In re: Jacqueline C. Melcher
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | William Alsup |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-06123 |
Nature of Suit | 422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158 |
Cause | 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BAP) |
Case Filed: | Oct 24, 2016 |
Terminated: | Dec 27, 2016 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 22, 2017 2:33 AM PDT |
Appellant
Jacqueline C. Melcher
P.O. Box 222798
Carmel, CA 93922 |
|
Trustee
John W. Richardson
2941 Park Avenue Suite H
Soquel, CA 95073 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Judgment
Wed 03/29 11:39 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/29/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2017) |
|
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Wed 03/29 11:29 PM
ORDER GRANTING 18 MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2017) |
|
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order
Thu 02/09 11:00 AM
ORDER RE DOCKETING. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/9/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2017) |
|
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 02/08 4:45 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to18 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Jacqueline C. Melcher. (alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017) |
|
Tuesday, January 24, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Tue 01/24 10:13 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Notice of Hearing on Motion to Dismiss Appeal, Motion to Dismiss Appeal, and Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities) filed by John W. Richardson. Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 2/7/2017. Replies due by 2/14/2017.(Maher, Charles) (Filed on 1/24/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Charles P. Maher, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Statement
Wed 01/18 11:57 AM
Statement of the Issues on Appeal by Jacqueline C. Melcher.(alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
16 | 16
misc
Statement
Tue 01/17 4:42 PM
Statement of the Issues on Appeal by Jacqueline C. Melcher.(alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Letter | ||
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
appeal
Designation of Record on Appeal
Thu 01/12 2:46 PM
NOTICE OF NON-DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal(alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Record | ||
Tuesday, December 27, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 12/27 3:39 PM
ORDER GRANTING IN PART 8 APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE APPEALS by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2016) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 12/27 3:25 PM
ORDER GRANTING 11 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2016) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
Tue 12/27 3:16 PM
ORDER GRANTING 10 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2016) |
|
utility
Create Case Association
Wed 12/28 1:31 PM
Cases associated: Create association to 3:16-cv-05982-WHA. (ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2016) |
||
Monday, December 19, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 12/19 2:40 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jacqueline C. Melcher.(alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2016) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
10 | 10
motion
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
Mon 12/19 2:37 PM
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Jacqueline C. Melcher. (alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2016) |
|
Wednesday, December 07, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Wed 12/07 9:00 AM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (Trustee's Partial Opposition to Consolidation of Cases) filed byJohn W. Richardson.(Maher, Charles) (Filed on 12/7/2016) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Friday, December 02, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 12/06 3:13 PM
MOTION requesting the court combine the appeals of the trustee and his attorney's fees and expenses into one appeal filed by Jacqueline C. Melcher. Responses due by 12/16/2016. Replies due by 12/23/2016. (ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2016) |
|
Monday, November 28, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Mon 11/28 4:24 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John W. Richardson re6 Notice of Substitution of Counsel (Maher, Charles) (Filed on 11/28/2016) |
|
Tuesday, November 22, 2016 | ||
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Tue 11/22 12:00 PM
Electronic filing REMINDER. Re:6 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by John W. Richardson Attorney profile information updated for individual case ONLY. Counsel is reminded that it is the attorney's responsibility to keep their profile information (especially the email address) valid and current. (See Civil Local Rule 5-1). Please see the Court's website at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/maintainaccount for additional information. This is a text only docket entry. There is no document associated with this entry. (ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2016) |
||
Monday, November 21, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Mon 11/21 4:25 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Charles Patrick Maher (Maher, Charles) (Filed on 11/21/2016) |
|
Thursday, November 03, 2016 | ||
5 | 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case Reassigned to Judge Hon. William Alsup. Judge Hon. Ronald M. Whyte no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Judge Executive Committee on 11/3/2016. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2016) (sp, COURT STAFF). | |
Att: 1 (11/4/2016) Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Monday, October 24, 2016 | ||
4 | 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016) | |
3 | 3 Statement of Election to Have Appeal Heard by District Court by Jacqueline C. Melcher. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016) | |
2 | 2 Notice of APPEAL file by Jacqueline C. Melcher (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016) | |
1 | 1 Notice of Transfer of APPEAL To District Court from BANKRUPTCY Appellate Panel of the 9th Circuit. Bankruptcy Court case number 01-53251 . BAP No. NC16-1349 filed by Jacqueline C. Melcher. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016) Modified on 10/24/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF). | |
Clerk mailed copy of Order to Plaintiff Jacqueline C. Melcher to the address of P.O. Box 222798, Carmel, CA 93922 (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016) |