017) (Bell, Alyssa) |
|
24 | 24
attorney
Attorney Appearance or Reassignment for the Federal Public Defenders Office
Fri 05/12 4:53 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OR REASSIGNMENT of Deputy Public Defender Alyssa D Bell on behalf of Petitioner Edward Coleman. Filed by Petitioner Edward Coleman. (Attorney Alyssa D Bell added to party Edward Coleman(pty:pet))(Bell, Alyssa) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Miscellaneous Document
Tue 04/25 4:48 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF filed by Respondent United States of America RE BECKLES v. UNITED STATES (Marrett, Bradley) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Brief (non-motion non-appeal)
Wed 04/12 10:56 AM
SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF filed by Petitioner Edward Coleman. RE: BECKLES V. UNITED STATES (Mircheff, Brianna) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
cs_rasgn
Chief District Judge Transferring Case
Wed 01/11 5:16 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#17-044) approved by Chief Judge Virginia A. Phillips. IT IS ORDERED, with the concurrence of the Case Management and Assignment Committee, that the following cases be reassigned from the calendar of Judge George H. King to the calendar of Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:16-cv-07830 TJH. (rn) |
|
Tuesday, December 06, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
order
Leave to File Excess Pages
Wed 12/07 2:22 PM
ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR PERMISSION TO FILE OVER 25 PAGES by Judge George H. King granting18 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to File Excess Pages (bm) |
|
Monday, December 05, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Mon 12/05 2:40 PM
REPLY in support of PETITIONERS MOTION TO VACATE, SET ASIDE, OR CORRECT SENTENCE UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 2255 filed by Petitioner Edward Coleman. (Mircheff, Brianna) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Exceed Page Limitation
Mon 12/05 2:31 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exceed Page Limitation for Reply to Governments Response to Petitioners Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence Under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 filed by Petitioner Edward Coleman. (Mircheff, Brianna) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, November 18, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order
Mon 11/21 10:58 AM
ORDER SEALING DOCUMENTS by Judge George H. King: For good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The government's ex parte application for sealed filing is GRANTED. The document sought to be filed under seal shall be filed under seal. The government may produce the underlying document as permitted or required by applicable law. (bm) |
|
Thursday, November 17, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 11/17 7:30 AM
OPPOSITION (Amended) TO PETITIONER'S SUCCESSIVE 2255 MOTION filed by Respondent United States of America.(Yang, Elizabeth) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
Friday, November 04, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
For Order
Fri 11/04 1:16 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order re: Government's Ex Parte Application for Permission to File Memorandum of Points and Authorities Over 25 Pages (Dkt. 10) by Judge George H. King denying10 EX PARTE APPLICATION: On October 31, 2016, the Government filed the above-captioned ex parte application, requesting that we allow it to file a 73-page opposition to Coleman's motion to vacate, set aside, or correct sentence under 28 U.S.C. § 2255. (Dkt. 10.) The ex parte is DENIED as the opposition is needlessly lengthy. As Colemans motion is 41 pages, the Government's opposition shall be no longer than 41 pages and must be as succinct as possible. The Government SHALL file its amended opposition within 14 days hereof. Coleman SHALL file his reply within 14 days thereafter. At that time, this matter will be taken under submission. (bm) |
|
Thursday, November 03, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
attorney
Attorney Appearance or Reassignment for the Federal Public Defenders Office
Thu 11/03 8:36 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OR REASSIGNMENT of Deputy Public Defender Brianna Fuller Mircheff on behalf of Petitioner Edward Coleman. Filed by Petitioner Edward Coleman. (Attorney Brianna Fuller Mircheff added to party Edward Coleman(pty:pet))(Mircheff, Brianna) |
|
Tuesday, November 01, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
attyseal
Sealed Document
Tue 11/01 4:35 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT APPLICATION TO FILE GOVERNMENT'S EXHIBIT UNDER SEAL re Response in Opposition to Motion11 , Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B),8 filed by Respondent United States of America.(Yang, Elizabeth) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Sealing Document, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Government's Sealed Exhibit in Support of Its Response to Defendant-Petitioner Edward Coleman's Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence Under 28 U.S.C. § 2255, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
12 | 12
misc
Exhibit (non-trial)
Tue 11/01 11:59 AM
EXHIBIT Filed filed by Petitioner Edward Coleman. as to Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence (28:2255) (Attorney Civil Case Opening)2 . (Kim, Gia) |
|
Monday, October 31, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 10/31 11:50 PM
OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT-PETITIONER EDWARD COLEMAN'S THIRD OR SUCCESSIVE MOTION PURSUANT TO 28 USC 2255 filed by Respondent United States of America.(Yang, Elizabeth) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Order
Mon 10/31 11:48 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for PERMISSION TO FILE OVERSIZED BRIEF UNOPPOSED filed by Plaintiff-Respondent United States of America. (Attorney Elizabeth R Yang added to party United States of America(pty:res)) (Yang, Elizabeth) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
9 | 9
notice
Manual Filing (G-92)
Mon 10/31 6:41 PM
NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Respondent United States of America of GOV'T EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SEALING DOCUMENT; DECLARATION; [PROPOSED] ORDER; GOV'T SEALED EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE TO SUCCESSIVE 2255 MOTION. (Yang, Elizabeth) |
|
Friday, October 28, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B)
Fri 10/28 2:22 PM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS7 RE: Exhibit A-E6 , by Clerk of Court. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 11/1/16. Other: The title page is missing. Counsel is directed to file the corrected document by no later than November 1, 2016. (bm) |
|
Tuesday, October 25, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
Tue 10/25 2:45 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Exhibit A-E6 . The following error(s) was found: Case number is incorrect or missing.Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm) |
|
Friday, October 21, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Exhibit (non-trial)
Fri 10/21 9:52 AM
EXHIBIT Filed filed by Petitioner Edward Coleman. as to Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence (28:2255) (Attorney Civil Case Opening)2 . (Kim, Gia) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to US District Judge (CV-17) (2241 and 2255) - optional html form
Fri 10/21 9:16 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. King for motion filed under 28 U.S.C. 2255. (et) |
|
Thursday, October 20, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Manual Filing (G-92)
Thu 10/20 5:02 PM
NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Petitioner Edward Coleman of Presentence Report. (Kim, Gia) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Lodging
Thu 10/20 4:50 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed with 9th Cir Order re Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence (28:2255) (Attorney Civil Case Opening)2(Kim, Gia) |
|
Att: 1 9th Cir Order | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence (28:2255) (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 10/20 4:06 PM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence, Pursuant to 28 USC 2255 in Criminal Case No. 04-00425 GHK, filed by Petitioner Edward Coleman. (Attorney Gia Kim added to party Edward Coleman(pty:pet))(Kim, Gia) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 10/20 3:35 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner Edward Coleman. (Kim, Gia) |