Grisham Farm Products, Inc.
Missouri Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Cynthia A Norton |
Case #: | 6:16-bk-61149 |
Case Filed: | Nov 16, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Aug 08, 2017 |
Converted: | Jul 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 09, 2021 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Grisham Farm Products, Inc.
7364 Newkirk Road
Mountain Grove, MO 65711 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Norman Rouse
Collins, Webster & Rouse 5957 E. 20th Street
Joplin, MO 64801 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Room 3440 400 East 9th Street
Kansas City, MO 64106 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/12/2018 3:20 PM CDT |
Wednesday, November 16, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
36
pgs
other
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Wed 11/16 4:04 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. (Filing fee to be paid in the amount of $1717 today.) Chapter 11 Small Business Plan due by 05/15/2017. (Margolies, Jonathan) |
|
2 | 2
other
Consent
Wed 11/16 4:28 PM
Consent to Authorization of Bankruptcy Filing filed by Grisham Farm Products, Inc. (Margolies, Jonathan (aty)) |
|
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Receipt for Filing Fees
Wed 11/16 4:32 PM
Receipt for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-61149 11) [other,volp11] (1717.00), with receipt number 13902661, in the amount of 1717.00 dollars. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
4 | 4
4
pgs
other
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
Wed 11/16 5:10 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor filed by Grisham Farm Products, Inc. (Margolies, Jonathan (aty)) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit a | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
other
Rule 2015-2 A and B
Wed 11/16 5:25 PM
Rule 2015-2 A and B filed by Grisham Farm Products, Inc. (Margolies, Jonathan (aty)) |