FIRST LOOK MEDIA WORKS, INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy J Kelly |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-02165 |
Nature of Suit | 895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act |
Cause | 05:552 Freedom of Information Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 28, 2016 |
Terminated: | Aug 13, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 26, 2017 5:36 AM EDT |
Defendant
DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FIRST LOOK MEDIA WORKS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 08/13 2:53 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by FIRST LOOK MEDIA WORKS, INC.. (Light, Jeffrey) |
|
35 | 35
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/13 11:48 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Franklin Van Horn on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Van Horn, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, August 09, 2018 | ||
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 08/09 8:31 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court previously ordered that the parties file either a joint status report or a stipulation of dismissal by August 2, 2018. See Minute Order of July 3, 2018. Instead, the parties filed a stipulation33 and settlement agreement regarding attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses that does not clearly state that this action has been dismissed pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal, or a joint status report, by August 17, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/9/2018. (lctjk1) |
||
Thursday, July 26, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/26 12:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Claire M. Whitaker on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Whitaker, Claire) |
|
Tuesday, July 24, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Stipulation
Tue 07/24 3:01 PM
STIPULATION (Settlement Agreement) by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Whitaker, Claire) |
|
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 07/03 3:08 PM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties'31 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report by August 2, 2018, unless a stipulation of dismissal is filed before that time. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/3/2018. (lctjk1) |
||
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Status Report
Mon 07/02 2:24 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by FIRST LOOK MEDIA WORKS, INC.. (Light, Jeffrey) |
|
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Status Report
Thu 05/31 1:54 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Shoaibi, Alexander) |
|
order
.Order
Thu 05/31 4:27 PM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties'30 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report by July 2, 2018, unless a stipulation of dismissal is filed before that time. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/31/2018. (lctjk1) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 05/31 4:31 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/2/2018. (kh) |
||
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 04/06 2:50 PM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties'29 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report by June 1, 2018, unless a stipulation of dismissal is filed before that time. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/6/2018. (lctjk1) |
||
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Status Report
Mon 04/02 2:40 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by FIRST LOOK MEDIA WORKS, INC.. (Light, Jeffrey) |
|
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 03/01 11:56 AM
MINUTE ORDER denying as MOOT Defendant's28 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. In light of the fact that this is Defendant's third request for an extension, and that Defendant represents that the parties anticipate settling the case and filing a stipulation of dismissal within thirty days, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is STAYED until further order of the Court, and the current briefing schedule is hereby VACATED. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report by April 2, 2018, unless a stipulation of dismissal is filed before that time. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/1/2018. (lctjk1) |
||
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Extension of Time to
Tue 02/27 4:09 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Oppositions to Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Discovery by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Shoaibi, Alexander) |
|
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 01/11 7:48 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Response to Cross Motion due by 2/26/2018; Rule 56(d) Motion due by 2/26/2018; and Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/26/2018. (kh) |
||
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
Wed 01/10 5:31 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's27 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion for summary judgment and its oppositions to Plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment and Rule 56(d) motion by February 26, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/10/2018. (lctjk1) |
||
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Extension of Time to
Tue 01/09 12:57 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Discovery by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Shoaibi, Alexander) |
|
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 12/15 7:24 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment and Response to Cross Motion due by 1/12/2018. (kh) |
||
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
Thu 12/14 10:00 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's26 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion for summary judgment, and its oppositions to Plaintiffs cross-motion for summary judgment and Rule 56(d) motion by January 12, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/14/2017. (lctjk1) |
||
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Extension of Time to
Tue 12/12 2:27 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Discovery by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Shoaibi, Alexander) |
|
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Filing Redacted Document
Mon 10/30 10:50 PM
NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT to23 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment ,22 Memorandum in Opposition, by FIRST LOOK MEDIA WORKS, INC. (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.)(Light, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-10 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Discovery
Mon 10/30 8:33 PM
MOTION for Discovery by FIRST LOOK MEDIA WORKS, INC.(Light, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - NARA records retention schedule for ICEGangs, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Memorandum discontinuing use of ICEGangs, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration Jeffrey Light, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order | ||
23 | 23
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 10/30 8:31 PM
Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by FIRST LOOK MEDIA WORKS, INC.(Light, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Index, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1-10, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 11-15, | ||
Att: 4 Statement of Facts, | ||
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order | ||
22 | 22
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Mon 10/30 8:29 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FIRST LOOK MEDIA WORKS, INC..(Light, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Index, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1-10, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 11-15, | ||
Att: 4 Statement of Facts, | ||
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 10/27 4:06 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's21 Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED, nunc pro tunc to 10/23/2017 and for good cause shown, that Plaintiff shall file its response to Defendant's motion for summary judgment, cross motion for summary judgment, and Rule 56(d) motion by October 30, 2017. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/27/2017. (lctjk1) |
||
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
order
.Order
Tue 10/24 4:26 PM
MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that any opposition to Plaintiff's21 Motion for Extension of Time shall be filed on or before October 25, 2017. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/24/2017. (lctjk1) |
||
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 10/23 11:23 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to20 MOTION for Summary Judgment by FIRST LOOK MEDIA WORKS, INC.(Light, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, October 17, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
Tue 10/17 1:32 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's19 Consent Motion for One Week Enlargement of Time to File Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment. It is hereby ORDERED, nunc pro tunc to 9/15/2017, that Defendant's Motion is GRANTED, and Defendant shall have up to and including September 25, 2017 to file a motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/17/2017. (lctjk1) |
||
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 09/25 7:05 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY(Shoaibi, Alexander) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Vaughn Index, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - 5 | ||
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 09/18 11:12 AM
Case directly reassigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) |
||
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Extension of Time to
Fri 09/15 1:17 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Shoaibi, Alexander) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
.Order
Tue 07/18 8:16 AM
SCHEDULING AND PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 7/18/2017. (lcckk3) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 07/20 7:41 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Cross Motion and Rule 56(d) Motion due by 10/23/2017. Response to Cross Motion and Rule 56(d) Motion due by 12/18/2017. Reply to Cross Motion and Rule 56(d) Motion due by 1/4/2018. Defendant's Summary Judgment motion due by 9/18/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/23/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/18/2017. (dot) |
||
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Status Report
Mon 07/17 3:41 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by FIRST LOOK MEDIA WORKS, INC..(Light, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Thu 07/13 6:10 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's16 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties were previously ordered to file a Joint Status Report by no later than July 10, 2017, updating the Court on the progress in their negotiations and advising the Court whether further litigation will be necessary. Plaintiff now seeks an extension nunc pro tunc to file this report because counsel erroneously recorded the deadline. Plaintiff's motion is GRANTED. The parties are ORDERED to file their Joint Status Report by no later than JULY 17, 2017, updating the Court on the progress in their negotiations and advising the Court whether further litigation will be necessary. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 7/13/2017. (lcckk3) |
||
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 07/11 5:39 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by FIRST LOOK MEDIA WORKS, INC.(Light, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
order
.Order
Mon 06/12 5:18 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the parties'15 Joint Status Report. The parties represent that since the last status report they have exchanged information and have attempted to resolve several outstanding issues, but still need additional time to resolve or narrow areas of disagreement. Accordingly, the parties are ORDERED to file a further Joint Status Report by no later than JULY 10, 2017, updating the Court on the progress in their negotiations and advising the Court whether further litigation will be necessary. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/12/2017. (lcckk3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 06/13 10:29 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/10/2017. (dot) |
||
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Status Report
Fri 06/09 4:44 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by FIRST LOOK MEDIA WORKS, INC.. (Light, Jeffrey) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Status Report
Thu 06/01 2:19 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by FIRST LOOK MEDIA WORKS, INC.. (Light, Jeffrey) |
|
order
.Order
Thu 06/01 5:39 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the parties'14 Joint Status Report. The parties represent that Defendant has concluded its searches and productions and that the parties have met and conferred to discuss resolving several outstanding issues. The parties represent that they believe further discussions will be fruitful. Accordingly, the parties are ORDERED to file a further Joint Status Report by no later than JUNE 9, 2017, updating the Court on the progress in their negotiations and advising the Court whether further litigation will be necessary. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/1/2017. (lcckk3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 06/05 4:01 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/9/2017. (dot) |
||
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Modify
Thu 04/06 10:55 AM
Consent MOTION to Modify Document Production Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Shoaibi, Alexander) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Modify
Thu 04/06 4:21 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the parties'13 Consent Motion for Modification of Document Production Schedule. In the parties' last Joint Status Report, Defendant stated that it would make its final two productions of records to Plaintiff on April 8, 2017 and May 8, 2017. Defendant now represents that it will be unable to complete a production by April 8, 2017, but can still make its final production by May 8, 2017. Plaintiff's counsel consents to all remaining documents being produced on May 8, 2017. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS Defendant to make its next and final production of documents to Plaintiff in this matter on MAY 8, 2017. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/6/2017. (lcckk3) |
||
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Status Report
Wed 03/15 3:59 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by FIRST LOOK MEDIA WORKS, INC.. (Light, Jeffrey) |
|
order
.Order
Wed 03/15 5:54 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the parties'12 Joint Status Report. The parties represent that Defendant tasked seven offices with conducting searches for records responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, and that these searches have been completed and have returned 2,529 pages of potentially responsive material. The parties represent that Defendant will make rolling productions to Plaintiff as it reviews these materials, three of which have already occurred and the remaining two of which will occur on April 8, 2017 and May 8, 2017, respectively. The parties further represent that they will meet and confer after all productions have been made to determine whether further litigation is necessary and, if so, will file a proposed schedule for further proceedings. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS the parties to file a Joint Status Report by no later than JUNE 1, 2017, informing the Court whether further proceedings in this case will be required and, if so, proposing a schedule for such proceedings. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/15/2017. (lcckk3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 03/16 7:58 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/1/2017. (dot) |
||
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
order
.Order
Tue 03/14 4:17 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The parties were previously ordered to file a Joint Status Report on the status of Defendants' rolling productions in this case by no later than March 10, 2017. As of the date of this order, no such report has been filed on the docket. The parties are ORDERED to file their Joint Status Report by no later than CLOSE OF BUSINESS on MARCH 15, 2017, and to also in that filing explain why the report was not timely filed. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/14/2017. (lcckk3) |
||
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Status Report
Wed 02/08 12:21 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by FIRST LOOK MEDIA WORKS, INC..(Light, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
.Order
Wed 02/08 6:46 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the parties'11 Joint Status Report. The parties represent that Defendant tasked seven offices with conducting searches for records responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, and that these searches have been completed and have returned approximately 2,530 pages of potentially responsive material. The parties represent that Defendant will make rolling productions to Plaintiff as it reviews these materials, on or about the eighth of each month. Defendant has agreed to complete the release of all responsive, non-exempt materials by June 8, 2017. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS the parties to file a Joint Status Report on the status of these rolling productions by no later than MARCH 10, 2017. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/8/2017. (lcckk3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 02/09 12:43 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/10/2017. (dot) |
||
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Wed 02/01 10:50 AM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff represents that the parties need additional time to file their joint status report because they are attempting to reach an agreement about how to proceed in this case. Plaintiff requests a one week extension. This is the first request for an extension of this deadline. Defendant consents. Accordingly, Plaintiff's consent motion is GRANTED. The parties shall file their Joint Status Report by no later than FEBRUARY 8, 2017. However, for any future requests, the parties are directed to the Order Establishing Procedures in this case, which states that "[m]otions for extensions of time must be filed at least four (4) business days prior to the first affected deadline." ECF No. 4 at 3. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/1/2017. (lcckk3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 02/01 2:45 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/8/2017. (dot) |
||
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 01/31 8:38 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by FIRST LOOK MEDIA WORKS, INC.(Light, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
.Order
Tue 01/17 4:04 PM
ORDER. Joint Status Report due FEBRUARY 1, 2017. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/17/2017. (lcckk3) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 01/17 11:02 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Shoaibi, Alexander) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 01/24 11:47 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/1/2017. (dot) |
||
Tuesday, November 29, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to
Tue 11/29 3:46 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Shoaibi, Alexander) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 11/29 3:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Daniel Shoaibi on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Shoaibi, Alexander) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
Tue 11/29 6:29 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Defendant's7 Consent Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant represents that it needs additional time to obtain materials and prepare a response to the complaint. Plaintiff consents to this extension. The parties have also conferred and agreed to discuss narrowing the issues in this case informally. Accordingly, Defendant's Motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's complaint by no later than JANUARY 17, 2017. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/29/2016. (lcckk3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 11/30 11:17 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall respond to complaint by 1/17/2017. (dot) |
||
Wednesday, November 02, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
Wed 11/02 2:35 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/2/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/2/2016.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/2/2016. (Light, Jeffrey) |
|
Tuesday, November 01, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
.Order
Tue 11/01 10:40 AM
ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 1, 2016. (NS) |
|
Monday, October 31, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Mon 10/31 2:09 PM
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Consent Form)(sb) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 10/31 2:06 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (sb) |
||
Friday, October 28, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
notice
LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Fri 10/28 3:12 PM
LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FIRST LOOK MEDIA WORKS, INC. (Light, Jeffrey) |
|
1 | 1
4
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 10/28 3:10 PM
COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4725792) filed by FIRST LOOK MEDIA WORKS, INC..(Light, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Attorney General, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Department of Homeland Security, | ||
Att: 4 Summons USAO |