Fialkov v. Microsoft Corporation et al

CourtWashington Western District Court
JudgeJames L Robart
Nature of SuitOther Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:77 Securities Fraud
Case #2:13-cv-02039
FiledNov 08, 2013

Last updated: Fri 11/15 6:00 AM EST
Consol Plaintiff
Abdul R. Chaudry

,
Represented By
Edward F. Haber
Shapiro Haber & Urmy LLP
contact info
Adam M. Stewart
Shapiro Haber & Urmy LLP
contact info
Jeremy A. Lieberman
Pomerantz Haudek Block Grossman & Gross LLP
contact info
Defendant
Steven A Ballmer

,
Represented By
Kevin J. O'Connor
Collora LLP
contact info
Oliver Olanoff
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Paul J Collins
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher
contact info
Mark A. Bross
Hinckley Allen & Snyder, LLP
contact info
Michael J Connolly
Hinckley Allen & Snyder
contact info
Jonathan C Dickey
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher
contact info
Defendant
Frank H. Brood

,
Represented By
Kevin J. O'Connor
Collora LLP
contact info
Oliver Olanoff
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Paul J Collins
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher
contact info
Mark A. Bross
Hinckley Allen & Snyder, LLP
contact info
Michael J Connolly
Hinckley Allen & Snyder
contact info
Jonathan C Dickey
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher
contact info
Defendant
Peter S. Klein

,
Represented By
Kevin J. O'Connor
Collora LLP
contact info
Oliver Olanoff
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Paul J Collins
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher
contact info
Mark A. Bross
Hinckley Allen & Snyder, LLP
contact info
Michael J Connolly
Hinckley Allen & Snyder
contact info
Jonathan C Dickey
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher
contact info
Defendant
Microsoft Corporation

,
Represented By
Kevin J. O'Connor
Collora LLP
contact info
Oliver Olanoff
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Paul J Collins
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher
contact info
Mark A. Bross
Hinckley Allen & Snyder, LLP
contact info
Michael J Connolly
Hinckley Allen & Snyder
contact info
Jonathan C Dickey
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher
contact info
Defendant
Tami Reller

,
Represented By
Kevin J. O'Connor
Collora LLP
contact info
Oliver Olanoff
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Paul J Collins
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher
contact info
Mark A. Bross
Hinckley Allen & Snyder, LLP
contact info
Michael J Connolly
Hinckley Allen & Snyder
contact info
Jonathan C Dickey
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher
contact info
Movant
Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System

,
Represented By
Theodore M. Hess-Mahan
Hutchings, Barsamian, Cross And Mandelcorn, LLP
contact info
Movant
Seafarers Pension Plans

,
Represented By
Theodore M. Hess-Mahan
Hutchings, Barsamian, Cross And Mandelcorn, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Gail Fialkov

,
Represented By
Theodore M. Hess-Mahan
Hutchings, Barsamian, Cross And Mandelcorn, LLP
contact info
Deborah R Gross
Law Offices Bernard M Gross PC
contact info
David A Rosenfeld
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd Llp (ny)
contact info

last updated: Fri 11/15 6:00 AM EST
Monday, August 12, 2013
1 1 COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-4585527 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Gail Fialkov.(Hess-Mahan, Theodore) [Transferred from mad on 11/13/2013.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Plaintiff's Certification
2 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Abaid, Kimberly) [Transferred from mad on 11/13/2013.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) [Transferred from mad on 11/13/2013.]
Related: [-]
4 4 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re1 Complaint, by Gail Fialkov.(Hess-Mahan, Theodore) (Main Document 4 replaced in non-fillable format on 8/13/2013) (Moore, Kellyann). (Attachment 1 replaced in non-fillable format on 8/13/2013) (Moore, Kellyann). [Transferred from mad on 11/13/2013.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Category Form
Tuesday, August 13, 2013
5 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah R. Gross on behalf of Gail Fialkov (Gross, Deborah) [Transferred from mad on 11/13/2013.]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2013
6 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David A. Rosenfeld Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-4593556 by Gail Fialkov.(Hess-Mahan, Theodore) [Transferred from mad on 11/13/2013.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CERTIFICATE OF DAVID A. ROSENFELD PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 83.5.3(B)
Tuesday, August 20, 2013
7 7 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added David A. Rosenfeld. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Moore, Kellyann) [Transferred from mad on 11/13/2013.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2013
8 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Gail Fialkov. Microsoft Corporation served on 8/23/2013, answer due 9/13/2013. Acknowledgement filed by Gail Fialkov. (Rosenfeld, David) [Transferred from mad on 11/13/2013.]
Related: [-]
9 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Gail Fialkov. Steven A. Ballmer served on 8/23/2013, answer due 9/13/2013. Acknowledgement filed by Gail Fialkov. (Rosenfeld, David) [Transferred from mad on 11/13/2013.]
Related: [-]
10 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Gail Fialkov. Frank H. Brood served on 8/23/2013, answer due 9/13/2013. Acknowledgement filed by Gail Fialkov. (Rosenfeld, David) [Transferred from mad on 11/13/2013.]
Related: [-]
11 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Gail Fialkov. Peter S. Klein served on 8/23/2013, answer due 9/13/2013. Acknowledgement filed by Gail Fialkov. (Rosenfeld, David) [Transferred from mad on 11/13/2013.]
Related: [-]
12 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Gail Fialkov. Tami Reller served on 8/23/2013, answer due 9/13/2013. Acknowledgement filed by Gail Fialkov. (Rosenfeld, David) [Transferred from mad on 11/13/2013.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2013
13 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Bross on behalf of Steven A. Ballmer, Frank H. Brood, Peter S. Klein, Microsoft Corporation, Tami Reller (Bross, Mark) [Transferred from mad on 11/13/2013.]
Related: [-]
14 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin J. O'Connor on behalf of Steven A. Ballmer, Frank H. Brood, Peter S. Klein, Microsoft Corporation, Tami Reller (O'Connor, Kevin) [Transferred from mad on 11/13/2013.]
Related: [-]
15 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Connolly on behalf of Steven A. Ballmer, Frank H. Brood, Peter S. Klein, Microsoft Corporation, Tami Reller (Connolly, Michael) [Transferred from mad on 11/13/2013.]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2013
16 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jonathan C. Dickey Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-4654849 by Steven A. Ballmer, Frank H. Brood, Peter S. Klein, Microsoft Corporation, Tami Reller.(Connolly, Michael) [Transferred from mad on 11/13/2013.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jonathan Dickey
17 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Paul J. Collins Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-4654871 by Steven A. Ballmer, Frank H. Brood, Peter S. Klein, Microsoft Corporation, Tami Reller.(Connolly, Michael) [Transferred from mad on 11/13/2013.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Paul J. Collins
18 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Olover Olanoff Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-4654880 by Steven A. Ballmer, Frank H. Brood, Peter S. Klein, Microsoft Corporation, Tami Reller.(Connolly, Michael) [Transferred from mad on 11/13/2013.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Oliver Olanoff
Monday, September 30, 2013
19 19 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 by Kevin J. O'Connor on behalf of Steven A. Ballmer, Frank H. Brood, Peter S. Klein, Microsoft Corporation, Tami Reller. (O'Connor, Kevin) [Transferred from mad on 11/13/2013.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2013
20 20 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting16 ,17 ,18 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven A. Ballmer, Frank H. Brood, Peter S. Klein, Microsoft Corporation, Tami Reller. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lovett, Jarrett) [Transferred from mad on 11/13/2013.]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2013
21 21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection by Seafarers Pension Plans, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System.(Hess-Mahan, Theodore) [Transferred from mad on 11/13/2013.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
22 22 MEMORANDUM in Support re21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection filed by Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Seafarers Pension Plans. (Hess-Mahan, Theodore) [Transferred from mad on 11/13/2013.]
Related: [-]
23 23 AFFIDAVIT of Theodore M. Hess-Mahan in Support re21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel filed by Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Seafarers Pension Plans.(Hess-Mahan, Theodore) [Transferred from mad on 11/13/2013.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F
Friday, November 01, 2013
24 24 MOTION to Change Venue to the Western District of Washington by Steven A. Ballmer, Frank H. Brood, Peter S. Klein, Microsoft Corporation, Tami Reller.(Collins, Paul) [Transferred from mad on 11/13/2013.]
Related: [-]
25 25 MEMORANDUM in Support re24 MOTION to Change Venue to the Western District of Washington filed by Steven A. Ballmer, Frank H. Brood, Peter S. Klein, Microsoft Corporation, Tami Reller. (Collins, Paul) [Transferred from mad on 11/13/2013.]
Related: [-]
26 26 STIPULATION re24 MOTION to Change Venue to the Western District of Washington Stipulation and Proposed Order by Steven A. Ballmer, Frank H. Brood, Peter S. Klein, Microsoft Corporation, Tami Reller. (Collins, Paul) [Transferred from mad on 11/13/2013.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2013
27 27 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting (#24) Assented to Motion to Transfer Venue filed in case 1:13-cv-11928-DPW; granting (#15) Assented to Motion to Transfer Venue filed in case 1:13-cv-12266-DPW; granting (#21) Motion to Consolidate filed in case 1:13-cv-11928-DPW, reserving said motion (#21) re Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel for the presiding judge in the Western District of Washington. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-11928-DPW, 1:13-cv-12266-DPW(Lovett, Jarrett) [Transferred from mad on 11/13/2013.]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2013
28 28 Case transferred to Western District of Washington;. Case electronically transferred. (Moore, Kellyann) [Transferred from mad on 11/13/2013.]
Related: [-]