New Jersey District Court
Judge:Madeline Cox Arleo
Referred: Leda D Wettre
Case #: 2:16-cv-08691
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Nov 22, 2016
Terminated:Jan 17, 2018
Last checked: Sunday May 21, 2017 5:00 AM EDT
Defendant
JOHN ILLENGARTH
Represented By
JOHN ALBERT FIALCOWITZ
The Law Office Of John A. Fialcowitz, LLC
contact info
Defendant
JJIT ASSOCIATES LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
Represented By
JOHN ALBERT FIALCOWITZ
The Law Office Of John A. Fialcowitz, LLC
contact info
Defendant
USA VENDING LLC
Represented By
JOHN ALBERT FIALCOWITZ
The Law Office Of John A. Fialcowitz, LLC
contact info
Defendant
RICHARD VAZZANO
Represented By
JOHN ALBERT FIALCOWITZ
The Law Office Of John A. Fialcowitz, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
SUNSTAR VENDING, INC.
Represented By
JEFFREY STEVEN BERKOWITZ
Edward M. Teitelbaum P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, January 17, 2018
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 01/17 10:54 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (sr, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2018
35 35 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Wed 01/17 10:54 AM
ORDER granting30 Motion to Dismiss, and denying as moot30 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 1/16/18. (sr, )
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2017
34 34 respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Mon 09/11 2:32 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by All Defendants re30 MOTION for Summary Judgment (FIALCOWITZ, JOHN)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Mon 09/11 3:02 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Telephone Conference held on 9/11/2017. (kd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2017
33 33 respm Affidavit in Opposition to Motion Tue 09/05 4:18 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition filed by SUNSTAR VENDING, INC. re30 MOTION for Summary Judgment (BERKOWITZ, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Sunstar Vending's business registration certificate
Friday, August 25, 2017
32 32 1 pgs order Order Fri 08/25 1:12 PM
ORDER adjourning30 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by USA VENDING LLC, RICHARD VAZZANO, JOHN ILLENGARTH, JJIT ASSOCIATES LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY to 9/18/17. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 8/25/17. (sr, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 08/25 1:12 PM
Reset Deadlines as to30 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion set for 9/18/2017 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, )
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2017
31 31 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 08/18 12:17 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to30 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, by SUNSTAR VENDING, INC.. (BERKOWITZ, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2017
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 08/01 8:34 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to30 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion set for 9/5/2017 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2017
30 30 motion Summary Judgment Mon 07/31 4:12 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by All Defendants. Responses due by 8/22/2017(FIALCOWITZ, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Bried in Support of Motion to Dismiss and For Summary Judgment,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of J.Fialcowitz,
Att: 3 Statement Rule 56.1 Statement,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed form of Order
Friday, July 21, 2017
29 29 order Order Fri 07/21 10:46 AM
ORDER granting leave for defendants to file a proposed motion to dismiss on or before 8/11/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 7/19/17. (sr, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2017
minutes Status Conference Fri 07/07 8:39 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Telephone Conference held on 7/6/2017. (kd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2017
28 28 order Order Wed 07/05 10:17 AM
TEXT ORDER Counsel shall participate in a status telephone call with the Court on July 6, 2017, at 3 p.m. Plaintiff's counsel is to initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 7/5/17. (Wettre, Leda)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2017
27 27 misc Letter Fri 06/23 2:29 PM
Letter from JEFFREY BERKOWITZ. (BERKOWITZ, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2017
26 26 misc Letter Thu 06/22 6:08 PM
Letter from J. Fialcowitz. (FIALCOWITZ, JOHN)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Letter Thu 06/22 3:38 PM
Letter from JEFFREY BERKOWITZ. (BERKOWITZ, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2017
24 24 misc Letter Tue 06/20 9:58 AM
Letter from j.Fialcowitz. (FIALCOWITZ, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 19, 2017
23 23 order Scheduling Order Tue 06/20 9:32 AM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: scheduling a telephone Status Conference on 9/11/2017 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre, Fact Discovery due by 8/31/2017; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 6/19/17. (sr, )
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Mon 06/19 11:05 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Telephone Conference held on 6/19/2017. (kd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2017
minutes Settlement Conference Wed 06/14 10:09 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Settlement Conference held on 6/13/2017. (kd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2017
22 22 order Order Wed 05/24 4:58 PM
TEXT ORDER A continued settlement conference shall be held on June 13, 2017, at 2 p.m. Principals are to be present in person. A status update letter(s) shall be filed at least two business days prior to the conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 5/24/17. (Wettre, Leda)
Related: [-]
minutes Settlement Conference Thu 05/25 9:15 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Settlement Conference held on 5/24/2017. (kd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2017
21 21 order Order Tue 04/11 4:28 PM
TEXT ORDER - The Settlement Conference set for 5/24/2017 at 10:00 am will now take place in Newark - Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 4/11/2017. (kd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2017
20 20 order Order Tue 03/14 12:29 PM
TEXT ORDER - Rescheduling a Settlement Conference from 5/17/2017 to 5/24/2017 at 10:00 am in Newark - Courtroom 4A before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 3/14/2017. (kd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2017
19 19 order ~Util - Set Hearings Order Thu 02/16 10:33 AM
TEXT ORDER - A Settlement Conference is set for 5/17/2017 at 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Clients with full settlement authority should be physically present. The parties shall submit confidential position letters, by email to LDW_orders@njd.uscourts.gov, at least 3 business days in advance.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 2/16/2017. (kd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2017
minutes Scheduling Conference Wed 02/15 3:47 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Scheduling Conference held on 2/15/2017. (kd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 14, 2017
18 18 discov Joint Discovery Plan Tue 02/14 12:09 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by JOHN ILLENGARTH, JJIT ASSOCIATES LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, USA VENDING LLC, RICHARD VAZZANO.(FIALCOWITZ, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2017
17 17 order Order Wed 01/25 11:43 AM
ORDER re15 Letter; indicating that issues will be discussed with Counsel at the Rule 16 Conference in February. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/25/17. (sr, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 24, 2017
16 16 misc Letter Tue 01/24 12:33 PM
Letter from John Fialcowitz re15 Letter. (FIALCOWITZ, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 23, 2017
15 15 misc Letter Mon 01/23 12:45 PM
Letter from JEFFREY BERKOWITZ. (BERKOWITZ, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2017
14 14 order Order Tue 01/10 9:59 AM
ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a response to the13 Letter on or before 1/23/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/9/17. (sr, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 06, 2017
13 13 misc Letter Fri 01/06 9:15 AM
Letter from John Fialcowitz, Esq.. (FIALCOWITZ, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2017
12 12 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Wed 01/04 10:38 AM
LETTER ORDER - A Scheduling Conference is set for 2/15/2017 at 12:00 PM in Newark - Courtroom 4A before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre.Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/4/2017. (kd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2017
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/03 12:36 PM
All Defendants ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by JOHN ILLENGARTH, JJIT ASSOCIATES LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY.(FIALCOWITZ, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only)
Wednesday, December 14, 2016
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 12/14 10:55 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by SUNSTAR VENDING, INC.. JOHN ILLENGARTH served on 11/30/2016, answer due 1/3/2017. (BERKOWITZ, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 12/14 10:53 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by SUNSTAR VENDING, INC.. RICHARD VAZZANO served on 11/30/2016, answer due 1/3/2017. (BERKOWITZ, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 12/14 10:42 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by SUNSTAR VENDING, INC.. USA VENDING LLC served on 12/12/2016, answer due 1/3/2017. (BERKOWITZ, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2016
7 7 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Tue 12/13 11:16 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to all Defendants. Attorney JOHN ALBERT FIALCOWITZ for JOHN ILLENGARTH,JOHN ALBERT FIALCOWITZ for JJIT ASSOCIATES LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,JOHN ALBERT FIALCOWITZ for USA VENDING LLC,JOHN ALBERT FIALCOWITZ for RICHARD VAZZANO added. (FIALCOWITZ, JOHN)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Tue 12/13 2:18 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by RICHARD VAZZANO, JJIT ASSOCIATES LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, JOHN ILLENGARTH, USA VENDING LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/3/17. (sr, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2016
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 11/22 3:16 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHN ILLENGARTH, JJIT ASSOCIATES LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, USA VENDING LLC, RICHARD VAZZANO Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *John Reilly* (jr)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons - Request for Issue Tue 11/22 12:32 PM
Request for Summons to be Issued by SUNSTAR VENDING, INC. as to USA VENDING LLC. (BERKOWITZ, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons - Request for Issue Tue 11/22 12:31 PM
Request for Summons to be Issued by SUNSTAR VENDING, INC. as to RICHARD VAZZANO. (BERKOWITZ, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons - Request for Issue Tue 11/22 12:31 PM
Request for Summons to be Issued by SUNSTAR VENDING, INC. as to JJIT ASSOCIATES LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. (BERKOWITZ, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons - Request for Issue Tue 11/22 12:30 PM
Request for Summons to be Issued by SUNSTAR VENDING, INC. as to JOHN ILLENGARTH. (BERKOWITZ, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/22 11:47 AM
COMPLAINT against JOHN ILLENGARTH, JJIT ASSOCIATES LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, USA VENDING LLC, RICHARD VAZZANO ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7496351) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SUNSTAR VENDING, INC..(BERKOWITZ, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 11/22 3:15 PM
Case assigned to Judge Madeline C. Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr)
Related: [-]