California Central District Court
Judge:Josephine L Staton
Case #: 2:16-cv-08250
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BAP)
Case Filed:Nov 04, 2016
Terminated:Feb 28, 2017

Debtor
Frank Adler

,
Represented By
Derik Neil Lewis
Veritas Law Office
contact info
Debtor
Lauren Adler

,
Represented By
Derik Neil Lewis
Veritas Law Office
contact info
Last checked: Wednesday May 03, 2017 2:21 AM PDT
Appellant
Frank Adler
Represented By
Derik Neil Lewis
Veritas Law Office
contact info
Appellant
Lauren Adler
Represented By
Derik Neil Lewis
Veritas Law Office
contact info
Appellee
Nancy Hoffmeier Zamora
Represented By
Nancy Hoffmeier Zamora
Zamora And Hoffmeier
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, February 28, 2017
8 8 order Dismiss Bankruptcy Appeal Tue 02/28 11:08 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO VOLUNTARILY DISMISS APPEAL (DOC. 7) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: In this bankruptcy appeal, Appellants filed a Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Appeal one day after their opening brief was due. (Doc. 7.) Appellee has not opposed. Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8023 provides for dismissals of bankruptcy appeals on an appellant's motion "on terms agreed to by the parties or fixed by the district court or BAP." IT IS SO ORDERED. In the absence of opposition by Appellee, the Court dismisses the present appeal and orders that the parties shall bear their own costs. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (es)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2016
7 7 motion Dismiss Bankruptcy Appeal Fri 12/16 9:11 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Debtor-Appellant Frank Adler, Lauren Adler. (Attorney Derik Neil Lewis added to party Frank Adler(pty:db), Attorney Derik Neil Lewis added to party Lauren Adler(pty:db)) (Lewis, Derik)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 15, 2016
6 6 bankruptcy Notice Re: Bankruptcy Record Complete (CV-8) - optional html form Tue 11/15 2:55 PM
NOTICE RE: BANKRUPTCY RECORD COMPLETE. Please note, pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(3), this Court has received from the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court either the record for the above-captioned appeal or notice that the record is available electronically. The parties are responsible for reading and complying with all requirements, including briefing, provided in this notice. Appellant must serve and file a brief by 12/15/2016. (dro)
Related: [-]
5 5 appeal Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability Tue 11/15 2:54 PM
Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment,1 (dro)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2016
4 4 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 11/08 12:12 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
Related: [-]
3 3 bankruptcy Notice Regarding Appeal from Bankruptcy Court (CV-26) - optional html form Tue 11/08 12:12 PM
NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. One of the parties having so requested, this appeal from the U.S. Bankruptcy Court is assigned to District Judge Josephine L. Staton. The District Court Case No. 2:16-cv-08250 JLS must appear on all documents filed in this appeal, along with any Bankruptcy Court and adversary proceeding case numbers. Bankruptcy Court Case No. 1:16-bk-10099-VK, Adversary Case No. NA, and Bankruptcy Appellate No. cc 16-1315 The parties are responsible for reading and complying with all requirements provided in this notice and applicable rules of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure. Failure to comply with the time requirements stated in this notice and applicable rules may result in the dismissal of the appeal or the right to oppose the appeal. (esa)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Tue 11/08 11:59 AM
U.S. Bankruptcy Appellate Panel of the Ninth Circuit Notice of Transfer of Appeal to District Court; Acknowledgment of Receipt by District Court (esa)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment Tue 11/08 11:57 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION Re: ORDER Denying Debtors' Motion to Compel Abandonment of Property by Trustee entered on 9/19/16 by Bankruptcy Judge Victoria S. Kaufman, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 9/30/16. Bankruptcy Court case number: 1:16-bk-10099-VK, Adversary number: NA, BAP case number: cc 16-1315 filed by appellants Frank Adler, Lauren Adler. (esa) (esa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (11/8/2016) bk dkt