Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:16-bk-27092

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Michael B Kaplan
Case #: 3:16-ap-01812
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Nov 03, 2016
Terminated:May 11, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Shadiyah McCutchen
1118 Edpas Road
New Brunswick, NJ 08901
Represented By
Shadiyah McCutchen
contact info
Plaintiff
NJ Department of Labor and Workforce Development, Division of Unemployment and Disability Insurance
R.J. Hughes Justice Building 25 Market Street PO Box 119
Trenton, NJ 08625
Represented By
Gregory L. Van Dyck
Division Of Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Thursday, May 11, 2017
utility Close Adversary Case Thu 05/11 12:09 PM
Adversary Case (3:16-ap-1812) Closed. (slf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2017
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Thu 01/26 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/25/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 21, 2017
10 10 order Money Judgment Mon 01/23 2:53 PM
Money Judgment in favor of NJ Department of Labor and Workforce Development, Division of Unemployment and Disability Insurance and against Shadiyah McCutchen in the amount of $ 16,396.96 Related [+] . Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 1/23/2017. (wir)
Related: [-] 5 Request to Enter Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff NJ Department of Labor and Workforce Development, Division of Unemployment and Disability Insurance
Wednesday, January 18, 2017
court Hearing Held Wed 01/18 2:09 PM
Minute of 1/18/17; GRANTED Related [+] (kmf )
Related: [-] 7 Notice of Hearing - (Generic)
Wednesday, January 04, 2017
court Hearing Held Thu 01/05 9:04 AM
Minute of 1/4/17 PROOF HEARING SCHEDULED, ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED Related [+] (kmf )
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Friday, December 23, 2016
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 12/24 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/23/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 12/24 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/23/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2016
7 7 court Notice of Hearing - (Generic) Wed 12/21 10:32 AM
PROOF HEARING: Related [+]. The following parties were served: Plaintiff, Plaintiff's Attorney, Defendant. Hearing scheduled for 1/18/2017 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (wir)
Related: [-] 5 Request to Enter Default Judgment Against Shadiyah McCutchen filed by Gregory L. Van Dyck on behalf of NJ Department of Labor and Workforce Development, Division of Unemployment and Disability Insurance. (Attachments: # 1 Certification # 2 Exhibit # 3 Proposed Order # 4 Certificate of Service) (Van Dyck, Gregory) filed by Plaintiff NJ Department of Labor and Workforce Development, Division of Unemployment and Disability Insurance
6 6 court Entry of Default Wed 12/21 10:22 AM
Entry of Default against Shadiyah McCutchen Related [+] The following parties were served: Plaintiff, Plaintiff's Attorney, Defendant. (wir)
Related: [-] 4 Request to Enter Default filed by Plaintiff NJ Department of Labor and Workforce Development, Division of Unemployment and Disability Insurance
Monday, December 19, 2016
5 5 misc Request to Enter Default Judgment Mon 12/19 4:47 PM
Request to Enter Default Judgment Against Shadiyah McCutchen filed by Gregory L. Van Dyck on behalf of NJ Department of Labor and Workforce Development, Division of Unemployment and Disability Insurance. (Van Dyck, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification
Att: 2 Exhibit
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
4 4 misc Request to Enter Default Mon 12/19 4:46 PM
Request to Enter Default Against Shadiyah McCutchen filed by Gregory L. Van Dyck on behalf of NJ Department of Labor and Workforce Development, Division of Unemployment and Disability Insurance. (Van Dyck, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Certification
Att: 3 Cover Letter
Wednesday, November 09, 2016
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/09 2:57 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Gregory L. Van Dyck on behalf of NJ Department of Labor and Workforce Development, Division of Unemployment and Disability Insurance. (Van Dyck, Gregory)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 16-01812 Complaint by NJ Department of Labor and Workforce Development, Division of Unemployment and Disability Insurance against Shadiyah McCutchen. Fee Amount $ 350.. (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (Attachments: # 1 Summons # 2 Cover Letter) (Van Dyck, Gregory) filed by Plaintiff NJ Department of Labor and Workforce Development, Division of Unemployment and Disability Insurance
Friday, November 04, 2016
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 11/04 10:31 AM
Summons Issued to NJ Dept of Labor and Workforce Development for Service on Shadiyah McCutchen Answer due on 12/5/2016 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 1/4/2017 at 02:00 PM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (wdr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Attachments
Thursday, November 03, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 11/03 3:48 PM
Adversary case 16-01812 Complaint by NJ Department of Labor and Workforce Development, Division of Unemployment and Disability Insurance against Shadiyah McCutchen. Fee Amount $ 350.. (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (Van Dyck, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Att: 2 Cover Letter