DOE et al v. DARTMOUTH COLLEGE
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Jose L Linares |
Referred: | Joseph A Dickson |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-07908 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 27, 2016 |
Re-opened: | Apr 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 26, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 25, 2017 5:01 AM EDT |
Defendant
DARTMOUTH COLLEGE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JANE DOE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOHN DOE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARY MOE
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 78 minutes ago |
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Court Transfer
Tue 06/27 11:22 AM
Case extracted via ECF to District of New Hampsire. (mfr) |
||
misc
Docket Annotation (public)
Tue 06/27 1:04 PM
Case transferred from New Jersey has been opened in District of New Hampshire as case 1:17-cv-00264, filed 06/27/2017. (mfr) |
||
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 06/26 2:46 PM
OPINION & ORDER granting in part and denying in part19 Motion to Dismiss; GRANTED TO THE EXTENT that the motion concerns the transfer of this action to the United States District Court for the District of New Hampshire; DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE EXTENT that the motion concerns other alternative relief. The Clerk of the Court is directed to TRANSFER THIS ACTION to the United States District Court for the District of New Hampshire. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 6/26/17. (cm, ) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Mon 06/26 2:47 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (cm, ) |
||
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
13
pgs
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Thu 06/01 8:36 PM
RESPONSE in Support filed by DARTMOUTH COLLEGE re19 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer (MCTIERNAN, AILEEN) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
Tue 05/30 12:30 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition filed by JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, MARY MOE re19 MOTION to Dismiss AMENDED DECLARATION MARY MOE EX D (ARNOLD, ROSEMARIE) |
|
Sunday, May 28, 2017 | ||
qc
QC - Document contains an Electronic Signature of a Non-Attorney
Sun 05/28 6:46 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Affidavit in Opposition to Motion (DKT No. 23) submitted by R. Arnold on 5/26/2017 contains an improper signature. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC OR SCANNED SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (JB, ) |
||
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
Fri 05/26 10:11 AM
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition filed by JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, MARY MOE re19 MOTION to Dismiss AMENDED DECLARATION MARY MOE EX D (ARNOLD, ROSEMARIE) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
40
pgs
respm
Brief in Opposition to Motion
Thu 05/25 9:48 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, MARY MOE re19 MOTION to Dismiss (ARNOLD, ROSEMARIE) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit EX A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit EX B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit EX C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit EX D | ||
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 05/23 9:11 AM
Reset Deadlines as to19 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 6/19/2017 before Judge Jose L. Linares. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (cm, ) |
||
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order
Tue 05/23 9:10 AM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's request to file their opposition to Defendant's motion until 5/25/17, Defendant's time to reply is extended until 6/2/17.The new return date for the Motion to Dismiss is 6/19/17, etc. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 5/22/17. (cm, ) |
|
20 | 20
misc
Letter
Mon 05/22 5:13 PM
Letter from Rosemarie Arnold. (ARNOLD, ROSEMARIE) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 05/11 3:33 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to19 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 6/5/2017 before Judge Jose L. Linares. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, ) |
||
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
3
pgs
motion
Dismiss
Wed 05/10 3:16 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by DARTMOUTH COLLEGE. Responses due by 5/22/2017(MCTIERNAN, AILEEN) |
|
Att: 1 25 pgs Brief in support of its Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added
Fri 04/28 9:51 AM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, DARYL J. LAPP, Esq., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ek) |
||
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order
Thu 04/27 2:03 PM
TEXT ORDER - The Court notes that, in accordance with the Hon. Jose L. Linares, U.S.D.J.'s 4/5/17 Order, Plaintiffs advised that they wished to proceed based upon their existing Complaint. (ECF No. 16). Judge Linares's 4/5/17 Order also granted Defendant leave to file a new motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' pleading. The Court now clarifies that Defendant shall file any such motion to dismiss on or before 5/11/17. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 4/27/17. (nm, ) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
Thu 04/27 12:13 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Daryl J. Lapp to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-7799380.) (MCTIERNAN, AILEEN) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Letter
Fri 04/21 11:54 AM
Letter from Rosemarie Arnold. (ARNOLD, ROSEMARIE) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order Reopening Case
Thu 04/06 10:04 AM
ORDER REOPENING CASE. Plaintiffs will BY APRIL 24, 2017, either: (1) file an amended complaint that omits any of the claims that have been resolved; or (2) notify the Court that they wish to proceed based upon the original complaint. After the plaintiffs have complied with the aforementioned directive, the defendant is granted leave to move anew for relief upon a new notice of motion, etc. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 4/5/17. (cm, ) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Letter
Wed 04/05 1:50 PM
Letter from Aileen E. McTiernan re13 Letter. (MCTIERNAN, AILEEN) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Letter
Wed 03/29 10:10 AM
Letter from Rosemarie Arnold. (ARNOLD, ROSEMARIE) |
|
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order of Dismissal ~Util - Terminate Motions
Mon 02/06 2:00 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Motions terminated:6 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer filed by DARTMOUTH COLLEGE. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 02/06/2017. (ek) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 02/06 10:51 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, MARY MOE. (ARNOLD, ROSEMARIE) |
|
Monday, December 19, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 12/19 4:35 PM
ORDER Resetting Deadlines as to6 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer . Responses due by 1/31/2017, Motion set for 2/21/2017 before Judge Jose L. Linares. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 12/19/2016. (jr) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Letter
Mon 12/19 11:57 AM
Letter from Rosemarie Arnold. (ARNOLD, ROSEMARIE) |
|
Monday, December 12, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 12/12 11:44 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daryl J. Lapp, Esq., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 12/12/2016. (ek) |
|
Friday, December 09, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 12/09 12:02 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by DARTMOUTH COLLEGE.(MCTIERNAN, AILEEN) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Aileen E. McTiernan in Support of Defendant's Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Daryl J. Lapp in Support of Defendant's Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, December 06, 2016 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 12/06 8:47 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to6 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer . Motion set for 1/3/2017 before Judge Jose L. Linares. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, ) |
||
Monday, December 05, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss
Mon 12/05 2:18 PM
MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer by DARTMOUTH COLLEGE. Responses due by 12/20/2016(MCTIERNAN, AILEEN) |
|
Att: 1 Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Kevin O'Leary, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Ward Newmeyer, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 15, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Letter
Tue 11/15 6:06 PM
Letter from Rosemarie Arnold. (ARNOLD, ROSEMARIE) |
|
Wednesday, November 09, 2016 | ||
utility
Update Answer Due Deadline
Wed 11/09 7:23 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by DARTMOUTH COLLEGE has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/5/16. (DD, ) |
||
Tuesday, November 08, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
3
pgs
misc
Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
Tue 11/08 11:53 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Trustees of Dartmouth College.. (MCTIERNAN, AILEEN) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 11/08 11:48 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by AILEEN E. MCTIERNAN on behalf of DARTMOUTH COLLEGE (MCTIERNAN, AILEEN) |
|
Thursday, October 27, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
2
pgs
service
Summons Issued
Thu 10/27 5:08 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to DARTMOUTH COLLEGE Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *John Reilly* (jr) |
|
1 | 1
14
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 10/27 4:14 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7446962) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MARY MOE, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE.(ARNOLD, ROSEMARIE) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 10/27 5:08 PM
Case assigned to Judge Jose L. Linares and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. (jr) |