Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Sidney A Fitzwater
Case #: 3:16-cv-03090
Nature of Suit690 Forfeiture/Penalty - Other
Cause28:1341 Complaint for Forfeiture
Case Filed:Nov 03, 2016
Terminated:Sep 11, 2017
Last checked: Tuesday May 02, 2017 4:07 AM CDT
Defendant
$213,463.02 in Funds Seized from First Republic Bank Account #80001082495
Defendant
$286,717.37 in Funds Seized from First Republic Bank Account #80001082453
Defendant
$403,348.76 in Funds Seized from First Republic Bank Account #80002052935
Defendant
$86,051.27 in Funds Seized from First Republic Bank Account #80001584466
Interested Party
Hugh Hill
403 E 90th St Apt 1R
New York, NY 10128
Interested Party
Dean Schettini
166 Morris Parkway
Valley Stream, NY 11580
Interested Party
Robert S Yingling
166 Lees Hill Rd
Basking Ridge, NJ 07920
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Marina Fernandez-DOJ
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Marina Fernandez
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Vesna Karina Harasic-Yaksic-DOJ
Department Of Justice
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, May 10, 2018
44 44 service Certificate of Service Fri 05/11 11:59 AM
USMS Process Receipt and Return re40 Default Judgment. (aaa)
Related: [-]
43 43 service Certificate of Service Fri 05/11 11:25 AM
USMS Process Receipt and Return re40 Default Judgment. (aaa)
Related: [-]
42 42 service Certificate of Service Fri 05/11 11:21 AM
USMS Process Receipt and Return re40 Default Judgment. (aaa)
Related: [-]
41 41 service Certificate of Service Thu 05/10 3:45 PM
USMS Process Receipt and Return re40 Default Judgment. (aaa)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2017
40 40 2 pgs order Judgment - Default Mon 09/11 10:10 AM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AGAINST THE DEFENDANT PROPERTY: It is hereby ORDERED that all right, title, claim, and interest of Andrew Scherr, Darren Fortunado, Glenn Weber, Robert E. McGraw, Companion Property and Casualty Insurance Company/Freestone Insurance Company, U.S. Bank Trust National Association, Massive Holdings, LLC, Southport Lane, LP, Southport RE, LLC, and Southport Lane Securities, LLC., and any and all unknown possible claimants who have failed to file a verified claim and answer or motion under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12 to the Defendant property is forfeited to the United States of America; and it is further ORDERED that the Defendant property be disposed of in accordance with law. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/11/2017) (epm)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Mon 09/11 11:35 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:40 . Mon Sep 11 11:35:50 CDT 2017 (crt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2017
39 39 misc Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 09/07 10:11 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to All Known and Unknown Possible Claimants. (epm)
Related: [-]
38 38 respm Brief/Memorandum In Support Thu 09/07 8:41 AM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by United States of America re37 Combined Request for Clerks Entry of Default and MOTION for Default Judgment against All Defendants (Harasic-Yaksic, Vesna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s),
Att: 2 Exhibit(s),
Att: 3 Exhibit(s),
Att: 4 Exhibit(s),
Att: 5 Exhibit(s)
37 37 motion Default Judgment Thu 09/07 8:38 AM
Combined Request for Clerks Entry of Default and MOTION for Default Judgment against All Defendants filed by United States of America (Harasic-Yaksic, Vesna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, July 31, 2017
34 34 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Mon 07/31 9:20 AM
Request for Clerk to issue Arrest Warrant in Rem filed by United States of America. (Fernandez, Marina)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Mon 07/31 9:19 AM
Request for Clerk to issue Arrest Warrant in Rem filed by United States of America. (Fernandez, Marina)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Mon 07/31 9:19 AM
Request for Clerk to issue Arrest Warrant in Rem filed by United States of America. (Fernandez, Marina)
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Mon 07/31 9:18 AM
Request for Clerk to issue Arrest Warrant in Rem filed by United States of America. (Fernandez, Marina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2017
30 30 order Order on Motion to Strike Thu 07/27 3:36 PM
ORDER granting18 MOTION to Strike11 Notice (Other),9 Notice (Other) filed by United States of America. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 7/27/2017) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Thu 07/27 4:24 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:30. Thu Jul 27 16:24:39 CDT 2017 (crt)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2017
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Mon 07/17 12:09 PM
ORDER granting27 ,28 Motions for Reconsideration. The court's 5/3/2017 order is vacated as to Yingling and Schettini. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 7/17/2017) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Mon 07/17 1:33 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:29. Mon Jul 17 13:33:10 CDT 2017 (crt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2017
28 28 motion Reconsideration Wed 05/31 4:12 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re22 Order on Motion to Strike filed by Dean Schettini. (ykp)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Reconsideration Wed 05/31 4:10 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re22 Order on Motion to Strike filed by Robert S Yingling. (ykp)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 19, 2017
26 26 respm Reply Fri 05/19 7:43 PM
REPLY filed by United States of America re:18 MOTION to Strike11 Notice (Other),9 Notice (Other),10 Notice (Other) (Harasic-Yaksic-DOJ, Vesna)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2017
25 25 respm Response/Objection Mon 05/08 4:19 PM
RESPONSE filed by Dean Schettini re:18 MOTION to Strike11 Verified Claim of Interest. (twd)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2017
24 24 6 pgs respm Response/Objection Fri 05/05 3:28 PM
RESPONSE filed by Robert S Yingling re:18 MOTION to Strike11 Verified Claim of Interest filed by Dean Schettini,9 Claim of Interest filed by Robert S Yingling,10 Verified Claim of Interest filed by Hugh Hill. (svc)
Related: [-]
23 23 respm Response/Objection Fri 05/05 3:27 PM
RESPONSE filed by Hugh Hill re:18 MOTION to Strike11 Verified Claim of Interest filed by Dean Schettini,9 Claim of Interest filed by Robert S Yingling,10 Verified Claim of Interest filed by Hugh Hill. (svc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2017
misc Order Receipt Thu 05/04 7:57 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:22. Thu May 4 07:57:32 CDT 2017 (crt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2017
22 22 order Order on Motion to Strike Wed 05/03 5:22 PM
ORDER granting18 MOTION to Strike. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/3/2017) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2017
21 21 order Order Mon 04/17 8:32 AM
ORDER: Having considered plaintiff's request in the parties' 3/20/2017 joint scheduling proposal, the court has decided to defer entering a scheduling order until it decides plaintiff's motion to strike. Accordingly, if the court denies the motion to strike, in whole or in part, a revised joint scheduling proposal must be filed within 21 days of the date the court's decision is filed. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/17/2017) (epm)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Order Mon 04/17 8:29 AM
ORDER: No later than 21 days after this order is filed, claimants must comply with Rule 7.4 so that the court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/17/2017) (epm)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Mon 04/17 8:32 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:20,21. Mon Apr 17 08:32:49 CDT 2017 (crt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2017
19 19 respm Brief/Memorandum In Support Tue 04/04 8:22 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by United States of America re18 MOTION to Strike11 Notice (Other),9 Notice (Other),10 Notice (Other) (Harasic-Yaksic-DOJ, Vesna)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Strike Tue 04/04 8:21 PM
MOTION to Strike11 Notice (Other),9 Notice (Other),10 Notice (Other) filed by United States of America (Harasic-Yaksic-DOJ, Vesna)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2017
17 17 misc Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order Mon 03/20 8:41 PM
Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by United States of America. (Harasic-Yaksic-DOJ, Vesna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2017
16 16 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 03/16 4:17 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vesna Karina Harasic-Yaksic-DOJ on behalf of United States of America. (Filer will update contact info in ECF.) (Harasic-Yaksic-DOJ, Vesna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 21, 2017
15 15 order Order for Scheduling Order Proposal Tue 02/21 9:04 AM
Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 3/21/2017. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 2/21/2017) (axm)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Tue 02/21 9:05 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:15. Tue Feb 21 09:05:13 CST 2017 (crt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2017
14 14 12 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/15 4:11 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem filed by Dean Schettini. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Related [+]
Related: [-] kc
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/15 4:08 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem filed by Robert S Yingling. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Related [+]
Related: [-] kc
Monday, February 13, 2017
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/13 12:06 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem filed by Hugh Hill. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (sss)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2017
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Wed 01/25 1:38 PM
Verified Claim of Interest filed by Dean Schettini. (mem)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 24, 2017
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Tue 01/24 12:35 PM
NOTICE of Verified Claim of Interest filed by Hugh Hill. (sss)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s)
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Tue 01/24 12:33 PM
NOTICE of Verified Claim of Interest filed by Robert S Yingling. (sss)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2016
7 7 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Fri 11/04 8:38 AM
Request for Clerk to issue Warrant for Arrest of Property in Rem filed by United States of America. (Fernandez-DOJ, Marina)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Fri 11/04 8:36 AM
Request for Clerk to issue Warrant for Arrest of Property in Rem filed by United States of America. (Fernandez-DOJ, Marina)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Fri 11/04 8:29 AM
Request for Clerk to issue Warrant for Arrest of Property in Rem filed by United States of America. (Fernandez-DOJ, Marina)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Fri 11/04 8:26 AM
Request for Clerk to issue Warrant for Arrest of Property in Rem filed by United States of America. (Fernandez-DOJ, Marina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 03, 2016
3 3 qcref Fitzwater Thu 11/03 4:32 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (epm)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Thu 11/03 3:41 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States of America. (Fernandez, Marina)
Related: [-]
1 1 23 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 11/03 3:37 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by United States of America. (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Fernandez, Marina)
Related: [-]