Williams v. United States of America
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jose E Martinez |
Referred: | Patrick A White |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-14474 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate Sentence |
Case Filed: | Oct 27, 2016 |
Terminated: | May 16, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail
Mon 06/05 2:22 PM
Clerk's First Notice of Undeliverable Mail re7 Order on Report and Recommendations,,,. US Mail returned for: Grenale Williams . The Court has not located an updated address for this party. Bop website indicates inmate was released on 05/10/2017. After two unsuccessful noticing attempts, notices from the Court will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (drz) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order Withdrawing Reference/Case No Longer Referred
Tue 05/23 10:02 AM
Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White/Case Closed by the District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 5/23/2017. (br) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Tue 05/16 10:37 AM
ORDER ADOPTING4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; Certificate of Appealability: DENIED. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/15/2017. (pes) |
|
Wednesday, November 09, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
respm
Response/Reply (Other)
Wed 11/09 12:50 PM
RESPONSE to4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 28 USC 2255 case re1 Motion (Complaint) to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Grenale Williams Recommending that the motion to vacate be DENIED on the merits; that no certificate of appealability issu by United States of America. (Watts-Fitzgerald, Thomas) |
|
Friday, November 04, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Fri 11/04 11:02 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Austin Watts-Fitzgerald on behalf of United States of America. Attorney Thomas Austin Watts-Fitzgerald added to party United States of America(pty:dft). (Watts-Fitzgerald, Thomas) |
|
Monday, October 31, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Report and Recommendations
Mon 10/31 11:13 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 28 USC 2255 case re1 Motion (Complaint) to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Grenale Williams. Recommending that the motion to vacate be DENIED on the merits; that no certificate of appealability issue; and, that this case be closed. Objections to R&R due by 11/17/2016 Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 10/31/2016. (tw) |
|
Thursday, October 27, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
order
Clerks Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment
Thu 10/27 11:20 AM
Clerks Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment to Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2003-19 for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (rms1) |
|
2 | 2
order
Judge Assignment
Thu 10/27 11:19 AM
Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez (rms1) |
|
1 | 1
mot2255
Motion (Complaint) to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)
Thu 10/27 11:19 AM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence (2255). NOTE: All further docketing is to be done in the civil case. (Criminal Case # 2:16-cr-14001-JEM-2), filed by Grenale Williams.(rms1) |