Carlo et al v. Caldero et al
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Pedro A Delgado-Hernande |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-02867 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 24, 2016 |
Terminated: | May 10, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 22, 2017 5:00 AM AST |
Defendant
Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Vilma Fernandez
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership Pesquera-Doe
|
|
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership Caldero-Fernandez
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jose L. Caldero
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Puerto Rico Police Department
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hector Pesquera
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jane Doe
|
|
Plaintiff
Joel Lopez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ricardo Bonilla
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Doe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Conjugal Partnership Bonilla-Pacheco
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Conjugal Partnership Carlo-Lopez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Conjugal Partnership Doe-Doe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frances Carlo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edna Pacheco-Muniz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Emily Ramos-Sanchez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM AST |
Wednesday, May 10, 2023 | ||
185 | 185
order
Judgment
Wed 05/10 4:44 PM
JUDGMENT: See attached. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/10/2023. (FAR) |
|
184 | 184
order
Order on Motion In Compliance
Wed 05/10 4:29 PM
ORDER: Noting183 "Motion in Compliance." The case is ordered administratively closed. It may be reopened by motion of either party upon the lifting of the stay. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/10/2023. (FAR) |
|
183 | 183
motion
In Compliance
Wed 05/10 3:41 PM
Motion In Compliance as to 182 Order filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 5/24/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane) |