California Northern District Court
Judge:Jacqueline Scott Corley
Case #: 3:16-cv-06658
Nature of Suit871 Federal Tax Suits - IRS-Third Party 26 USC 7609
Cause26:7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Case Filed:Nov 17, 2016
Last checked: Tuesday May 16, 2017 2:24 AM PDT
Defendant
John Doe
Intervenor
Jeffrey K Berns
Represented By
Lee A. Weiss
Berns Weiss LLP
contact info
Intervenor
Coinbase, Inc.
Represented By
Grant P. Fondo
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Steven A. Ellis
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Shauna E. Woods
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Amy Talburt Matchison
Department Of Justice
contact info

GPO Mar 17 2017
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 17-cv-1431. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on March 17, 2017. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2017)

1. Customer sues IRS to stop probe into Coinbase bitcoin accounts (venturebeat.com)
Submitted Sun 12/18/2016
Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, March 17, 2017
34 34 respm Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Fri 03/17 1:04 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion of Proposed Intervenor Coinbase, Inc. to Intervene (Ellis, Steven) (Filed on 3/17/2017)
Related: [-]
33 33 order Order Relating Case Fri 03/17 12:03 PM
ORDER RELATING CASE.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/17/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2017)
Related: [-]
32 32 order Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases Fri 03/17 11:10 AM
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 17-cv-1431. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on March 17, 2017. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2017)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2017
31 31 respm Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Thu 03/16 3:31 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Intervene, to Quash Summons, or For Protective Order, or For an Order Scheduling an Evidentiary Hearing and Permitting Limited Discovery (Weiss, Lee) (Filed on 3/16/2017)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice (Other) Thu 03/16 1:04 PM
NOTICE by United States of America of Related Case (Matchison, Amy) (Filed on 3/16/2017)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2017
29 29 order Order on Stipulation Fri 02/03 8:43 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 28 Stipulation on Continuance of February 16, 2017 Hearing of Proposed Intervenors' Motions to Intervene and for Other Relief. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Fri 02/03 8:44 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to9 MOTION to Intervene ,to Quash Summons, or for Protective Order, or for an Order Scheduling an Evidentiary Hearing and Permitting Limited Discovery ,19 MOTION to Intervene,20 MOTION of Proposed Intervenor Coinbase, Inc. to Change Time for Hearing re9 MOTION to Intervene ,to Quash Summons, or for Protective Order, or for an Order Scheduling an Evidentiary Hearing and Permitting Limited Discovery . Motion Hearings reset for 3/23/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 02, 2017
28 28 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 02/02 11:39 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Continuance of February 16, 2017 Hearing of Proposed Intervenors' Motions to Intervene and for Other Relief filed by United States of America. (Matchison, Amy) (Filed on 2/2/2017)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2017
27 27 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Wed 01/25 8:04 AM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byUnited States of America. (Matchison, Amy) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
Related: [-] 19 MOTION to Intervene
Wednesday, January 18, 2017
26 26 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 01/18 4:16 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Coinbase, Inc... (Ellis, Steven) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 01/18 2:15 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jeffrey K Berns.. (Weiss, Lee) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
24 24 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Tue 01/17 4:46 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byJeffrey K Berns. (Weiss, Lee) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
Related: [-] 20 MOTION of Proposed Intervenor Coinbase, Inc. to Change Time for Hearing re9 MOTION to Intervene ,to Quash Summons, or for Protective Order, or for an Order Scheduling an Evidentiary Hearing and Permitting Limited Discovery
Thursday, January 12, 2017
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/12 4:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Shauna E. Woods (Woods, Shauna) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/12 4:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Grant P. Fondo (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
Related: [-]
21 21 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Thu 01/12 11:42 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Rescheduling Motion Hearing and Vacating Case Management Conference. TO ALL PARTIES AND COUNSEL OF RECORD: Please take notice that Proposed Intervenor Jeffrey Berns's Motion to Intervene (Dkt. No.9 ) currently scheduled for January 19, 2017 is continued to February 16, 2017 at 9:00 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. The case management conference scheduled for February 16, 2017 is vacated. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Thu 01/12 11:44 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to9 MOTION to Intervene , to Quash Summons, or for Protective Order, or for an Order Scheduling an Evidentiary Hearing and Permitting Limited Discovery . Motion Hearing reset for 2/16/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2017
20 20 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 01/11 6:45 PM
MOTION of Proposed Intervenor Coinbase, Inc. to Change Time for Hearing re9 MOTION to Intervene ,to Quash Summons, or for Protective Order, or for an Order Scheduling an Evidentiary Hearing and Permitting Limited Discovery filed by Coinbase, Inc.. Responses due by 1/25/2017. Replies due by 2/1/2017.(Ellis, Steven) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Steven A. Ellis,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
19 19 motion Intervene Wed 01/11 6:16 PM
MOTION to Intervene (with Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities) filed by Coinbase, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 1/25/2017. Replies due by 2/1/2017.(Ellis, Steven) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
18 18 notice Certificate of Interested Entities Wed 01/11 6:03 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Coinbase, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Coinbase Global, Inc. for Coinbase, Inc.. (Ellis, Steven) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2017
17 17 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Tue 01/03 1:08 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed byJeffrey K Berns. (Weiss, Lee) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
Related: [-] 9 MOTION to Intervene ,to Quash Summons, or for Protective Order, or for an Order Scheduling an Evidentiary Hearing and Permitting Limited Discovery
Tuesday, December 27, 2016
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Tue 12/27 12:56 PM
NOTICE by United States of America(Matchison, Amy) (Filed on 12/27/2016)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
15 15 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Tue 12/27 12:52 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byUnited States of America.(Matchison, Amy) (Filed on 12/27/2016)
Related: [-] 9 MOTION to Intervene ,to Quash Summons, or for Protective Order, or for an Order Scheduling an Evidentiary Hearing and Permitting Limited Discovery
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Wednesday, December 14, 2016
14 14 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Wed 12/14 1:18 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Proposed Intervenor shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Consent/Declination due by 12/28/2016. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2016)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2016
13 13 misc Proposed Order Tue 12/13 4:52 PM
Proposed Order re9 MOTION to Intervene ,TO QUASH SUMMONS, OR FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER, OR FOR AN ORDER SCHEDULING AN EVIDENTIARY HEARING AND PERMITTING LIMITED DISCOVERY by Jeffrey K Berns. (Weiss, Lee) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
Related: [-]
12 12 oth_sup Request for Judicial Notice Tue 12/13 4:50 PM
Request for Judicial Notice re9 MOTION to Intervene ,TO QUASH SUMMONS, OR FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER, OR FOR AN ORDER SCHEDULING AN EVIDENTIARY HEARING AND PERMITTING LIMITED DISCOVERY filed byJeffrey K Berns. Related [+] (Weiss, Lee) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
Related: [-] 9
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
11 11 oth_sup Declaration in Support Tue 12/13 4:48 PM
Declaration of Albert G Lum in Support of9 MOTION to Intervene ,TO QUASH SUMMONS, OR FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER, OR FOR AN ORDER SCHEDULING AN EVIDENTIARY HEARING AND PERMITTING LIMITED DISCOVERY filed byJeffrey K Berns. Related [+] (Weiss, Lee) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
Related: [-] 9
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
10 10 oth_sup Declaration in Support Tue 12/13 4:44 PM
Declaration of Jeffrey K. Berns in Support of9 MOTION to Intervene ,TO QUASH SUMMONS, OR FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER, OR FOR AN ORDER SCHEDULING AN EVIDENTIARY HEARING AND PERMITTING LIMITED DISCOVERY filed byJeffrey K Berns. Related [+] (Weiss, Lee) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
Related: [-] 9
9 9 motion Intervene Tue 12/13 4:41 PM
MOTION to Intervene ,TO QUASH SUMMONS, OR FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER, OR FOR AN ORDER SCHEDULING AN EVIDENTIARY HEARING AND PERMITTING LIMITED DISCOVERY filed by Jeffrey K Berns. Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 12/27/2016. Replies due by 1/3/2017. (Weiss, Lee) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Certificate of Interested Entities Tue 12/13 4:31 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Jeffrey K Berns (Weiss, Lee) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2016
7 7 order Order Wed 11/30 12:22 PM
ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE PETITION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE JOHN DOE SUMMONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/30/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2016)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 11/30 10:53 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States of America.. (Matchison, Amy) (Filed on 11/30/2016)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2016
5 5 order Case Management Scheduling Order Fri 11/18 5:20 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/16/2017 01:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 2/9/2017. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2016)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 17, 2016
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 11/17 10:41 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/1/2016. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2016)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Thu 11/17 7:12 AM
NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA of Filing Ex Parte Petition for Leave to Serve "John Doe" Summons (Matchison, Amy) (Filed on 11/17/2016)
Related: [-]
2 2 oth_sup Brief Thu 11/17 7:11 AM
Brief re1 Petition filed byUNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Related [+] (Matchison, Amy) (Filed on 11/17/2016)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Appendix,
Att: 2 Appendix,
Att: 3 Appendix,
Att: 4 Declaration of Senior Revenue Agent David Utzke,
Att: 5 Exhibit A,
Att: 6 Exhibit B
1 1 cmp Petition Thu 11/17 7:01 AM
PETITION Ex Parte for Leave to Serve "John Doe" Summons against All Defendants (). Filed byUNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Matchison, Amy) (Filed on 11/17/2016)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Order