Dundon et al v. Kirchmeier et al
North Dakota District Court | |
Judge: | Daniel M Traynor |
Referred: | Alice R Senechal |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-00406 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1981 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Nov 28, 2016 |
Terminated: | Dec 30, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday May 27, 2017 5:23 AM CDT |
Defendant
Does 1-100
|
|
Defendant
Jason Ziegler
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Stutsman County
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Morton County
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
City of Mandan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chad Kaiser
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kyle Kirchmeier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Israel Hoagland-Lynn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frank Finan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vanessa Dundon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Noah Michael Treanor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Crystal Wilson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jade Kalikolehuaokal Wool
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Guy Dullknife, III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Demo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mariah Marie Bruce
|
Represented By
|
1. | Standing Rock Protestors File Lawsuit Over Police Violence, suffered several injuries (theintercept.com) |
Submitted Wed 11/30/2016 | |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, November 29, 2023 | ||
291 | 291
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 11/29 1:45 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to288 Notice of Appeal, filed by Mariah Marie Bruce, Guy Dullknife, III, Crystal Wilson, Vanessa Dundon, David Demo, Frank Finan (jb) |