McKnight et al v. Linn Operating, Inc. et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:16-bk-60040
Lead BK case is: 6:16-bk-60040
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 6:16-ap-06019 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other 21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 02, 2016 |
Terminated: | Nov 21, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Linn Operating, Inc.
JPMorgan Chase Tower 600 Travis, Suite 5100
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Linn Energy, LLC
JPMorgan Chase Tower 600 Travis, Suite 5100
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer McKnight
1 NE 2nd St., Suite 202
Oklahoma City, OK 73104 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott McKnight
1 NE 2nd St., Suite 202
Oklahoma City, OK 73104 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:10 PM CDT |
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
49 | 49
trustee
Remark (batch)
Tue 10/17 5:17 PM
Remark: Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. . (DawnaKelly) |
|
Thursday, November 23, 2017 | ||
48 | 48
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 11/24 12:01 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/23/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
47 | 47
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tue 11/21 4:42 PM
Agreed Order Dismissing Complaint with Prejudice Signed on 11/21/2017. (LinhthuDo) |
|
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
46 | 46
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Mon 10/16 4:52 PM
Agreed Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Linn Energy, LLC, Linn Operating, Inc. (Cavenaugh, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
45 | 45
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Wed 09/13 4:18 PM
Answer to Defendants Linn Operating, Inc.'s and Linn Energy, LLC's Counterclaim Filed by Jennifer McKnight, Scott McKnight (Helms, Conner) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
44 | 44
answer|cmp
Answer to Complaint|Counterclaim
Wed 08/23 6:20 PM
Answer to Complaint , Counterclaim by Linn Energy, LLC, Linn Operating, Inc. against Jennifer McKnight, Scott McKnight Filed by Linn Energy, LLC, Linn Operating, Inc. (Tomasco, Patricia) |
|
Sunday, August 13, 2017 | ||
43 | 43
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 08/13 11:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 08/13/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
42 | 42
notice
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript (Form)
Fri 08/11 9:46 AM
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to41 Transcript. Parties notified (hcar) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
33
pgs
court
Transcript
Thu 08/10 12:41 PM
Transcript RE: Hearing on Moton to Dismiss held on August 9, 2017 before Judge David R. Jones. Transcript is available for viewing in the Clerk's Office. Filed by Transcript access will be restricted through 11/8/2017. (mhen) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
misc
AO435 Transcript Request
Wed 08/09 11:02 AM
AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM Daily (24 hours) by Patricia B. Tomasco. This is to order a transcript of Motion to Dismiss held on August 9, 2017 before Judge David R. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Judicial Transcribers of Texas (Filed By Linn Energy, LLC, Linn Operating, Inc. ). (Tomasco, Patricia) |
|
court
Courtroom Minutes (Text)
Wed 08/09 10:22 AM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 9:30 AM. Appearances: Matt Cavenaugh, Guy Light, Connor Helms and Michael Rubenstein . After oral argument, the Court ruled on each claim. Mr. Cavenaugh has been asked to prepare and upload an order outlining the courts ruling by August 18. Additionally, the parties to work out an agreed scheduling order. (aalo) |
||
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Exhibit List
Mon 08/07 11:44 AM
Exhibit List, Witness List (Filed By Linn Energy, LLC, Linn Operating, Inc. ) (Cavenaugh, Matthew) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Exhibit List
Fri 08/04 12:41 PM
Witness List, Exhibit List (Filed By Jennifer McKnight, Scott McKnight ) (Helms, Conner) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
notice
Notice
Mon 07/24 6:20 PM
Notice of Reset Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss . Filed by Linn Energy, LLC, Linn Operating, Inc. (Tomasco, Patricia) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
court
Certificate of Notice
Thu 07/13 11:27 AM
Certificate of e-mail Notice. The court was contacted by Michael Rubenstein. By agreement of the parties, the hearing on the Motion to Dismiss is reset from 7/19/17 to 8/9/2017 at 09:30 AM at Houston, Courtroom 400 (DRJ). (efre) |
||
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice
Wed 07/12 6:46 PM
Notice of Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss . Filed by Linn Energy, LLC, Linn Operating, Inc. (Tomasco, Patricia) |
|
court
Certificate of Notice
Wed 07/12 5:37 PM
Certificate of Email Notice. Contacted Patty Tomasco. Movant to notice all interested parties and file a certificate of service with the court . Hearing scheduled for 7/19/2017 at 02:00 PM at Houston, Courtroom 400 (DRJ). (aalo) |
||
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
answer
Response
Mon 05/08 2:21 PM
Response . Filed by Jennifer McKnight, Scott McKnight (Helms, Conner) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Judge Russell's Order of 2-26-16 | ||
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Affidavit
Wed 04/26 12:23 PM
Affidavit Re: of Kadeem Champagnie Regarding Linn Operating, Inc. and Linn Energy, LLC's Motion to Dismiss McKnights' Amended Adversary Complaint (Ad. Docket No. 30) . . Filed by Prime Clerk LLC (Steele, Benjamin) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Mon 04/17 5:37 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Linn Energy, LLC, Linn Operating, Inc. (Tomasco, Patricia) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Declaration
Mon 04/03 2:42 PM
Declaration re: Order by Scott McKnight (Filed By Jennifer McKnight, Scott McKnight ) (Helms, Conner) |
|
31 | 31
misc
Declaration
Mon 04/03 2:40 PM
Declaration re: Order by Jennifer McKnight (Filed By Jennifer McKnight, Scott McKnight ) (Helms, Conner) |
|
30 | 30
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 04/03 2:37 PM
Amended Complaint (Helms, Conner) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Lease | ||
Saturday, April 01, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 04/01 11:52 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/01/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Reconsider
Thu 03/30 11:58 AM
Order Signed on 3/30/2017. (dsta) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 03/24 11:56 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/24/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Reconsider
Wed 03/22 3:43 PM
Motion to Reconsider . Filed by Jennifer McKnight, Scott McKnight (Helms, Conner) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - February 24, 2017 Transcript | ||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wed 03/22 11:30 AM
Order Granting in Part Debtors' Motion to Dismiss McKnights Adversary Complain Signed on 3/21/2017. (dsta) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Proposed Order Submission After Hearing (Greensheet)
Mon 03/20 2:28 PM
Proposed Order Submission After Hearing (Filed By Jennifer McKnight, Scott McKnight ) (Rubenstein, Michael) |
|
23 | 23
misc
Proposed Order Submission After Hearing (Greensheet)
Mon 03/20 2:15 PM
Proposed Order Submission After Hearing (Filed By Linn Energy, LLC, Linn Operating, Inc. ) (Tomasco, Patricia) |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 03/09 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 03/08/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript (Form)
Mon 03/06 8:48 AM
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to19 Transcript. Parties notified (jdav) |
|
Saturday, March 04, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 03/04 11:51 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 03/04/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 03, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
11
pgs
court
Transcript
Fri 03/03 6:46 AM
Transcript RE: Status Conference held on February 28, 2017 before Judge David R. Jones. Transcript is available for viewing in the Clerk's Office. Filed by Transcript access will be restricted through 06/1/2017. (mhen) |
|
Thursday, March 02, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript (Form)
Thu 03/02 9:08 AM
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to17 Transcript. Parties notified (hcar) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
52
pgs
court
Transcript
Wed 03/01 5:46 PM
Transcript RE: Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding held on February 24, 2017 before Judge David R. Jones. Transcript is available for viewing in the Clerk's Office. Filed by Transcript access will be restricted through 05/30/2017. (mhen) |
|
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
court
Courtroom Minutes (Text)
Tue 02/28 9:03 AM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 8:50 am. Appearances: Matthew Cavenaugh (phone), Stephen Hessler, Patricia Tomasco and Brian Lennon for the Debtor, Jim Donnell and Peter Goodman for Wells Fargo, William Greendyke, by phone, Ad Hoc Group of Berry Noteholders, Benjamin Finestone for the Ad Hoc Committee Berry Sr. Noteholders, Aaron Renenger for Ad Hoc Group of Linn Unsecured Noteholders, Joseph Zujkowski for Ad Hoc Group of Holders of the 12% Senior Secured Notes Due 2020, Thomas Walper for Linn Acquisition, John Melko for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Committee Status conference held. The Court informed the Parties that they may contact the case manager if hearing time is required on 2/28/2017. No further status conference scheduled. (dsta) |
||
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
AO435 Transcript Request
Mon 02/27 2:04 PM
AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM Expedited (7 days) by Michael D. Rubenstein. This is to order a transcript of Status Conference held 2/24/2017 before Judge David R. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Judicial Transcribers of Texas (Filed By Jennifer McKnight, Scott McKnight ). (jdav)Electronically forwarded to Judicial Transcribers on 2/27/2017. Estimated Completion date 3/6/2017. Modified on 2/27/2017 (ShoshanaArnow) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
AO435 Transcript Request
Fri 02/24 3:52 PM
AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM Daily (24 hours) by Patricia B. Tomasco/Jackson Walker. This is to order a transcript of Adversary hearing on Motion to Dismiss February 24, 2017 before Judge David R. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Judicial Transcribers of Texas (Filed By Linn Energy, LLC, Linn Operating, Inc. ). (Tomasco, Patricia) Electronically forwarded to Judicial on 2/27/2017. Estimated Completion Date 2/28/2017. Modified on 2/27/2017 (ShoshanaArnowadi) |
|
14 | 14
court
Courtroom Minutes (CM)
Fri 02/24 3:06 PM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 2:02 pm. Appearances: Matthew Cavenaugh, Stephen Hessler, Anna Rotman, Guy Light and Brian Lennon for the Debtor, Jim Donnell and Courtney Giles for Wells Fargo, Michael Riordan, by phone, for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, William Greendyke, by phone, Ad Hoc Group of Berry Noteholders, Michael Rubenstein for Jennifer and Scott McKnight, Mark Bane, by phone, for Unsecured Creditors Committee, Benjamin Finestone for the Ad Hoc Committee Berry Sr. Noteholders Counsel for the Linn Operating provided the case with a brief status update. Continued status conference to be held on 2/28/2017 at 08:45 AM at Houston, Courtroom 400 (DRJ). Parties to contact the case manager if the hearing is not required. The Court dismissed the claim for class certification with prejudice. The Court granted the motion to dismiss regarding the request for determination that notice failed to satisfy due process. The Court granted the motion to dismiss as it relates to underlying individual claims. The Court will allow Jennifer and Scott McKnight to re-plead. Amended Complaint to be filed by 5:00 PM on 3/13/2017. Parties to contact the case manager if Rule 12 motions require hearings. Counsel for the Debtor to file proposed order reflecting the findings of the Court. (dsta) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Exhibit List
Wed 02/22 12:59 PM
Exhibit List, Witness List (Filed By Linn Energy, LLC, Linn Operating, Inc. ) (Tomasco, Patricia) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit D-1 and part 1 of D-2 | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit D-2 continued | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Continued D-2 | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Continued D-2 | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D-2 Continued | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D-2 Continued | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit D-2 Continued | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit D-2 Continued | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit D-3 | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit D-4 | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit D-5 | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit D-6 | ||
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice
Wed 02/01 4:35 PM
Notice of Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss . Filed by Linn Energy, LLC, Linn Operating, Inc. (Tomasco, Patricia) |
|
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
court
Certificate of Notice
Tue 01/31 3:23 PM
Certificate of Email Notice. Contacted Patricia Tomasco. Movant to notice all interested parties and file a certificate of service with the court . Hearing scheduled for 2/24/2017 at 02:00 PM at Houston, Courtroom 400 (DRJ). (aalo) |
||
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Reply
Mon 01/23 5:30 PM
Reply in Support of Linn Operating, Inc. and Linn Energy, LLC's Motion to dismiss McKnights' Adversary Complaint . Filed by Linn Energy, LLC, Linn Operating, Inc. (Tomasco, Patricia) |
|
10 | 10
answer
Response
Mon 01/23 3:19 PM
Supplemental Response . Filed by Jennifer McKnight, Scott McKnight (Helms, Conner) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Naylor Order | ||
Friday, January 06, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Response
Fri 01/06 3:50 PM
Response . Filed by Jennifer McKnight, Scott McKnight (Helms, Conner) |
|
Monday, December 12, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Affidavit
Mon 12/12 4:07 PM
Affidavit Re: of Rafael Stitt Regarding Linn Operating, Inc. and Linn Energy, LLCs Motion to Dismiss McKnights' Adversary Complaint (Docket No. 1) . . Filed by Prime Clerk LLC (Steele, Benjamin) |
|
Friday, December 02, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Fri 12/02 6:12 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Linn Energy, LLC, Linn Operating, Inc. (Tomasco, Patricia) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - February 25 Order | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - July 25, 2012 Order | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - April 1, 2010 Order | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - August 25th hearing transcript | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - October 11, 2016 Hearing Transcript | ||
Tuesday, November 22, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 11/22 10:09 AM
Summons Service Executed on Linn Energy, LLC 11/15/2016; Linn Operating, Inc. 11/15/2016. (Helms, Conner) |
|
Saturday, November 05, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 11/06 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/05/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, November 04, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Fri 11/04 10:20 AM
Summons Issued as to Linn Energy, LLC Date Issued 11/4/2016; Linn Operating, Inc. Date Issued 11/4/2016. (jdav) |
|
Thursday, November 03, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary)
Thu 11/03 6:30 AM
|
|
Wednesday, November 02, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Wed 11/02 9:44 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Linn Operating, Inc.; Linn Energy, LLC;. (Helms, Conner) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Wed 11/02 9:30 AM
Adversary case 16-06019 Nature of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))), (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) Complaint by Jennifer McKnight, Scott McKnight against Linn Operating, Inc., Linn Energy, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (Helms, Conner) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 -Notice | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2- Order of 2-26-16 |