California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:13-mc-01352
Case Filed:Nov 08, 2013
Last checked: Sunday Dec 11, 2016 1:19 PM PST
In Re
In the Matter of Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred by the State Bar of California
Interested Party
Wade Anthony Robertson
Law Office of Wade Robertson P.O. Box 20185
Stanford, CA 94309
Interested Party
Ollie Pearl Manago
Law Offices of Ollie P. Manago 3460 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1214
Los Angeles, CA 90010
Interested Party
Dionne Mateos
Law Office of Dionne Mateos 9829 Carmenita Road
Whittier, CA 90605
Interested Party
Geoffrey Carl Morrison
Geoffrey C. Morrison, Attorney at Law 1350 Columbia Street Suite 600
San Diego, CA 92101
Interested Party
Allison Joyce Nelson
Schall Boudreau and Gore 10965 Glencreek Circle
San Diego, CA 92131
Interested Party
Christopher Leslie Persaud
Law Office of Christopher Persaud 8069 Florence Avenue
Downey, CA 90240
Interested Party
James Jeffery Peters
Sessions and Kimball 23456 Madero Suite 170
Mission Viejo, CA 92691
Interested Party
Christopher A Radlinski
PO Box 532
Bonsall, CA 92003
Interested Party
Norberto Fidel Reyes, III
Reyes Law Group, APLC 3600 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 820
Los Angeles, CA 90010
Interested Party
Sharon Lynn Lapin
Law Office of Sharon L. Lapin 336 Bon Air Center, Suite 492
Greenbrae, CA 94904
Interested Party
Aron Phillip Rofer
Bingham McCutchen 600 Anton Boulevard 18th Floor
Costa Mesa, CA 92626
Interested Party
Victor Saldana
The Law Offices of Victor Saldana 13024 Judith Street
Baldwin Park, CA 91706
Interested Party
Karl Werner Schoth
The Karl W Schoth Law Firm 1905 East Route 66 #102
Glendora, CA 91740
Interested Party
Margaret Alice Seltzer
Interested Party
Tara Selver
Law Offices Of Bradley WM Brunon 5th Floor
Santa Monica, CA 90404
Interested Party
Paul Elliott Smith
Law Office of Paul Elliott Smith 16870 West Bernardo Drive Suite 400
San Diego, CA 92127
Interested Party
Jason Robert Walsh
Jacobs and Gregory 4001 Eleventh Street
Riverside, CA 92501
Interested Party
Charles Reginald Wear
Law Office of Charles R. Wear 6876 Indiana Avenue Suite H
Riverside, CA 92506
Interested Party
Lauren Elicia Womack
Cochran Davis & Associates 36 Malaga Cove Plaza Suite 206
Palos Verdes Estates, CA 90274
Interested Party
Gregory Thomas Flahive
Flahive Law Corporation 2365 Iron Point Road Suite 220
Folsom, CA 95630
Interested Party
Diane Bernadette Carey
Law Offices of Diane B Carey 3010 Wilshire Boulevard #428
Los Angeles, CA 90010
Interested Party
Michael Wayne Champ
Spray Gould and Bowers 3530 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1500
Los Angeles, CA 90010
Interested Party
Kenneth Matthew Cookie
Law Office Kenneth M Cooke 605 C Street Suite 200
San Diego, CA 92101
Interested Party
David Glenn Currie
Law Offices of David G Currie 5230 D Street
Chino, CA 91710
Interested Party
Denise Ileene Damrow
Ibold and Anderson 3580 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1630
Los Angeles, CA 90010
Interested Party
Derian D Eidson
Kinkle Rodiger Spriggs 837 North Ross Street
Santa Ana, CA 92702
Interested Party
John Edward Engel
Law Offices of John E. Engel 2173 Salk Avenue Suite 250
Carlsbad, CA 90008
Interested Party
Phillip Kenneth Evans
Law Office of Phillip Evans 31641 Auto Center Drive Suite 1A
Lake Elsinore, CA 92530
Interested Party
Joel Richard Bander
Law Offices of Joel R Bander 1055 W 7th Street Suite 1950
Los Angeles, CA 90017
Interested Party
Ernest George Georggin
Georggin Law 560 Carlsbad Village Drive Suite 204
Carlsbad, CA 92008
Interested Party
Michael Lee Goolsby
Suchman Jalfin and Passon 18108 Von Karman Avenue Suite 1400
Irvine, CA 92715
Interested Party
John Refaat Habashy
The Habashy Law Firm 1025 North Brand Boulevard Suite 301-BK
Glendale, CA 91202
Interested Party
Rodger B Haglund
Geoffrey C. Morrison, Attorney at Law 1350 Columbia Street Suite 600
San Diego, CA 92101
Interested Party
Gregory Taylor Highnote
Suppa Trucchi and Lee 3055 India Street
San Diego, CA 92103
Interested Party
George Holland, Jr.
Holland Law Firm 1970 Broadway Suite 1030
Oakland, CA 94612
Interested Party
Susan Kathleen Holliday
Interested Party
Susan Clare-Verr Jones
Morris Polich & Purdy LLP 1055 West 7th Street
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, September 16, 2014
42 42 ORDER Denying41 Motion to Extend Time and Suspending Attorney from Practice. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 9/16/2014. (knb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 11, 2014
41 41 RESPONSE re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred,40 Order ; , MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Wade Anthony Robertson.(Robertson, Wade) Modified to add motion to entry on 9/16/2014 (knb).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Wade Robertson,
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Tuesday, June 17, 2014
40 40 ORDER Extending Time re39 Response. Wade Anthony Robertson shall file a response to the Court's November 8, 2013 Order to Show Cause1 within ninety (90) days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 6/13/2014.(knb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 12, 2014
39 39 RESPONSE re37 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred, filed by Wade Anthony Robertson.(Robertson, Wade) (knb).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Wade Robertson,
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Tuesday, March 18, 2014
38 38 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re16 Order of Suspension. Mail sent to Michael Wayne Champ. (knb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2014
37 37 ORDER Granting36 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to Wade Anthony Robertson. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 3/14/2014. (knb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2014
36 36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to13 Order,1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred, by Wade Anthony Robertson.(Robertson, Wade) (knb).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Wade Robertson
Monday, February 10, 2014
35 35 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re16 Order of Suspension. Mail sent to Susan Kathleen Holliday. (knb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2014
34 34 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred. Mail sent to Jason Robert Walsh. (knb)
Related: [-]
33 33 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re16 Order of Suspension. Mail sent to Dionne Mateos (at 7032 Comstock Ave). (knb)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2014
32 32 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re16 Order of Suspension. Mail sent to Dionne Mateos. (knb)
Related: [-]
31 31 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re16 Order of Suspension. Mail sent to Ernest George Georggin. Resent to 2103 S El Camino Real, Ste 201, Oceanside, CA 92054-6281 (knb) Returned undeliverable on 2/26/2014 (knb).
Related: [-]
30 30 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re16 Order of Suspension. Mail sent to Geoffrey Carl Morrison. (knb) Mail returned as undeliverable - sent to 1286 University Ave #317, San Diego CA 92103 on 3/18/2014 (knb).
Related: [-]
29 29 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re16 Order of Suspension. Mail sent to Gregory Thomas Flahive. (knb)
Related: [-]
28 28 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re16 Order of Suspension. Mail sent to Joel Richard Bander. (knb)
Related: [-]
27 27 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re16 Order of Suspension. Mail sent to David Glenn Currie. (knb)
Related: [-]
26 26 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re16 Order of Suspension. Mail sent to Charles Reginald Wear. (knb)
Related: [-]
25 25 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re16 Order of Suspension. Mail sent to Allison Joyce Nelson. (knb)
Related: [-]
24 24 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re16 Order of Suspension. Mail sent to John Habashy. Resent to Habashy Law Firm, 633 W. 5th Street, 28th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90071. (knb)
Related: [-]
23 23 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re20 Order. Mail sent to John Habashy. Resent to Habashy Law Firm, 633 W. 5th Street, 28th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90071 on 2/3/2014. (knb)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2014
22 22 NOTICE of Petition for Reinstatement to Practice before the Court by Gregory Taylor Highnote (knb)
Related: [-]
21 21 ORDER Reinstating Gregory T. Highnote. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 1/27/2014.(knb)(cc: Gregory T. Highnote) (knb).
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2013
20 20 ORDER Vacating Suspension Order as to John R. Habashy. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 12/27/2013.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2013
19 19 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by John Refaat Habashy re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred. (Habashy, John) (knb).
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER Denying Request to Defer Suspension as to Denise Ileene Damrow. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 12/17/2013.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2013
17 17 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Denise Ileene Damrow. (knb)
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER of Disbarment/ Suspension. The Court Orders that the attorneys listed within as being disbarred by the State Bar of California are disbarred from membership in the bar of this court. The Court also orders that the attorneys listed within as being suspended or placed on the inactive list by the State Bar of California are suspended from membership in the bar of this court. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 12/16/2013.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2013
15 15 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Christopher A Radlinski.(knb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
14 14 ORDER of Suspension of Christopher A. Radlinski until December 18, 2013. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 12/11/2013.(knb)
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER Extending Time as to Wade Anthony Robertson. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 12/11/2013.(knb)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2013
12 12 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Wade Anthony Robertson. (Robertson, Wade)(knb).
Related: [-]
Friday, November 29, 2013
11 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred,2 Notice. Mail sent to Phillip Kenneth Evans. (knb)
Related: [-]
10 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred,2 Notice. Mail sent to Denise Ileene Damrow. (knb)
Related: [-]
9 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred,2 Notice. Mail sent to Gregory Thomas Flahive (knb)
Related: [-]
8 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred,2 Notice. Mail sent to Michael Lee Goolsby (knb)
Related: [-]
7 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred,2 Notice. Mail sent to Christopher Leslie Persaud (knb)
Related: [-]
6 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred,2 Notice. Mail sent to Kenneth Mattthew Cooke (knb)
Related: [-]
5 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred,2 Notice. Mail sent to Margaret Alice Seltzer (knb)
Related: [-]
4 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred,2 Notice. Mail sent to Norberto Fidel Reyes, III. Resent to Reyes Law Group APLC, 3460 Wilshire Blvd, Ste 1005, Los Angeles, CA 90010-2232 on 12/2/2013. (knb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2013
3 3 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred, Mail sent to Victor Saldana. (vam)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2013
2 2 NOTICE of Mailing re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred. Per instructions of Judge Moskowitz, copies of Order to Show Cause have also been sent to attorney's addresses listed in California State Bar Records. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
Related: [-]
1 1 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, In the Matter of Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred by the State of California. The Court orders the listed attorneys to show cause in writing, within 30 days of the service of this order, why they should not be suspended or disbarred from practicing in this Court. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 11/7/2013.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
Related: [-]