Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Kenneth A Marra
Case #: 9:16-cv-81860
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:0201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Nov 10, 2016
Terminated:Jan 30, 2017
Last checked: Tuesday May 09, 2017 5:22 AM EDT
Defendant
Mark R. Jones
Defendant
Jones Lumber - US LBM, LLC
Defendant
MRJ Holdings, Inc.
Defendant
Terry L. Smith
Plaintiff
Rentz Kolva
Represented By
Mitchell Lloyd Feldman
Feldman Law Group, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago
Monday, January 30, 2017
8 8 order Order Dismissing Case Mon 01/30 4:45 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE; approving6 MOTION for Settlement (Plaintiff's Motion for Approval of Settlement and Request for Dismissal with Prejudice) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Rentz Kolva. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 1/30/2017. (ir)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2017
7 7 notice Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Wed 01/25 1:49 PM
Clerks Notice to Filer re6 MOTION for Settlement (Plaintiff's Motion for Approval of Settlement and Request for Dismissal with Prejudice) . Motion with Multiple Reliefs Filed as One Relief ; ERROR - The Filer selected only one relief event and failed to select the additional corresponding events for each relief requested in the motion. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual. (asl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 24, 2017
6 6 motion Settlement Tue 01/24 4:07 PM
MOTION for Settlement (Plaintiff's Motion for Approval of Settlement and Request for Dismissal with Prejudice) by Rentz Kolva. Responses due by 2/7/2017(Feldman, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement
Monday, November 14, 2016
5 5 order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Mon 11/14 1:34 PM
Order Requiring Counsel to Confer and File Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 11/14/2016. (ir)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 10, 2016
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 11/10 10:38 AM
Summons Issued as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jas)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Clerk's Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge - FORM Thu 11/10 10:28 AM
Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (jas)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Judge Assignment Thu 11/10 10:28 AM
Judge Assignment to Judge Kenneth A. Marra (lrz1)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 11/10 9:17 AM
COMPLAINT against Mark R. Jones, Jones Lumber - US LBM, LLC, MRJ Holdings, Inc., Terry L. Smith. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-9241542, filed by Rentz Kolva.(Feldman, Mitchell) Modified summons name on 11/10/2016 (lrz1)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s) [Jones Lumber - US LBM, LLC],
Att: 3 Summon(s) [MRJ Holdings, Inc.],
Att: 4 Summon(s) [Mark R. Jones],
Att: 5 Summons [Terry L. Smith]