Utah District Court
Judge:Tena Campbell
Referred: Dustin B Pead
Case #: 2:16-cv-01183
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2016
Terminated:Oct 20, 2020
Last checked: Saturday May 20, 2017 4:20 AM MDT
Consol Plaintiff
Kathryn Champion
Consol Plaintiff
Taylor Zimmerman
Consol Plaintiff
Robert Weinstein
Consol Plaintiff
Edward Ungvarsky
Represented By
Scott E. Gant
Boies Schiller & Flexner LLP
contact info
Heather M. Sneddon
Anderson & Karrenberg
contact info
Carl E. Goldfarb
Boies Schiller & Flexner
contact info
Jared D. Scott
Anderson & Karrenberg
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Pam Stillings
Represented By
Steven M. Jodlowski
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd(san Diego)
contact info
Jason Eliaser
Law Offices Of William Markham PC
contact info
Mike Houchin
Law Offices Of Ronald A Marron Aplc
contact info
William A. Markham
Law Offices Of William Markham PC
contact info
Ronald Marron
Law Offices Of Ronald A Marron Aplc
contact info
Dorn Bishop
Law Offices Of William Markham PC
contact info
Jason M. Kerr
Price Parkinson & Kerr PLLC
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Jill Schulson
Consol Plaintiff
Leia Pinto
Consol Plaintiff
Tyler Nance
Consol Plaintiff
Elizabeth Henry
Represented By
Heather M. Sneddon
Anderson & Karrenberg
contact info
Rebecca A. Peterson
Lockridge Grindal Nauen
contact info
Jared D. Scott
Anderson & Karrenberg
contact info
Robert K. Shelquist
Lockridge Grindal Nauen
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Sara Hartman
Consol Plaintiff
Alexa Bean
Consol Plaintiff
Daniel J. Bartolucci
Represented By
Scott E. Gant
Boies Schiller & Flexner LLP
contact info
Heather M. Sneddon
Anderson & Karrenberg
contact info
Carl E. Goldfarb
Boies Schiller & Flexner
contact info
Jared D. Scott
Anderson & Karrenberg
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Iysha Abed
Defendant
Vision Direct
Represented By
Jeffrey C. Bank
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati (ny)
contact info
Steven H. Bergman
Richards Brandt Miller Nelson
contact info
Robert M. Corp
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati PC
contact info
Tyler Anne Dever
Richards Brandt Miller Nelson
contact info
Chul Pak
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati (ny)
contact info
Defendant
1-800 Contacts
Represented By
Justin P. Raphael
Munger Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Rohit Kumar Singla
Munger Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Robert S. Clark
Parr Brown Gee & Loveless
contact info
Ashley D. Kaplan
Munger Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Sara M. Nielson
Parr Brown Gee & Loveless
contact info
Plaintiff
J Thompson
Represented By
Steven M. Jodlowski
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd(san Diego)
contact info
Scott E. Gant
Boies Schiller & Flexner LLP
contact info
Carl E. Goldfarb
Boies Schiller & Flexner
contact info
Jared D. Scott
Anderson & Karrenberg
contact info
Thomas R Karrenberg
Anderson & Karrenberg
contact info
Plaintiff
William P. Duncanson
Represented By
Steven M. Jodlowski
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd(san Diego)
contact info
Scott E. Gant
Boies Schiller & Flexner LLP
contact info
Carl E. Goldfarb
Boies Schiller & Flexner
contact info
Jared D. Scott
Anderson & Karrenberg
contact info
Thomas R Karrenberg
Anderson & Karrenberg
contact info

GPO May 17 2018
ORDER AND MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 116 Motion to Dismiss; denying 118 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 5/17/2018. (blh)

Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Friday, July 19, 2024
347 347 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds Fri 07/19 4:59 PM
ORDER granting 346 Motion for Disbursement of Funds (Second Redistribution of Net Settlement Fund and Payment to CPT Group). Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 7/19/24 (alt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
346 346 motion Disbursement of Funds Thu 07/18 6:11 PM
MOTION for Disbursement of Funds and Memorandum in Support [Co-Lead Class Counsel's Motion for a Second Redistribution of Net Settlement Fund and Payment to CPT Group, Inc.] filed by Consol Plaintiffs Iysha Abed, Daniel J. Bartolucci, Tyler Nance, Leia Pinto, Jill Schulson, Edward Ungvarsky, Plaintiffs William P. Duncanson, J Thompson.(Mitchell, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Julie N. Green in Support of Co-Lead Class Counsels Motion for a Second Redistribution of Net Settlement Fund and Payment to CPT Group, Inc.,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Authorizing a Second Redistribution of Net Settlement Fund and Payment to CPT Group, Inc.