Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-16885

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurel M Isicoff
Case #: 1:16-ap-01622
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 16, 2016
Terminated:Sep 20, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
DNA Couture, Inc.
Represented By
DNA Couture, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles M. Berk
GrayRobinson, P.A. c/o Steven J. Solomon, Esq. 333 SE 2nd Avenue, Suite 3200
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Steven J. Solomon, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Wednesday, September 20, 2017
9 9 court Close Adversary Case Wed 09/20 11:09 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-1622 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2017
8 8 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Thu 07/13 10:32 AM
Notice of Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2017
7 7 misc Report of Mediator Wed 01/25 5:58 PM
Report of Mediator Filed by Mediator James P. S. Leshaw. (Leshaw, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 09, 2016
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing-Hearing BK Sat 12/10 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Related [+] Notice Date 12/09/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Re- Notice of Pretrial Conference scheduled for 01/11/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128.
Wednesday, December 07, 2016
5 5 court Notice of Hearing [Amd/Rntc/Cntd] (AP) Wed 12/07 2:20 PM
Re- Notice of Pretrial Conference scheduled for 01/11/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2016
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Tue 11/22 3:43 PM
Certificate of Service regarding (i) Complaint, (ii) Summons and Notice of Pretrial/Trial in an Adversary Proceeding, (iii) Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial, (iv) Order Granting and Modifying Liquidating Trustee's Motion for Order Establishing Uniform Procedures for Preference Adversary Proceedings [D.E. #1104, Main Case], and (v) Order Granting Liquidating Trustee's Amended Motion for Order Approving Selection of and Payment to Mediator for Trust Avoidance Actions [D.E. #1114, Main Case] Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk,2 Summons Issued,3 Order Setting Requirements
Thursday, November 17, 2016
3 3 order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Thu 11/17 4:24 PM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 30 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 11/17 4:19 PM
Summons Issued on DNA Couture, Inc. Answer Due 12/19/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/04/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk
Wednesday, November 16, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/16 3:14 PM
Adversary case 16-01622 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against DNA Couture, Inc.. to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A