O'Connor et al v. Panatte, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:16-bk-48282
Lead BK case is: 2:16-bk-48282
Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 13 | |
Judge: | Marci B Mcivor |
Case #: | 2:16-ap-05090 |
Nature of Suit | 21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property |
Case Filed: | Nov 25, 2016 |
Terminated: | Dec 20, 2016 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Panatte, LLC
2001 Western Ave., #400
Seattle, WA 98121 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael O'Connor
15380 Huff
Livonia, MI 48154 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terri Ann O'Connor
15380 Huff
Livonia, MI 48154 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, December 20, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tue 12/20 4:31 PM
ORDER GRANTING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ADVERSARY COMPLAINT TO DETERMINE THE EXTENT OF THE LIEN OF PANNATE LLC DBA PEOPLE FIRST FUND, C/O FCI LENDERSERVICES, LLC . (Mum, J) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tue 12/20 2:28 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Re: Debtor(s) Chapter Plan provides a 100% dividend to unsecured creditors and resolves the matter Filed by Plaintiff Michael O'Connor (Rogers, Emerson) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Tue 12/20 4:31 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:16-ap-5090 : Dismissed. (Mum, J) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 12/20 4:32 PM
Adversary Case 2:16-ap-5090 Closed. (Mum, J) |
||
Friday, November 25, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 11/25 1:57 PM
Summons Service Executed on Panatte, LLC DBA People First Fund 11/25/2016 (Rogers, Emerson) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Exhibit
Fri 11/25 1:26 PM
Exhibit A and B Filed by Plaintiff Michael O'Connor . (Rogers, Emerson) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit B | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (auto)
Fri 11/25 1:17 PM
Summons Issued on Panatte, LLC DBA People First Fund Answer Due 12/27/2016 (Rogers, Emerson) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 11/25 1:17 PM
Adversary case 16-05090 (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)): Complaint by Michael O'Connor, Terri Ann O'Connor against Panatte, LLC DBA People First Fund. Receipt Number Exempt, Fee Amount of $ 350.00 is Exempt. (Rogers, Emerson) |