Original Case: 1:16-cv-03247

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:16-cv.pr-02263
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Nov 01, 2016
Terminated:Apr 24, 2017
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 25, 2017 4:36 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
CALIFORNIA CASUALTY INDEMNITY EXCHANGE
Represented By
Thomas V. McCarron
SEMMES, BOWEN & SEMMES
contact info
James Olin Spiker IV
SEMMES, BOWEN & SEMMES
contact info
Joel D. Seledee
MARSDEN & SELEDEE, LLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MARSDEN & SELEDEE, LLC
Represented By
Thomas V. McCarron
SEMMES, BOWEN & SEMMES
contact info
Joel D. Seledee
MARSDEN & SELEDEE, LLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
THE O'NEAL LAW FIRM, LLP
Defendant - Appellee
THATCHER LAW FIRM
Defendant - Appellee
MITCHELL IRA BATT, Individual Capacity
Defendant - Appellee
BRYAN CHAPMAN
Defendant - Appellee
RAOUF MUHAMMAD ABDULLAH, Individual Capacity
Defendant - Appellee
CHARLENE SUKARI HARDNETT, Individual Capacity
Defendant - Appellee
BRADFORD ASSOCIATES
Defendant - Appellee
PESSIN KATZ LAW, P.A.
Defendant - Appellee
MARYLAND STATE EDUCATION ASSOCIATION
Defendant - Appellee
ASSOCIATION OF SUPERVISORY & ADMINISTRATIVE SCHOOL
Defendant - Appellee
MARYLAND STATE DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOSEPHAT MUA
Represented By
Josephat Mua
contact info

GPO Apr 24 2017
UNPUBLISHED PER CURIAM OPINION filed. Motion disposition in opinion--granting Motion to dismiss appeal [999965580-2]; denying Motion attorney's fees [1000002168-2]; denying Motion to reconsider [999975089-2]; granting Motion to exceed length limitations [1000066195-2], granting Motion to exceed length limitations [1000039151-2], granting Motion to exceed length limitations [999997682-2]; granting Motion to file supplemental brief(s) [1000039153-2]; denying Motion to suspend [1000066194-2], denying Motion to suspend [1000039149-3] Originating case number: 1:16-cv-03247-ELH Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [1000067291]. Mailed to: J Mua. [16-2263]

Docket last updated: 04/25/2017 4:33 AM EDT
Tuesday, November 01, 2016
1 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:16-cv-03247-ELH. Case manager: AWalker. 16-2263 (AW)
Related: [-]
2 2 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: J Mua. Informal Opening Brief due 11/25/2016 Informal response brief, if any: 17 days after informal opening brief filed. 16-2263 (AW)
Related: [-]
3 3 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 11/15/2016 16-2263 (AW)
Related: [-]