Cannon v. Lowell District Court et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Colleen Mcmahon |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-08997 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Nov 18, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 20, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Thursday, May 15, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() PRO SE MEMORANDUM dated 5/15/2025 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Joseph Sherod Cannon. New Address: P.O. Box 2286, Hempstead, NY, 11551. (jjc) |
|
Wednesday, March 13, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() PRO SE MEMORANDUM re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Joseph Sherod Cannon. New Address: P.O. Box 2286, Hempstead, NY, 11551. (sc) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
misc
Mail Order by Certified Mail
Mon 01/23 8:43 AM
Mailed a copy of7 Order of Dismissal,8 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint), with Right to Appeal form attached, to Joseph Sherod Cannon 349 15-03252 Rikers Island - G.R.V.C. 09-09 Hazen Street East Elmhurst, NY 11370. (jgo) |
||
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
![]() CIVIL JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the order issued January 20, 2017, dismissing the complaint, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the complaint is dismissed without prejudice under the Prison Litigation Reform Act's "three-strikes" rule. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Plaintiff continues to be barred from filing any civil action under the in forma pauperis (IFP) statute while a prisoner unless Plaintiff is under imminent danger of serious physical injury. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/20/2017) (cla) |
|
7 | 7
![]() BAR ORDER UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1915(g): Accordingly, Plaintiff is barred from filing future actions IFP in this Court while a prisoner unless he is under imminent threat of serious physical injury. The Court denies Plaintiff's request to proceed IFP, and the complaint is dismissed without prejudice under the PLRA's "three-strikes" rule. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Plaintiff is warned that the submission of frivolous documents may result in the imposition of additional sanctions, including monetary penalties. See 28 U.S.C. § 1651. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of his order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to close this action. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/20/2017) (cla) |
|
misc
Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk
Fri 01/20 6:12 PM
Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re:7 Order of Dismissal,8 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint), to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (cla) |
||
Wednesday, January 04, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
![]() LETTER from Joseph S. Cannon, dated 12/29/16 re: Plaintiff requests that the Court file the attached documents(as indicated) to the following docket numbers: 15cv6959 15cv4579 15cv5753 16cv4282 and 16cv8997 Document filed by Joseph Sherod Cannon.(sc) |
|
5 | 5
![]() LETTER from Joseph S. Cannon, dated 12/25/16 re: Plaintiff submits this letter with attached declaration; and he requests that the attached declaration be filed under 15cv8641 15cv5753 15cv4579 15cv6959 15cv9956 15cv13565 15cv14196 15cv9573 and 16cv8997 Document filed by Joseph Sherod Cannon.(sc) |
|
4 | 4
![]() LETTER from Joseph Cannon dated 12/23/16 re: Plaintiff requests that the enclosed documents(as indicated) be attached to the following dockets: 15cv5753 15cv4579 15cv6959 16cv4282 and 16cv8997 Document filed by Sherod Cannon.(sc) |
|
Wednesday, December 28, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
![]() AFFIRMATION of Joseph Sherod Cannon UNDER 28:1915(g); re:2 Order to Show Cause. Document filed by Joseph Sherod Cannon. (sc) |
|
Tuesday, December 13, 2016 | ||
misc
Mail Order by Certified Mail
Tue 12/13 4:42 PM
Mailed a copy of2 Order to Show Cause, to Joseph Sherod Cannon. (vj) |
||
Friday, December 09, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
![]() ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g): The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this case to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. The Court directs Plaintiff to show cause why the Court should not deny his IFP application under the PLRA's three strikes provision, 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Plaintiff must file an affirmation within thirty days explaining any reason why he should not be barred. An Affirmation form is attached to this order for Plaintiff's convenience. If Plaintiff does not show cause, or if he fails to respond to this order, the Court will deny Plaintiff's IFP application, dismiss this action without prejudice, and bar Plaintiff under § 1915(g) from filing future actions IFP while he is in custody. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 44445 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/9/2016) (rdz) |
|
misc
Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk
Tue 12/13 4:38 PM
Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re:2 Order to Show Cause, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (rdz) |
||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment - Sua Sponte
Tue 12/13 4:39 PM
NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (rdz) |
||
Friday, November 18, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Chelmsford Police Dept., Christophers Towing Company, Lowell District Court. Document filed by Joseph Sherod Cannon.(rdz) |
|
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 11/21 11:56 AM
Case Designated ECF. (rdz) |