Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:14-bk-34156

Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Mary Ann Whipple
Case #: 3:16-ap-03134
Nature of Suit1 null
2 Bankruptcy - Other
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 10, 2016
Terminated:Jul 18, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Adam Anders
One Boston Place 201 Washington Street
Boston, MA 02108
Represented By
Adam Anders
contact info
Defendant
John Doe
Represented By
John Doe
contact info
Defendant
David Waterman
2534 Edgehill Road
Toledo, OH 43615
Represented By
David Waterman
contact info
Defendant
Brad Mohring
3186 County Road 6-1
Delta, OH 43515
Represented By
Brad Mohring
contact info
Defendant
Geoff Meyers
2603 Falmouth Road
Toledo, OH 43615
Represented By
Geoff Meyers
contact info
Defendant
David Buzby
27 Drydock Ave
Boston, MA 02210
Represented By
David Buzby
contact info
Defendant
Daxi Li
108 W. 39th Street Suite 1300
New York, NY 10018
Represented By
Daxi Li
contact info
Defendant
Alvin Compaan
9135 W Bancroft Street
Holland, OH 43528
Represented By
Alvin Compaan
contact info
Defendant
Joe Garton
7871 Chestnut Ridge
Maumee, OH 43537
Represented By
Joe Garton
contact info
Defendant
David Wells
112 Rockledge Drive
Perrysburg, OH 43551
Represented By
David Wells
contact info
Defendant
Mark Iwanowski
403 Loudon Road
Albany, NY 12211
Represented By
Mark Iwanowski
contact info
Defendant
Granger Souder
4309 Brookside Road
Toledo, OH 43606
Represented By
Granger Souder
contact info
Defendant
Matt Longthorne
2256 Innisbrook Road
Toledo, OH 43606
Represented By
Matt Longthorne
contact info
Defendant
David Swank
8611 Township Road 308
Millersburg, OH 44654
Represented By
David Swank
contact info
Defendant
Liwei Xu
7749 Sandia Court
Sylvania, OH 43560
Represented By
Liwei Xu
contact info
Defendant
Marcus Moor
Represented By
Marcus Moor
contact info
Defendant
Masaz Izu
265 Manor Road
Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304
Represented By
Masaz Izu
contact info
Defendant
Paul Bachmeyer
830 Ashbury Drive
Perrysburg, OH 43551
Represented By
Paul Bachmeyer
contact info
Defendant
Brian Kennedy
11735 Reed Road
Whitehouse, OH 43571
Represented By
Brian Kennedy
contact info
Defendant
John Buckey
4725 Carskaddon Avenue
Toledo, OH 43615
Represented By
John Buckey
contact info
Defendant
Louis Philippe Antunes
Represented By
Louis Philippe Antunes
contact info
Defendant
Neil Cameron
Represented By
Neil Cameron
contact info
Defendant
Xunming Deng
7749 Sandia Court
Sylvania, OH 43560
Represented By
Xunming Deng
contact info
Plaintiff
Douglas A. Dymarkowski (Trustee)
5431 Main Street
Sylvania, OH 43560
Represented By
Randy J. Hart
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Thursday, July 26, 2018
court ADI Returned Mail Thu 07/26 8:30 AM
Returned Mail: Mail originally sent on 07/07/2018 returned as undeliverable. Could not mail Form pdf796 to: Daxi Li c/o CASB Ventures LLC 108 W. 39th Street Suite 1300 New York, NY 10018-3614. (ADIrm adi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 19, 2018
court ADI Returned Mail Thu 07/19 8:30 AM
Returned Mail: Mail originally sent on 07/07/2018 returned as undeliverable. Could not mail Form pdf796 to: David Buzby c/o Cambrian Innovation Inc. 27 Drydock Ave Boston, MA 02210-2382. Could not mail Form pdf796 to: David Wells 112 Rockledge Drive Perrysburg, OH 43551-2747. Could not mail Form pdf796 to: Joe Garton 7871 Chestnut Ridge Maumee, OH 43537-9242. Could not mail Form pdf796 to: Matt Longthorne 2256 Innisbrook Road Toledo, OH 43606-2527. (ADIrm adi)
Related: [-]