Chanel, Inc. v. Beautyspin Corp.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Lorna G Schofield |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-08510 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 (a) False representation of goods sold in interstate commerce |
Case Filed: | Nov 01, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 08, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 30, 2017 4:56 AM EDT |
Defendant
Notino Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chanel, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Beautyspin Corp.
Terminated: 02/14/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
order
Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 03/10 6:21 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL: It is hereby stipulated and agreed between the Parties to this proceeding by their undersigned attorneys, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), that this action is hereby dismissed without prejudice, and that each Party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees in this action. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/10/2017) (cla) |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
order
Order of Dismissal
Wed 03/08 5:27 PM
ORDER: The Court has been informed that the Parties have reached a settlement in principle in this case. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is dismissed without costs and without prejudice to restoring the action to the Court's calendar, provided the application to restore the action is made within thirty (30) days of this Order. Any application to reopen filed after thirty (30) days from the date of this Order may be denied solely on that basis. Any pending motions are DISMISSED as moot, and all conferences are CANCELED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/08/2017) (ama) |
|
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Mon 03/06 5:10 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara Moses: Settlement Conference held on 3/6/2017. (Snell, Kevin) |
||
Thursday, March 02, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
respoth
Amended Answer to Complaints
Thu 03/02 5:52 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to28 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Notino Corp.. (Hansen, William) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Mon 02/27 2:28 PM
ANSWER to28 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Notino Corp..(Hansen, William) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Fri 02/24 1:20 PM
ORDER granting29 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 2/24/2017) (cf) |
|
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
motion
File Excess Pages
Thu 02/23 5:48 PM
LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses from Jennifer Insley-Pruitt dated 2/23/2017. Document filed by Chanel, Inc..(Insley-Pruitt, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Tue 02/14 1:24 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Barbara Anne Solomon. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Notino Corp., f/k/a Beatyspin Corp.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted. (pc) |
||
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 02/13 1:56 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against Notino Corp., f/k/a Beatyspin Corp..Document filed by Chanel, Inc.. Related document:1 Complaint filed by Chanel, Inc..(Solomon, Barbara) |
|
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Mon 02/13 1:31 PM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Barbara Anne Solomon on behalf of Chanel, Inc.. New Address: Fross Zelnick Lehrman & Zissu, P.C., 4 Times Square, 17th Floor, New York, NY, United States 10036, 212-813-5900. (Solomon, Barbara) |
|
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Mon 02/13 1:28 PM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jennifer Insley-Pruitt on behalf of Chanel, Inc.. New Address: Fross Zelnick Lehrman & Zissu, P.C., 4 Times Square, 17th Floor, New York, NY, USA 10036, 212-813-5900. (Insley-Pruitt, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Status Report
Fri 02/10 4:12 PM
STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Beautyspin Corp..(Hansen, William) |
|
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 01/30 3:42 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: A settlement conference is scheduled before Magistrate Judge Barbara Moses on March 6, 2017, at 2:15 p.m. in Courtroom 9A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. (As further set forth in this Order.) Neither the scheduling of a settlement conference nor any adjournment affects the parties' other litigation deadlines or obligations. (Settlement Conference set for 3/6/2017 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 9A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 1/30/2017) (cf) |
|
Tuesday, January 24, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order
Tue 01/24 10:57 AM
ORDER: The above-referenced action has been referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara Moses for settlement. (Dkt. No. 20.) Plaintiff's counsel has represented to the Court that the parties are engaging in bilateral settlement discussions. If the parties have not settled this action by January 30, 2017, counsel must contact Judge Moses's chambers, by the close of business that day, to schedule a judicially-supervised settlement conference. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 1/24/2017) (cf) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend
Mon 01/23 3:00 PM
ORDER granting21 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Amend; Amended Pleadings due by 2/13/2017. Application GRANTED. The deadline for filing amended pleadings is extended to February 13, 2017. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/23/2017) (anc) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Extension of Time to Amend
Mon 01/23 10:24 AM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend1 Complaint addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jennifer Insley-Pruitt dated 01/23/2017. Document filed by Chanel, Inc..(Insley-Pruitt, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Wed 01/11 3:57 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/10/2017) (kgo) |
|
19 | 19
order
Case Management Plan
Wed 01/11 3:52 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. This case is not to be tried to a jury. Status letter due February 10, 2017, and every 30 days thereafter. Amended Pleadings due by 1/30/2017. Joinder of Parties due by 1/30/2017. Deposition due by 5/10/2017. Fact Discovery due by 5/10/2017. Expert Discovery due by 6/27/2017. Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 4 days. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/10/2017) (kgo) Modified on 1/11/2017 (kgo) |
|
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Tue 01/10 4:48 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lorna G. Schofield: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/10/2017. (jcs) |
||
Thursday, January 05, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Thu 01/05 3:57 PM
ORDER : Initial Conference set for 1/10/2017 at 04:45 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. It is hereby ORDERED that the proceeding in this matter, previously scheduled for January 10, 2017 at 10:30 a.m., shall be adjourned to January 10, 2017 at 4:45 p.m., due to a scheduling conflict. Any parties not located within the metropolitan area who wish to participate telephonically may do so by advising the Court, convening all parties on the line and calling into chambers at (212) 805-0288. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/5/2017) (anc) |
|
Tuesday, January 03, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
5
pgs
misc
Letter
Tue 01/03 4:35 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jennifer Insley-Pruitt dated 01/03/2017 re: joint letter and case management plan. Document filed by Chanel, Inc..(Insley-Pruitt, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 5 pgs Proposed Civil Case Management Plan | ||
Tuesday, December 20, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Tue 12/20 4:00 PM
ORDER denying15 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application DENIED. Absent special circumstances, the Court does not stay proceedings for settlement negotiations. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/20/2016) (kgo) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Adjourn Conference
Tue 12/20 1:32 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jennifer Insley-Pruitt dated 12/20/2016. Document filed by Chanel, Inc..(Insley-Pruitt, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, December 09, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 12/09 5:04 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by Beautyspin Corp..(Hansen, William) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 12/09 5:01 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Beautyspin Corp..(Hansen, William) |
|
Tuesday, November 29, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 11/29 5:39 PM
STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff Chanel, Inc. ("Plaintiff") and Defendant BeautySpin Corp., ("Defendant"), through their undersigned counsel, that Defendant shall have until December 8, 2016 to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Beautyspin Corp. answer due 12/8/2016. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/29/2016) (kgo) |
|
Wednesday, November 23, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 11/23 12:15 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Robert Hansen on behalf of Beautyspin Corp.. (Hansen, William) |
|
Monday, November 21, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
service
Certificate of Service Other
Mon 11/21 4:22 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Court Order dated November 18, 2016 (ECF No. 9) and Individual Rules and Procedures for Civil Cases for Judge Lorna G. Schofield served on William R. Hansen and Catherine A. Savio on 11/21/2016. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Chanel, Inc.. (Insley-Pruitt, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, November 18, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Mon 11/21 11:51 AM
ORDER: Initial Conference set for 1/10/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/18/2016) (kgo) |
|
Thursday, November 17, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
service
Affidavit of Service Other
Thu 11/17 5:04 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on BeautySpin Corp. on 11/04/2016. Service was accepted by Philip Casal, Employee Agent. Document filed by Chanel, Inc.. (Insley-Pruitt, Jennifer) |
|
7 | 7
service
Affidavit of Service Other
Thu 11/17 5:02 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Philip Casal on 11/04/2016. Service was accepted by Philip Casal. Document filed by Chanel, Inc.. (Insley-Pruitt, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, November 02, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Wed 11/02 10:14 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Beautyspin Corp.. (rch) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney to Submit AO 120 Form/AO 121 Form
Wed 11/02 10:17 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney Barbara Anne Solomon to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (rch) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 11/02 10:19 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (rch) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 11/02 10:20 AM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. (rch) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 11/02 10:21 AM
Case Designated ECF. (rch) |
||
Tuesday, November 01, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 11/01 5:46 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Insley-Pruitt on behalf of Chanel, Inc.. (Insley-Pruitt, Jennifer) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 11/01 5:37 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Beautyspin Corp., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Chanel, Inc.. (Solomon, Barbara) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 11/01 5:33 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Chanel, Inc..(Solomon, Barbara) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 11/01 5:29 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Solomon, Barbara) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 11/01 5:28 PM
COMPLAINT against Beautyspin Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12940309)Document filed by Chanel, Inc..(Solomon, Barbara) |