Melissa Mays, et al v. City of Flint, MI, et al
Original Case: 5:16-cv-11519
Sixth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:16-cv-02484 |
Type | civil / private / federal question |
Nature of Suit | 893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters |
Case Filed: | Oct 24, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 11, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 20, 2018 9:50 AM CDT |
Defendant
CITY OF FLINT, et al.
|
|
Defendant
CITY OF FLINT, MI, et al.
|
|
Defendant - Appellant
PATRICK COOK
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
ADAM ROSENTHA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
MICHAEL PRYSBY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
STEPHEN BUSCH
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
LIANE SHEKTER SMITH
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
BRADLEY WURFEL
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
ADAM ROSENTHAL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
MELISSA MAYS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
MICHAEL MAYS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
JACQUELINE PEMBERTON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
KEITH JOHN PEMBERTON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
ELNORA CARTHAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
RHONDA KELSO
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Sep 11 2017
OPINION and JUDGMENT filed : AFFIRMED. Decision for publication. Richard F. Suhrheinrich, Ronald Lee Gilman (AUTHORING), and David W. McKeague (DISSENTING), Circuit Judges. |
1. | U.S. Supreme Court allows Flint water contamination lawsuits (95kqds.com) |
Submitted Tue 03/20/2018 | |
2. | Federal judge dismisses flint water crisis lawsuit filed against Governor Rick Snyder (abc12.com) |
Submitted Fri 02/03/2017 | |