Georgia Northern District Court
Case #: 1:16-cr-00390
Case Filed:Nov 09, 2016
Terminated:Apr 25, 2017
Last checked: Monday Dec 04, 2017 6:16 AM EST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Samir Kaushal
U.S. Attorney'S Office-Atl
contact info
Diane C. Schulman
U.S. Attorney'S Office-Atl
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Kelvin Lyles (1)
Terminated: 04/25/2017
Represented By
Careton R. Matthews
Office Of Careton R. Matthews
contact info

Docket last updated: 03/06/2018 9:58 PM EST
Wednesday, November 09, 2016
1 1 INFORMATION with forfeiture provision as to Kelvin Lyles (1) count(s) 1. (jkl)
Related: [-]
2 2 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Kelvin Lyles (jkl)
Related: [-]
3 3 Defendant Information Sheet as to Kelvin Lyles. (jkl)
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker: INITIAL APPEARANCE, ARRAIGNMENT, and PLEA of NOT GUILTY by Kelvin Lyles (1) as to Count 1; Estimated Trial Time status set. Bond set at $10,000.00. (Tape #FTR GOLD) (jkl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 PLEA
5 5 Appearance and Compliance Bond Entered as to Kelvin Lyles in amount of $10,000.00. (jkl)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Kelvin Lyles. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 11/9/2016. (jkl)
Related: [-]