Arizona District Court
Judge:Steven P Logan
Case #: 2:16-cv-03993
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Nov 17, 2016
Terminated:Apr 18, 2017
Last checked: Tuesday May 16, 2017 2:25 AM MST
Defendant
Fat Straw AZ Mills LLC
Represented By
Michael K Kelly
Jennings Strouss & Salmon Plc - Phoenix - Washington St
contact info
Andy J Chambers
Jennings Strouss & Salmon Plc - Phoenix - Washington St
contact info
Defendant
Catherine Feng
Represented By
Michael K Kelly
Jennings Strouss & Salmon Plc - Phoenix - Washington St
contact info
Andy J Chambers
Jennings Strouss & Salmon Plc - Phoenix - Washington St
contact info
Defendant
Sunbird Ray Investments LLC
Represented By
Michael K Kelly
Jennings Strouss & Salmon Plc - Phoenix - Washington St
contact info
Andy J Chambers
Jennings Strouss & Salmon Plc - Phoenix - Washington St
contact info
Defendant
Unknown Parties
Represented By
Michael K Kelly
Jennings Strouss & Salmon Plc - Phoenix - Washington St
contact info
Andy J Chambers
Jennings Strouss & Salmon Plc - Phoenix - Washington St
contact info
Defendant
Geng Wang
Represented By
Michael K Kelly
Jennings Strouss & Salmon Plc - Phoenix - Washington St
contact info
Andy J Chambers
Jennings Strouss & Salmon Plc - Phoenix - Washington St
contact info
Plaintiff
Boba Tea Company
Represented By
Devon Kaden Roepcke
Law Offices Of Devon K Roepcke PC
contact info
Sabrina L Green
Stratton & Green Alc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM MST
Tuesday, April 18, 2017
31 31 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 04/18 2:03 PM
ORDER that this action is dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 4/18/17. (CLB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2017
30 30 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 03/15 2:15 PM
ORDER re:29 Notice of Settlement that this case will be dismissed with prejudice on April 14, 2017 unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 3/15/17. (CLB)
Related: [-]
29 29 2 pgs notice Notice of Settlement Wed 03/15 1:35 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Fat Straw AZ Mills LLC, Catherine Feng, Sunbird Ray Investments LLC, Unknown Parties, Geng Wang. (Chambers, Andy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2017
28 28 2 pgs notice Notice (Other) Thu 03/09 1:29 PM
NOTICE re: Notice of Service of Initial Disclosure Statement by Fat Straw AZ Mills LLC, Catherine Feng, Sunbird Ray Investments LLC, Unknown Parties, Geng Wang . (Chambers, Andy)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 03, 2017
27 27 order Scheduling Order Fri 03/03 10:13 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/11/2017. Dispositive motions due by 12/6/2017. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 3/3/2017. (MMO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2017
26 26 9 pgs misc Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan) Wed 03/01 4:25 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Boba Tea Company.(Green, Sabrina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, February 24, 2017
25 25 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 02/24 9:53 AM
ORDER that the parties shall jointly file a Joint Rule 26(f) Case Management Report and a Joint Proposed Rule 16 Case Management Order, in the manner set forth in the Court's Date Order Setting Rule 16 Case Management Conference17 , no later than March 1, 2017. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 2/24/17. (CLB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2017
24 24 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Thu 02/23 12:04 PM
*RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re:23 Order, Terminate Hearings, Set Deadlines by Plaintiff Boba Tea Company. (Green, Sabrina) *Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c), attorney notified on 2/23/2017 (KGM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2017
23 23 order Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 02/22 11:46 AM
ORDER that the Case Management Conference currently scheduled for March 1, 2017 is vacated. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff must show cause in writing why this action should not be dismissed for failure to comply with this Court's Order and prosecute this action no later than February 27, 2017. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 2/22/17. (CLB)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 20, 2017
22 22 service Service Executed Mon 02/20 11:20 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Boba Tea Company: Proof of Service .(Roepcke, Devon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Affidavit,
Att: 3 Affidavit
Friday, January 20, 2017
21 21 notice Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information Fri 01/20 3:44 PM
NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Boba Tea Company. (Roepcke, Devon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2017
20 20 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/18 1:10 PM
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting19 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]
misc Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid Wed 01/18 1:10 PM
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX180909 as to Sabrina L Green. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
19 19 3 pgs motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/18 1:09 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Sabrina L Green on behalf of Boba Tea Company. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2017
18 18 minute_ord ~Util - Initial Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information Thu 01/12 8:23 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (EJA)
Related: [-]
17 17 6 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 01/11 10:49 AM
ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: A Rule 16 Case Management Conference is set for 3/1/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Steven P Logan. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 1/11/17.(CLB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Case Management Order
Tuesday, January 10, 2017
16 16 3 pgs misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 01/10 2:44 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fat Straw AZ Mills LLC, Catherine Feng, Sunbird Ray Investments LLC, Unknown Parties, Geng Wang. (Chambers, Andy)
Related: [-]
15 15 14 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/10 2:42 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Fat Straw AZ Mills LLC, Catherine Feng, Sunbird Ray Investments LLC, Unknown Parties, Geng Wang.(Chambers, Andy)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel Tue 01/10 2:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andy J Chambers on behalf of Fat Straw AZ Mills LLC, Catherine Feng, Sunbird Ray Investments LLC, Unknown Parties, Geng Wang. (Chambers, Andy)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2016
13 13 order Order re Rule 12(b) Motions Fri 12/16 4:21 PM
PRELIMINARY ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 12/16/2016. (MMO)
Related: [-]
12 12 minute_ord Minute Order Fri 12/16 9:56 AM
AMENDED MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Steven P. Logan. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV 16-3993 PHX-SPL. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for January 9, 2016 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
11 11 minute_ord Minute Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Judges Fri 12/16 9:52 AM
*AMENDED By Doc. 12 *MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Steven P. Logan. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV 16-3993 PHX-SPL. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) *Modified on 12/16/2016 (MAP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2016
10 10 misc 25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge Fri 12/16 9:30 AM
Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2016
9 9 2 pgs misc 25 Pct Mag - Order to Show Cause (LRCiv 3.7(b)) Tue 12/13 3:25 PM
Order that Boba Tea Company show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 1/9/2017 at 04:30 PM before Judge G Murray Snow.(MAP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Instructions,
Att: 2 Consent Form
Wednesday, November 30, 2016
8 8 2 pgs misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 11/30 4:31 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Boba Tea Company. (Roepcke, Devon)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information Wed 11/30 4:22 PM
NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Boba Tea Company. (Roepcke, Devon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 17, 2016
6 6 1 pgs minute_ord ~Util - Initial Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information Thu 11/17 4:59 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading(KGM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 AO121 form
5 5 notice Notice of Deficiency re Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 11/17 4:58 PM
NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Boba Tea Company. (KGM)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs service Summons Issued Thu 11/17 4:56 PM
Summons Issued as to Fat Straw AZ Mills LLC, Catherine Feng, Sunbird Ray Investments LLC, Geng Wang.(KGM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons
3 3 misc New Case Opened Thu 11/17 4:50 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-13622243. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Bridget S Bade. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 16-3993 PHX-BSB. Magistrate Election form attached.(KGM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAG 25 Instructions
2 2 2 pgs service Summons Submitted Thu 11/17 4:48 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Boba Tea Company (submitted by Devon Roepcke).(KGM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 11/17 4:46 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13622243 filed by Boba Tea Company (submitted by Devon Roepcke).(KGM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet