Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-16885

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurel M Isicoff
Case #: 1:16-ap-01600
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 02, 2016
Terminated:May 23, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Central Paper Co., Inc.
Represented By
Central Paper Co., Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles M. Berk
GrayRobinson, P.A. c/o Steven J. Solomon, Esq. 333 SE 2nd Avenue, Suite 3200
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Steven J. Solomon, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 23, 2017
11 11 court Close Adversary Case Tue 05/23 10:47 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-1600 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2017
10 10 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Wed 05/17 2:38 PM
Notice of Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2017
9 9 misc Report of Mediator Wed 01/25 5:43 PM
Report of Mediator Filed by Mediator James P. S. Leshaw. (Leshaw, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2017
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Wed 01/04 3:46 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Jason A. Weber Esq. Filed by Defendant Central Paper Co., Inc.. (Weber, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2016
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Mon 12/12 2:09 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-] 5 Notice of Hearing Amended/Renoticed/Continued
Friday, December 09, 2016
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing-Hearing BK Sat 12/10 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Related [+] Notice Date 12/09/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Re- Notice of Pretrial Conference scheduled for 01/11/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128.
Wednesday, December 07, 2016
5 5 court Notice of Hearing [Amd/Rntc/Cntd] (AP) Wed 12/07 2:11 PM
Re- Notice of Pretrial Conference scheduled for 01/11/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2016
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Fri 11/04 10:33 AM
Certificate of Service regarding the (i) Complaint, (ii) Summons and Notice of Pretrial/Trial in an Adversary Proceeding, (iii) Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial, (iv) Order Granting and Modifying Liquidating Trustee's Motion for Order Establishing Uniform Procedures for Preference Adversary Proceedings [D.E. #1104, Main Case], and (v) Order Granting Liquidating Trustee's Amended Motion for Order Approving Selection of and Payment to Mediator for Trust Avoidance Actions [D.E. #1114, Main Case] Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk,2 Summons Issued,3 Order Setting Requirements
Thursday, November 03, 2016
3 3 order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Thu 11/03 10:07 AM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 30 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 11/03 10:06 AM
Summons Issued on Central Paper Co., Inc. Answer Due 12/5/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/04/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk
Wednesday, November 02, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/02 12:42 PM
Adversary case 16-01600 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against Central Paper Co., Inc.. to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Wed 11/02 12:49 PM
Receipt of Complaint 16-01600 LMI) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 28597225. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]